In re: Savvidis
Appellant: Anastasios Savvidis
Undetermined: US Trustee
Interested Party: Roberta Napolitano
Appellee: Bank of New York
Case Number: 3:2018cv01703
Filed: October 12, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of Connecticut
Presiding Judge: Janet C Hall
Nature of Suit: Bankruptcy Appeal (801)
Cause of Action: 28:0158
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 6, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 6, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE: Appellant Anastasios Savvidis is hereby Ordered to Show Cause why the appellants Notice of Appeal from Bankruptcy Court (Doc. No. 1) should not be dismissed for failure to timely comply with Federal Rule of Bankruptcy Procedure 8009. Savvidis filed his Notice of Appeal with the court on October 12, 2018. Federal Rule of Bankruptcy Procedure 8009(a)(1) requires the appellant to file with the bankruptcy clerk and serve on the appellee a designation of the items to be included in the record on appeal and a statement of the issues to be presented within 14 days after the notice of appeal becomes effective or an order granting leave to appeal is entered. Fed. R. Bankr. P. 8009(a)(1). As of this date, Savvidis has not filed or served the required designation and statement. Therefore, he is Ordered to Show Cause by December 26, 2018, why this case should not be dismissed. Failure to show good cause will result in dismissal of his appeal. Show Cause Response due by 12/26/2018 Signed by Judge Janet C. Hall on 12/6/2018.(Lewis, D)
November 28, 2018 Filing 6 No Designation or Agreed Statement Filed (RE:) 34 Notice of Appeal to District Court 18-1703 (JCH). (Fanelle, N.)
October 12, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 5 STANDING ORDER re: Discovery Signed by Judge Janet C. Hall on 10/12/2018.(Fanelle, N.)
October 12, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 4 STANDING PROTECTIVE ORDER Signed by Judge Janet C. Hall on 10/12/2018. (Fanelle, N.)
October 12, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ELECTRONIC FILING ORDER FOR COUNSEL - PLEASE ENSURE COMPLIANCE WITH COURTESY COPY REQUIREMENTS IN THIS ORDER Signed by Judge Janet C. Hall on 10/12/2018. (Fanelle, N.)
October 12, 2018 Filing 2 USBC Transmittal Form (Fanelle, N.)
October 12, 2018 Filing 1 Notice of APPEAL FROM BANKRUPTCY COURT. Bankruptcy Court case number(s) 18-50975, filed by Anastasios Savvidis. (Attachments: #1 Order #28)(Fanelle, N.)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Connecticut District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: In re: Savvidis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: Anastasios Savvidis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Undetermined: US Trustee
Represented By: US Trustee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: Roberta Napolitano
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: Bank of New York
Represented By: Linda J. St. Pierre
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?