Trustees of Local 371 United Food and Commercial Workers Union Amalgamated Welfare Trust Fund et al v. Whitney Manor Operating Company, LLC

Plaintiff: Local 371 United Food and Commercial Workers Union and Trustees of Local 371 United Food and Commercial Workers Union Amalgamated Welfare Trust Fund
Defendant: Whitney Manor Operating Company, LLC
Case Number: 3:2018cv01729
Filed: October 18, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of Connecticut
Presiding Judge: Warren W Eginton
Nature of Suit: Labor: E.R.I.S.A.
Cause of Action: 29:1132
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 3, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 3, 2018 JUDICIAL PROCEEDINGS SURVEY - FOR COUNSEL ONLY: The following link to the confidential survey requires you to log into CM/ECF for SECURITY purposes. Once in CM/ECF you will be prompted for the case number. Although you are receiving this survey through CM/ECF, it is hosted on an independent website called SurveyMonkey. Once in SurveyMonkey, the survey is located in a secure account. The survey is not docketed and it is not sent directly to the judge. To ensure anonymity, completed surveys are held up to 90 days before they are sent to the judge for review. We hope you will take this opportunity to participate, please click on this link: https://ecf.ctd.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/Dispatch.pl?survey (Imbriani, Susan)
December 3, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER granting #22 Motion to Vacate So Order re: #23 Stipulation. Signed by Judge Warren W. Eginton on 12/3/2018. This case can be closed. (LaMura, K.)
December 3, 2018 Filing 23 STIPULATION of Settlement and Dismissal by Local 371 United Food and Commercial Workers Union, Trustees of Local 371 United Food and Commercial Workers Union Amalgamated Welfare Trust Fund. (Radshaw, John)
December 3, 2018 Filing 22 MOTION to Vacate #15 Order of Pre-Judgment Attachment by Local 371 United Food and Commercial Workers Union, Trustees of Local 371 United Food and Commercial Workers Union Amalgamated Welfare Trust Fund. (Radshaw, John)
November 28, 2018 Filing 21 AFFIDAVIT of Service for ORDER of pre-judgment attachment, ECF #15 served on Roderick L. Bremby, Commissioner CT DSS on 11/16/2018, filed by Local 371 United Food and Commercial Workers Union, Trustees of Local 371 United Food and Commercial Workers Union Amalgamated Welfare Trust Fund. (Radshaw, John)
November 15, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER granting #19 Motion for Disclosure. Signed by Judge Warren W. Eginton on 11/15/18. (Ladd-Smith, I.)
November 14, 2018 Filing 19 MOTION for Disclosure of Assets by Local 371 United Food and Commercial Workers Union, Trustees of Local 371 United Food and Commercial Workers Union Amalgamated Welfare Trust Fund. (Radshaw, John) (Additional attachment(s) added on 11/15/2018: #1 REPLACEMENT PDF) (Fazekas, J.).
November 14, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER granting #17 Motion for Appointment of Special Process Server. State Marshal Robert S. Miller is hereby appointed to serve papers in this action. So ordered. Signed by Judge Warren W. Eginton on 11/14/18. (Ladd-Smith, I.)
November 14, 2018 Filing 17 MOTION for Appointment of Special Process Server by Local 371 United Food and Commercial Workers Union, Trustees of Local 371 United Food and Commercial Workers Union Amalgamated Welfare Trust Fund. (Radshaw, John)
November 13, 2018 Filing 16 Minute Entry. Proceedings held before Judge Warren W. Eginton: finding as moot #6 Motion for Preliminary Injunction; granting #6 Motion for Prejudgment Remedy; finding as moot #6 Motion for TRO; Motion Hearing held on 11/13/2018 re #6 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction MOTION for Prejudgment Remedy MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order filed by Local 371 United Food and Commercial Workers Union, Trustees of Local 371 United Food and Commercial Workers Union Amalgamated Welfare Trust Fund. Total Time: 6 minutes(Court Reporter BCT Reporting.) (Gould, K.)
November 13, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER of pre-judgment attachment in the stipulated amount of $300,000. Signed by Judge Warren W. Eginton on 11/13/18.(Ladd-Smith, I.)
November 13, 2018 Filing 14 NOTICE of Appearance by Warren L. Holcomb on behalf of Whitney Manor Operating Company, LLC (Holcomb, Warren)
November 9, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 13 SCHEDULING ORDER: Injunction hearing is continued (4 hrs) to November 13, 2018, at 2:00 p.m. Signed by Judge Warren W. Eginton on 11/9/18.(Ladd-Smith, I.)
