Rapp, et al v. Henkel of America, Inc., et al
Plaintiff: Christy Rapp and Theodore Rapp
Defendant: Henkel of America, Inc. and Does 1 to 10, inclusive
Case Number: 3:2018cv01656
Filed: October 3, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of Connecticut
Presiding Judge: Janet C Hall
Nature of Suit: Labor: E.R.I.S.A.
Cause of Action: 29:1132
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 18, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 27, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 50 SCHEDULING ORDER REGARDING CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN: Amended Pleadings due by 12/4/2018 Discovery due by 4/6/2019 Dispositive Motions due by 5/11/2019 Status Report due by 2/27/2019 Trial Brief due by 5/11/2019 Signed by Judge Janet C. Hall on 11/27/2018.(Anastasio, F.)
November 16, 2018 Filing 49 Joint REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (Goodfellow, James)
November 15, 2018 Filing 48 Joint REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (Goodfellow, James)
November 14, 2018 Filing 47 NOTICE of Appearance by Nicholas West on behalf of Christy Rapp, Theodore Rapp (West, Nicholas)
November 14, 2018 Filing 46 NOTICE of Appearance by Robert J. McKennon on behalf of Christy Rapp, Theodore Rapp (McKennon, Robert)
November 2, 2018 Filing 45 NOTICE: Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 11/16/2018. Signed by Clerk on 11/2/2018.(Lewis, D)
October 30, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 44 ORDER granting #42 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice Certificate of Good Standing due by 12/29/2018. Signed by Clerk on 10/30/2018. (Anastasio, F.)
October 30, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 43 ORDER granting #41 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice Certificate of Good Standing due by 12/29/2018. Signed by Clerk on 10/30/2018. (Anastasio, F.)
October 29, 2018 Filing 42 MOTION for Attorney(s) Robert J. McKennon to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (paid $75 PHV fee; receipt number ACTDC-5027206) by Christy Rapp, Theodore Rapp. (Rintoul, David)
October 29, 2018 Filing 41 MOTION for Attorney(s) Nicholas A. West to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (paid $75 PHV fee; receipt number ACTDC-5027194) by Christy Rapp, Theodore Rapp. (Rintoul, David)
October 29, 2018 Filing 40 NOTICE of Appearance by David Skinner Rintoul on behalf of Christy Rapp, Theodore Rapp (Rintoul, David)
October 25, 2018 Filing 39 NOTICE of Appearance by Ian H. Morrison on behalf of Henkel of America, Inc. (Morrison, Ian)
October 25, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 38 ORDER granting #37 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Clerk on 10/25/2018. (Anastasio, F.)
October 24, 2018 Filing 37 MOTION for Attorney(s) Ian H. Morrison to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice by Henkel of America, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit)(Goodfellow, James)
October 22, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 36 ORDER denying without prejudice to renew for failure to comply with Local Rule 83.1 #32 Motion to Appear. SO ORDERED by Judge Janet C. Hall on 10/22/2018. (Lewis, D)
October 22, 2018 Filing 35 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, with Affirmative Defenses by Henkel of America, Inc..(Goodfellow, James)
October 18, 2018 Answer deadline updated for Henkel of America, Inc. to 10/22/2018. (Lewis, D)
October 18, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 34 ORDER granting nunc pro tunc #33 MOTION for Extension of Time until October 22, 2018(Unopposed Expedited) To Answer or Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint #1 Complaint,. SO ORDERED by Judge Janet C. Hall on 10/18/2018. (Lewis, D) Modified on 10/18/2018 (Lewis, D).
October 17, 2018 Filing 33 MOTION for Extension of Time until October 22, 2018(Unopposed Expedited) To Answer or Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint #1 Complaint, by Henkel of America, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Goodfellow, James)
October 17, 2018 Filing 32 MOTION for Attorney(s) Ian H. Morrison to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (paid $75 PHV fee; receipt number ACTDC-5012210) by Does, Henkel of America, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Affuidavit and Certificate of Good Standing for I. Morrison)(Goodfellow, James)
October 17, 2018 Filing 31 NOTICE of Appearance by James C. Goodfellow, Jr on behalf of Does, Henkel of America, Inc. (Goodfellow, James)
October 5, 2018 Filing 30 NOTICE TO COUNSEL IN TRANSFERRED CASE Signed by Clerk on 10/5/2018.(Anastasio, F.)
