Moriarty v. Life Insurance Company of North America et al
Plaintiff: Mary E. Moriarty
Defendant: Life Insurance Company of North America and Munich Reinsurance America, Inc. Long Term Disability Health Plan
Case Number: 3:2018cv01653
Filed: October 4, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of Connecticut
Presiding Judge: Kari A Dooley
Nature of Suit: Labor: E.R.I.S.A.
Cause of Action: 29:1132
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 29, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 29, 2018 Answer deadline updated for Life Insurance Company of North America to 1/7/2019. (Fazekas, J.)
November 29, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER granting #10 Motion for Extension of Time on consent. The parties shall confer and file their 26(f) Report by January 18, 2019. Signed by Judge Kari A. Dooley on 11/29/2018. (Bempong, Tracy)
November 29, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER granting #9 Motion for Extension of Time on consent. Defendant shall file its response to Plaintiff's Complaint by January 7, 2019. Signed by Judge Kari A. Dooley on 11/29/2018. (Bempong, Tracy)
November 28, 2018 Filing 10 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time until January 18, 2019 to File Form 26(F) Report of Parties' Planning Meeting by Life Insurance Company of North America. (Bennici, Gregory)
November 28, 2018 Filing 9 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time until January 7, 2018 to Respond to Complaint #1 Complaint by Life Insurance Company of North America. (Bennici, Gregory)
October 26, 2018 Filing 8 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed as to Life Insurance Company of North America waiver sent on 10/9/2018, answer due 12/8/2018 filed by Mary E. Moriarty. (Ramos, Ivan)
October 26, 2018 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Patrick Walter Begos on behalf of Life Insurance Company of North America (Begos, Patrick)
October 25, 2018 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Gregory J. Bennici on behalf of Life Insurance Company of North America (Bennici, Gregory)
October 5, 2018 Filing 5 NOTICE TO COUNSEL/SELF-REPRESENTED PARTIES : Counsel or self-represented parties initiating or removing this action are responsible for serving all parties with attached documents and copies of #2 Order on Pretrial Deadlines, #3 Electronic Filing Order, #1 Complaint filed by Mary E. Moriarty, #4 Standing Protective Order Signed by Clerk on 10/5/2018.(Fazekas, J.)
October 4, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 4 STANDING PROTECTIVE ORDER Signed by Judge Kari A. Dooley on 10/4/2018.(Fazekas, J.)
October 4, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ELECTRONIC FILING ORDER FOR COUNSEL - PLEASE ENSURE COMPLIANCE WITH COURTESY COPY REQUIREMENTS IN THIS ORDER Signed by Judge Kari A. Dooley on 10/4/2018.(Fazekas, J.)
October 4, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 2 Order on Pretrial Deadlines: Amended Pleadings due by 12/3/2018. Discovery due by 4/5/2019. Dispositive Motions due by 5/10/2019. Signed by Clerk on 10/4/2018.(Fazekas, J.)
October 4, 2018 Judge Kari A. Dooley added. (Oliver, T.)
October 4, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $400 receipt number ACTDC-4995937.), filed by Mary E. Moriarty. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Ramos, Ivan)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Connecticut District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Moriarty v. Life Insurance Company of North America et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Life Insurance Company of North America
Represented By: Gregory J. Bennici
Represented By: Patrick Walter Begos
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Munich Reinsurance America, Inc. Long Term Disability Health Plan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mary E. Moriarty
Represented By: Ivan A. Ramos
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?