Old Gate Partners, LLC v. Owens-Illinois, Inc.

Plaintiff: Old Gate Partners, LLC
Defendant: Owens-Illinois, Inc. and Owens-Illinois, Inc
Case Number: 3:2018cv01657
Filed: October 4, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of Connecticut
Presiding Judge: Alfred V Covello
Nature of Suit: Environmental Matters
Cause of Action: 42:6901
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 20, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 19, 2018 Case Stayed per 13 Order. (Bozek, M.)
October 19, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER granting #12 motion to stay to and including January 31, 2019. Signed by Judge Alfred V. Covello on 10/19/18. (Covello, Alfred)
October 17, 2018 Filing 12 Joint MOTION to Stay Litigation by Owens-Illinois, Inc.Responses due by 11/7/2018 (Bengels, Jessica)
October 17, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER granting #10 Motion for Attorney Kegan A. Brown to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Clerk on 10/17/2018. (Bozek, M.)
October 16, 2018 Filing 10 MOTION for Attorney(s) Kegan A. Brown to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (paid $75 PHV fee; receipt number ACTDC-5011050) by Owens-Illinois, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Affidavit of Kegan A. Brown, #2 Exhibit B - Certificate of Good Standing)(Bengels, Jessica)
October 16, 2018 Filing 9 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Owens-Illinois, Inc. (Bengels, Jessica)
October 16, 2018 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Jessica L Bengels on behalf of Owens-Illinois, Inc (Bengels, Jessica)
October 16, 2018 Filing 7 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Supplemental Return Certified Mail - Green Card served on Owens-Illinois, Inc. on 10/12/2018, filed by Old Gate Partners, LLC. (Elliott, Brenton)
October 9, 2018 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Old Gate Partners, LLC. Owens-Illinois, Inc served on 10/5/2018, answer due 10/26/2018. (Attachments: #1 Documents Served, #2 Certified Mail Receipt)(Elliott, Brenton)
October 5, 2018 Filing 5 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED in accordance with Fed. R. Civ. P. 4 and LR 4 as to *Owens-Illinois, Inc* with answer to complaint due within *21* days. Attorney *Patrick Joseph Sullivan* *Law Offices of Patrick J. Sullivan, PLLC* *92 Willis Avenue, Second Floor* *Mineola, NY 11501*. (Bozek, M.)
October 5, 2018 Filing 4 NOTICE TO COUNSEL/SELF-REPRESENTED PARTIES : Counsel or self-represented parties initiating or removing this action are responsible for serving all parties with attached documents and copies of #1 Complaint filed by Old Gate Partners, LLC, Request to Issue Summons, #2 Order on Pretrial Deadlines, and #3 Electronic Filing Order. Signed by Clerk on 10/5/2018.(Bozek, M.)
October 4, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ELECTRONIC FILING ORDER FOR COUNSEL - PLEASE ENSURE COMPLIANCE WITH COURTESY COPY REQUIREMENTS IN THIS ORDER. Signed by Judge Alfred V. Covello on 10/4/2018.(Bozek, M.)
October 4, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 2 Order on Pretrial Deadlines: Amended Pleadings due by 12/3/2018. Discovery due by 4/5/2019. Dispositive Motions due by 5/10/2019. Signed by Clerk on 10/4/2018.(Bozek, M.)
October 4, 2018 Judge Alfred V. Covello added. (Oliver, T.)
October 4, 2018 Request for Clerk to issue summons as to Owens-Illinois, Inc.. (Sullivan, Patrick)
October 4, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Owens-Illinois, Inc. ( Filing fee $400 receipt number ACTDC-4997014.), filed by Old Gate Partners, LLC.(Sullivan, Patrick)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Connecticut District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Old Gate Partners, LLC v. Owens-Illinois, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Old Gate Partners, LLC
Represented By: Patrick Joseph Sullivan
Represented By: Brenton James Elliott
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Owens-Illinois, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Owens-Illinois, Inc
Represented By: Jessica L Bengels
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?