October 3, 2018 Filing 29 NOTICE: ANY MOTIONS PENDING AT THE TIME OF TRANSFER MUST BE REFILED IN OUR DISTRICT. Signed by Clerk on 10/3/2018.(Anastasio, F.)
October 3, 2018 Filing 28 NOTICE TO COUNSEL NOT ADMITTED TO THE BAR OF THE US DISTRICT COURT OF CONNECTICUT Re: Local Rule 83.1 Admission of Attorneys. The above captioned case has been received and filed in our court. Please see our Local Rule 83.1 regarding Admission of Attorneys that is available on our website at www.ctd.uscourts.gov. You will not be added to the case, nor will we accept further filings until you have complied with Local Rule 83.1. If you have any questions about this procedure, please contact the Clerk's Office. Signed by Clerk on 10/3/2018.(Anastasio, F.)
October 3, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 27 Standing Order re: Discovery Signed by Judge Janet C. Hall on 10/3/2018.(Anastasio, F.)
October 3, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ELECTRONIC FILING ORDER FOR COUNSEL - PLEASE ENSURE COMPLIANCE WITH COURTESY COPY REQUIREMENTS IN THIS ORDER Signed by Judge Janet C. Hall on 10/3/2018.(Anastasio, F.)
October 3, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 25 STANDING PROTECTIVE ORDER Signed by Judge Janet C. Hall on 10/3/2018.(Anastasio, F.)
October 3, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 24 Order on Pretrial Deadlines: Amended Pleadings due by 12/4/2018 Discovery due by 4/6/2019 Dispositive Motions due by 5/11/2019 Signed by Clerk on 10/3/2018.(Anastasio, F.)
October 3, 2018 Filing 23 Case electronically transferred in from District of California Central; Case Number 8:18-cv-01128. Modified on 10/5/2018 TO CORRECT THE DATE FILED (Oliver, T.).
October 3, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 22 MINUTES (IN CHAMBERS) ORDER GRANTING DEFENDANTS' MOTION TO TRANSFER VENUE (Doc. #12 ) by Judge Josephine L. Staton: For the foregoing reasons, Defendants Motion to Transfer is GRANTED and the case is ORDERED transferred to the District of Connecticut in Hartford, Connecticut. *SEE ORDER FOR FURTHER DETAILS. ( MD JS-6. Case Terminated ) (es)
September 27, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 21 MINUTES (IN CHAMBERS) ORDER TAKING DEFENDANTS' MOTION TO TRANSFER UNDER SUBMISSION (Doc. #12 ) by Judge Josephine L. Staton: The Court finds this matter appropriate for decision without oral argument. Accordingly, the hearing set for September 28, 2018, at 2:30 p.m., is VACATED, and the Court takes the matter UNDER SUBMISSION (es)
September 21, 2018 Filing 20 (McKennon, Robert)
September 21, 2018 Filing 19 (McKennon, Robert)
September 14, 2018 Filing 18 REPLY in support of a motion NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case or, in the Alternative to Transfer Venue #12 ; Memorandum of Points and Authorities filed by Defendant Henkel of America, Inc.. (Belzer, Aaron)
September 13, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER ON APPLICATION OF NON-RESIDENT ATTORNEY TO APPEAR IN A SPECIFIC CASE PRO HAC VICE by Judge Josephine L. Staton: granting #16 Non-Resident Attorney Morrision, Ian H. APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendant, Henkel of American Inc, designating Belzer, Aaron as local counsel. (yl)
September 12, 2018 Filing 16 APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Ian H. Morrison to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendant Henkel of America, Inc. (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $400 Fee Paid, Receipt No. 0973-22408660) filed by Defendant Henkel of America, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Belzer, Aaron)
September 6, 2018 Filing 15 OPPOSITION to NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case or, in the Alternative to Transfer Venue #12 filed by Plaintiffs Christy Rapp, Theodore Rapp. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Theodore Rapp, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2 part 1, #4 Exhibit 2 part 2, #5 Exhibit 2 part 3)(McKennon, Robert)
