USA v. $33,075.00 in United States Currency et al

Plaintiff: USA
Defendant: $33,075.00 in United States Currency
Claimant: David Class
Case Number: 3:2018cv01737
Filed: October 22, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of Connecticut
Presiding Judge: Michael P Shea
Nature of Suit: Drug Related Seizure of Property
Cause of Action: 21:881
Jury Demanded By: Defendant

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 17, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 17, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER. This forfeiture action brought under 21 U.S.C. 881 is exempt from the initial disclosure and conference requirements of Fed. R. Civ. P. 26. Nonetheless, to facilitate a just and speedy determination of the case, the Court hereby ORDERS the parties to confer and file within 44 days, or by January 30, 2019, a joint document setting forth a proposed case management plan addressing discovery and the deadlines therefor, any anticipated motions and a schedule therefor (such as dispositive motions), and a proposed trial date.Signed by Judge Michael P. Shea on 12/17/2018.(Barclay, Michael)
December 14, 2018 Filing 13 claimant ANSWER to #1 Complaint with Affirmative Defenses with jury demand by David Class. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit notice of claim)(Bongiorni, Vincent)
December 14, 2018 Filing 12 NOTICE of Appearance by Vincent A. Bongiorni on behalf of David Class (Bongiorni, Vincent)
December 4, 2018 Filing 11 CERTIFICATE OF GOOD STANDING re #8 MOTION for Attorney(s) Vincent A. Bongiorni to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice by David Class. (Santos, Hubert)
December 3, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER. Because the Clerk has granted the #8 motion for pro hac vice admission, the #6 motion is DENIED as moot. For clarity, this Order should not be construed as a denial of a pro hac vice motion for purposes of any of the attorney's future applications for admission. Signed by Judge Michael P. Shea on 12/3/2018. (Barclay, Michael)
December 3, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER granting #8 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice Certificate of Good Standing due by 2/1/2019. Signed by Clerk on 12/03/2018. (Murphy, Tatihana)
November 30, 2018 Filing 8 MOTION for Attorney(s) Vincent A. Bongiorni to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice by David Class. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Amended Affidavit of Bongiorni)(Santos, Hubert)
November 28, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER. D. Conn. Local Rule 83.1(d)(1)(b) requires an affidavit accompanying a motion for pro hac vice admission to "identify[] the bar of each court of which said attorney is and has ever been a member, and the corresponding bar identification number(s); or if no such numbers have been assigned, so stating." The [6-1] affidavit does not comply with this requirement. Counsel shall submit a corrected affidavit that complies with this requirement within 7 days. Failure to submit such affidavit may lead to denial of the motion. Signed by Judge Michael P. Shea on 11/28/2018. (Barclay, Michael)
November 27, 2018 Filing 6 MOTION for Attorney(s) Vincent A. Bongiorni to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (paid $75 PHV fee; receipt number ACTDC-5063957) by David Class. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Vincent A. Bongiorni)(Santos, Hubert)
October 23, 2018 Filing 5 NOTICE TO COUNSEL/SELF-REPRESENTED PARTIES : Counsel or self-represented parties initiating or removing this action are responsible for serving all parties with attached documents and copies of #4 Protective Order, #1 Complaint filed by USA, #2 Order on Pretrial Deadlines, #3 Electronic Filing Order Signed by Clerk on 10/23/2018.(Peterson, M)
October 22, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 4 STANDING PROTECTIVE ORDER Signed by Judge Michael P. Shea on 10/22/2018. (Peterson, M)
October 22, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ELECTRONIC FILING ORDER FOR COUNSEL - PLEASE ENSURE COMPLIANCE WITH COURTESY COPY REQUIREMENTS IN THIS ORDER Signed by Judge Michael P. Shea on 10/22/2018. (Peterson, M)
October 22, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 2 Order on Pretrial Deadlines: Amended Pleadings due by 12/21/2018. Discovery due by 4/23/2019. Dispositive Motions due by 5/28/2019. Signed by Clerk on 10/22/2018. (Peterson, M)
October 22, 2018 Judge Michael P. Shea added. (Oliver, T.)
October 22, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against $33,075.00 in United States Currency, filed by USA.(Sullivan, David)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Connecticut District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: USA v. $33,075.00 in United States Currency et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: $33,075.00 in United States Currency
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: David Class
Represented By: Vincent A. Bongiorni
Represented By: Hubert J. Santos
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: USA
Represented By: John B. Hughes
Represented By: David X. Sullivan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?