November 7, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 12 SCHEDULING ORDER: Injunction hearing set for November 13, 2018, at 10:00 a.m. Signed by Judge Warren W. Eginton on 11/7/18.(Ladd-Smith, I.)
October 31, 2018 Filing 11 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Trustees of Local 371 United Food and Commercial Workers Union Amalgamated Welfare Trust Fund, Local 371 United Food and Commercial Workers Union. Whitney Manor Operating Company, LLC served on 10/30/2018, answer due 11/20/2018. (Radshaw, John)
October 31, 2018 Filing 10 AFFIDAVIT of Service for (1) Order to Show Cause, TRO, (2) Application for Prejudgment Remedy and Order to Show Cause, (3) Memorandum of Law in support, (4) Declaration of Fedumenti, (5) Order to Show Cause with Temporary Restraining Order (Proposed), (6) Order of Pre-Judgment Attachment, (7) Notice of Rights, and (8) (8) Summons, (9) Complaint with Civil Cover Sheet, (10) Order on Pretrial Deadlines, (11) Electronic Filing Order, (12) Standing Protective Order, and (13) Notice to Counsel and Pro Se Parties served on Whitney Manor Operating Company, LLC on 10/30/2018, filed by Local 371 United Food and Commercial Workers Union, Trustees of Local 371 United Food and Commercial Workers Union Amalgamated Welfare Trust Fund. (Radshaw, John)
October 29, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 9 TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER Signed by Judge Warren W. Eginton on 10/29/18.(Ladd-Smith, I.)
October 29, 2018 Filing 8 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Local 371 United Food and Commercial Workers Union, Trustees of Local 371 United Food and Commercial Workers Union Amalgamated Welfare Trust Fund. (Radshaw, John)
October 29, 2018 Filing 7 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED in accordance with Fed. R. Civ. P. 4 and LR 4 as to *Whitney Manor Operating Company, LLC* with answer to complaint due within *21* days. Attorney *John J. Radshaw, III* *900 Chapel Street Suite 620* *New Haven, CT 06510* (Fazekas, J.)
October 28, 2018 Request for Clerk to issue summons as to Whitney Manor Operating Company, LLC. (Radshaw, John)
October 28, 2018 Filing 6 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction (Responses due by 11/18/2018, ), MOTION for Prejudgment Remedy , MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order by Local 371 United Food and Commercial Workers Union, Trustees of Local 371 United Food and Commercial Workers Union Amalgamated Welfare Trust Fund. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Affidavit of Barbara Fedumenti, #3 Text of Proposed Order to Show Cause and TRO, #4 Text of Proposed Order of Attachment, #5 Notice of Rights)(Radshaw, John)
October 19, 2018 Filing 5 NOTICE TO COUNSEL/SELF-REPRESENTED PARTIES : Counsel or self-represented parties initiating or removing this action are responsible for serving all parties with attached documents and copies of #3 Electronic Filing Order, #2 Order on Pretrial Deadlines, #1 Complaint, filed by Local 371 United Food and Commercial Workers Union, Trustees of Local 371 United Food and Commercial Workers Union Amalgamated Welfare Trust Fund, #4 Standing Protective Order Signed by Clerk on 10/18/2018.(Fazekas, J.)
October 18, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 4 STANDING PROTECTIVE ORDER Signed by Judge Warren W. Eginton on 10/18/2018.(Fazekas, J.)
October 18, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ELECTRONIC FILING ORDER FOR COUNSEL - PLEASE ENSURE COMPLIANCE WITH COURTESY COPY REQUIREMENTS IN THIS ORDER Signed by Judge Warren W. Eginton on 10/18/2018.(Fazekas, J.)
October 18, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 2 Order on Pretrial Deadlines: Amended Pleadings due by 12/17/2018. Discovery due by 4/19/2019. Dispositive Motions due by 5/24/2019. Signed by Clerk on 10/18/2018.(Fazekas, J.)
October 18, 2018 Judge Warren W. Eginton added. (Oliver, T.)
October 18, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Whitney Manor Operating Company, LLC ( Filing fee $400 receipt number ACTDC-5014951.), filed by Trustees of Local 371 United Food and Commercial Workers Union Amalgamated Welfare Trust Fund, Local 371 United Food and Commercial Workers Union. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Radshaw, John)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Connecticut District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Trustees of Local 371 United Food and Commercial Workers Union Amalgamated Welfare Trust Fund et al v. Whitney Manor Operating Company, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Local 371 United Food and Commercial Workers Union
Represented By: John J. Radshaw, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Trustees of Local 371 United Food and Commercial Workers Union Amalgamated Welfare Trust Fund
Represented By: John J. Radshaw, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Whitney Manor Operating Company, LLC
Represented By: Warren L. Holcomb
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?