Mohan v. Aetna Life Ins. Co.
Plaintiff: Mark Mohan
Defendant: Aetna Life Ins. Co.
Case Number: 3:2018cv01674
Filed: October 9, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of Connecticut
Presiding Judge: Alvin W Thompson
Nature of Suit: Labor: E.R.I.S.A.
Cause of Action: 29:1132
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 7, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 7, 2018 Filing 19 First AFFIDAVIT re #18 Memorandum in Opposition to Motion to Remand Signed By Pamela S. Giacomini filed by Aetna Life Ins. Co.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Ex. 1 - Signed CT Master Application, #2 Exhibit Ex. 2 - Copy of Policy 62399, #3 Exhibit Ex. 3 - Book-Cert 13, #4 Exhibit Ex. 4 - SOB 13, #5 Exhibit Ex. 5 - Book-Cert 1, #6 Exhibit Ex. 6 - SOB 1, #7 Exhibit Ex. 7 - Group Policy Rider June 2015, #8 Exhibit Ex. 8 - Book-Cert 14, #9 Exhibit Ex. 9 - SOB 14, #10 Exhibit Ex. 10 - Excerpt from UBS 2016 Form 5500, #11 Exhibit Ex. 11 - Disability Postcard UBS)(Pomeroy, Scott)
December 7, 2018 Filing 18 First Memorandum in Opposition re #13 First MOTION to Remand to State Court filed by Aetna Life Ins. Co.. (Pomeroy, Scott)
November 14, 2018 Set/Reset Deadlines as to #13 First MOTION to Remand to State Court . Responses due by 12/7/2018. (Ferguson, L.)
November 14, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER: Joint Motion to Extend the Briefing Deadlines on Plaintiff's Motion to Remand (ECF No. #15 ) is hereby GRANTED. The defendant's response to the plaintiff's Motion to Remand (ECF No. #13 ) is due 12/7/2018 and any reply is due 12/28/2018. It is so ordered. Signed by Judge Alvin W. Thompson on 11/14/18. (Patel, R.)
November 14, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER: Joint Motion to Extend Time to Answer or Otherwise Respond Pending Remand Proceedings (ECF No. #14 ) is hereby GRANTED. The deadline to respond to the plaintiff's Complaint is extended to 30 days after the court rules on the plaintiff's motion to remand (ECF No. #13 ). It is so ordered. Signed by Judge Alvin W. Thompson on 11/14/18. (Patel, R.)
November 8, 2018 Filing 15 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #13 First MOTION to Remand to State Court until 12/07/2018 by Aetna Life Ins. Co.. (Pomeroy, Scott)
November 8, 2018 Filing 14 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to Answer or Otherwise Respond Pending Remand Proceedings by Aetna Life Ins. Co.. (Pomeroy, Scott)
November 5, 2018 Filing 13 First MOTION to Remand to State Court by Mark Mohan.Responses due by 11/26/2018 (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Affidavit of Plaintiff, #2 Exhibit 2019 Benefit Brochure)(Jacobs, Bruce)
October 17, 2018 Answer deadline updated for Aetna Life Ins. Co. to 11/15/2018. (Ferguson, L.)
October 17, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER: Parties' Stipulation and Proposed Order Extending Time to Answer or Otherwise Plead (Doc. No. #9 ) is hereby APPROVED. The defendant is granted an extension up to and including 11/15/18. It is so ordered. Signed by Judge Alvin W. Thompson on 10/17/18. (Patel, Ranit)
October 15, 2018 Filing 11 NOTICE by Aetna Life Ins. Co. of No Pending Motions in State Court (Pomeroy, Scott)
October 15, 2018 Filing 10 NOTICE by Aetna Life Ins. Co. of Compliance with Standing Order on Removed Cases (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Standing Order on Removed Cases)(Pomeroy, Scott)
October 15, 2018 Filing 9 Joint STIPULATION & PROPOSED ORDER by Aetna Life Ins. Co.. (Pomeroy, Scott)
October 9, 2018 Filing 8 NOTICE TO COUNSEL: Counsel or self-represented parties initiating or removing this action are responsible for serving all parties with attached documents and copies of #5 Order on Pretrial Deadlines, #3 Exhibit filed by Aetna Life Ins. Co., #1 Notice of Removal, filed by Aetna Life Ins. Co., #4 Notice of Appearance filed by Aetna Life Ins. Co., #2 Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Aetna Life Ins. Co., #7 Protective Order, #6 Electronic Filing Order Signed by Clerk on 10/9/2018. (Attachment: #1 Removal Standing Order)(Enderlin, M.)
October 9, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 7 STANDING PROTECTIVE ORDER Signed by Judge Alvin W. Thompson on 10/9/2018.(Enderlin, M.)
October 9, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ELECTRONIC FILING ORDER FOR COUNSEL - PLEASE ENSURE COMPLIANCE WITH COURTESY COPY REQUIREMENTS IN THIS ORDER Signed by Judge Alvin W. Thompson on 10/9/2018.(Enderlin, M.)
October 9, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 5 Order on Pretrial Deadlines: Amended Pleadings due by 12/8/2018 Discovery due by 4/10/2019 Dispositive Motions due by 5/15/2019 Signed by Clerk on 10/9/2018.(Enderlin, M.)
October 9, 2018 Judge Alvin W. Thompson added. (Anastasio, F.)
October 9, 2018 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Scott K. Pomeroy on behalf of Aetna Life Ins. Co. (Pomeroy, Scott)
October 9, 2018 Filing 3 EXHIBIT Civil Cover Sheet by Aetna Life Ins. Co. re #1 Notice of Removal,. (Pomeroy, Scott)
October 9, 2018 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Aetna Life Ins. Co. identifying Corporate Parent Aetna Inc. for Aetna Life Ins. Co.. (Pomeroy, Scott)
October 9, 2018 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Aetna Life Ins. Co. from Connecticut Superior Court Judicial District of New Haven, case number NNH-CV18-6085385-S. Filing fee $ 400 receipt number BCTDC-5000739, filed by Aetna Life Ins. Co.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Complaint, #2 Exhibit B - Notice of Filing, #3 Exhibit C - Summons, #4 Exhibit D - Return of Service, #5 Exhibit E - Docket Sheet)(Pomeroy, Scott)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Connecticut District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Mohan v. Aetna Life Ins. Co.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mark Mohan
Represented By: Bruce D. Jacobs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Aetna Life Ins. Co.
Represented By: Scott K. Pomeroy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?