Pepin v. Snap RTO, LLC et al
Plaintiff: Dean Pepin
Defendant: SNAP RTO, LLC, Khater International, LLC and Ahmed Mohammed
Case Number: 3:2018cv01667
Filed: October 8, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of Connecticut
Presiding Judge: Vanessa L Bryant
Nature of Suit: Truth in Lending
Cause of Action: 15:1640
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 19, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 19, 2018 Filing 11 ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF SERVICE Executed as to SNAP RTO, LLC Acknowledgment filed by Dean Pepin. (Blinn, Daniel)
October 18, 2018 Filing 10 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Dean Pepin. Ahmed Mohammed served on 10/16/2018, answer due 11/6/2018. (Blinn, Daniel)
October 18, 2018 Filing 9 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Dean Pepin. Khater International, LLC served on 10/16/2018, answer due 11/6/2018. (Blinn, Daniel)
October 18, 2018 Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Dean Pepin. Snap RTO, LLC served on 10/11/2018, answer due 11/1/2018. (Blinn, Daniel)
October 10, 2018 Filing 7 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED in accordance with Fed. R. Civ. P. 4 and LR 4 as to *Khater International, LLC, Ahmed Mohammed, Snap RTO, LLC* with answer to complaint due within *21* days. Attorney *Daniel S. Blinn* *Consumer Law Group* *35 Cold Spring Rd., Suite 512* *Rocky Hill, CT 06067*. (Murphy, Tatihana)
October 10, 2018 Filing 6 NOTICE TO COUNSEL/SELF-REPRESENTED PARTIES : Counsel or self-represented parties initiating or removing this action are responsible for serving all parties with attached documents and copies of #1 Complaint filed by Dean Pepin, #3 Electronic Filing Order, #4 Standing Protective Order, #2 Order on Pretrial Deadlines, #5 Order Re: Chambers Practices Signed by Clerk on 10/10/2018.(Murphy, Tatihana)
October 8, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER RE: Judge's Chambers Practices. Counsel are directed to read and comply with the Chambers Practices and Standing Orders prior to filing any document. So ordered Signed by Judge Vanessa L. Bryant on 10/08/2018.(Murphy, Tatihana)
October 8, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 4 STANDING PROTECTIVE ORDER Signed by Judge Vanessa L. Bryant on 10/08/2018.(Murphy, Tatihana)
October 8, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ELECTRONIC FILING ORDER FOR COUNSEL - PLEASE ENSURE COMPLIANCE WITH COURTESY COPY REQUIREMENTS IN THIS ORDER Signed by Judge Vanessa L. Bryant on 10/8/2018.(Murphy, Tatihana)
October 8, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 2 Order on Pretrial Deadlines: Amended Pleadings due by 12/7/2018. Discovery due by 4/9/2019. Dispositive Motions due by 5/14/2019. Signed by Clerk on 10/08/2018.(Murphy, Tatihana)
October 8, 2018 Judge Vanessa L. Bryant added. (Oliver, T.)
October 8, 2018 Request for Clerk to issue summons as to SNAP RTO, LLC. (Blinn, Daniel)
October 8, 2018 Request for Clerk to issue summons as to Ahmed Mohammed. (Blinn, Daniel)
October 8, 2018 Request for Clerk to issue summons as to Khater International, LLC. (Blinn, Daniel)
October 8, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Khater International, LLC, Ahmed Mohammed, SNAP RTO, LLC ( Filing fee $400 receipt number ACTDC-4999512.), filed by Dean Pepin.(Blinn, Daniel)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Connecticut District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Pepin v. Snap RTO, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SNAP RTO, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Khater International, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ahmed Mohammed
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dean Pepin
Represented By: Daniel S. Blinn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?