September 6, 2018 Filing 14 OPPOSITION to NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case or, in the Alternative to Transfer Venue #12 filed by Plaintiffs Christy Rapp, Theodore Rapp. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Theodore Rapp)(McKennon, Robert)
August 3, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE by Judge Josephine L. Staton. Scheduling Conference is set for 10/26/2018 at 1:30 p.m. See document for details. (tg)
August 2, 2018 Filing 12 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case or, in the Alternative to Transfer Venue filed by Defendant Henkel of America, Inc.. Motion set for hearing on 9/28/2018 at 02:30 PM before Judge Josephine L. Staton. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Barbara Molloy, #2 Exhibit A to Molloy Decl (Henkel of America Retirement Plan), #3 Exhibit B to Molloy Decl (Retirement Plan SPD), #4 Exhibit C to Molloy Decl (Letter from legal), #5 Proposed Order) (Belzer, Aaron)
July 12, 2018 Filing 11 Joint STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer the complaint as to Henkel of America, Inc. answer now due 8/2/2018, filed by Defendant Henkel of America, Inc..(Attorney Aaron Belzer added to party Henkel of America, Inc.(pty:dft))(Belzer, Aaron)
July 6, 2018 Filing 10 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents RE: Service of Summons and Complaint Returned Executed (21 days), #9 . The following error(s) was/were found: Title page is missing. In response to this notice, the Court may: (1) order an amended or correct document to be filed; (2) order the document stricken; or (3) take other action as the Court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the Court directs you to do so. (es)
July 5, 2018 Filing 9 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Theodore Rapp, Christy Rapp, upon Defendant Henkel of America, Inc. served on 6/27/2018, answer due 7/18/2018. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Becky DeGeorge, Person Authorized to Accept Service in compliance with California Code of Civil Procedure by personal service.Original Summons NOT returned. (McKennon, Robert)
June 27, 2018 Filing 8 INITIAL STANDING ORDER FOR CASES ASSIGNED TO JUDGE JOSEPHINE L. STATON (tg)
June 26, 2018 Filing 7 21 DAY Summons issued re Complaint #1 as to defendant Henkel of America, Inc. (esa)
June 26, 2018 Filing 6 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (esa)
June 26, 2018 Filing 5 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Josephine L. Staton and Magistrate Judge Charles F. Eick. (esa)
June 25, 2018 Filing 4 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties #3 , Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 , Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71) #2 filed by Plaintiffs Christy Rapp, Theodore Rapp. (McKennon, Robert)
June 25, 2018 Filing 3 Certification and NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiffs Christy Rapp, Theodore Rapp, (McKennon, Robert)
June 25, 2018 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiffs Christy Rapp, Theodore Rapp. (McKennon, Robert)
June 25, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT Receipt No: 0973-21988970 - Fee: $400, filed by Plaintiffs Theodore Rapp, Christy Rapp. (Attorney Robert J McKennon added to party Christy Rapp(pty:pla), Attorney Robert J McKennon added to party Theodore Rapp(pty:pla))(McKennon, Robert)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Connecticut District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Rapp, et al v. Henkel of America, Inc., et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Christy Rapp
Represented By: Nicholas West
Represented By: Robert J. McKennon
Represented By: David Skinner Rintoul
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Theodore Rapp
Represented By: Nicholas West
Represented By: Robert J. McKennon
Represented By: David Skinner Rintoul
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Henkel of America, Inc.
Represented By: James C. Goodfellow, Jr
Represented By: Ian H. Morrison
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1 to 10, inclusive
Represented By: James C. Goodfellow, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?