Trustees of the New England Carpenters Health Benefits Funds et al v. MCM Acoustics, LLC et al
Plaintiff: Trustees of the New England Carpenters Health Benefits Funds, Trustees of the New England Carpenters Pension Fund and Trustees of the Southern New England Carpenters Annuity Fund
Defendant: MCM Acoustics, LLC and Michael Gallimore
Case Number: 3:2018cv01741
Filed: October 22, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of Connecticut
Presiding Judge: Janet Bond Arterton
Nature of Suit: Labor: E.R.I.S.A.
Cause of Action: 29:1002
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 15, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 15, 2018 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Trustees of the New England Carpenters Health Benefits Funds, Trustees of the Southern New England Carpenters Annuity Fund, Trustees of the New England Carpenters Pension Fund. Michael Gallimore served on 11/5/2018, answer due 11/26/2018; MCM Acoustics, LLC served on 11/6/2018, answer due 11/27/2018. (Gould, Nancy)
October 25, 2018 Filing 6 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED in accordance with Fed. R. Civ. P. 4 and LR 4 as to *Michael Gallimore, MCM Acoustics, LLC* with answer to complaint due within *21* days. Attorney *Nancy Ellen Gould* *Gould Killian LLP* *280 Trumbull St., 21st Fl.* *Hartford, CT 06447*. (Freberg, B)
October 23, 2018 Request for Clerk to issue summons as to Michael Gallimore, MCM Acoustics, LLC. (Gould, Nancy)
October 22, 2018 Filing 5 NOTICE TO COUNSEL/SELF-REPRESENTED PARTIES : Counsel or self-represented parties initiating or removing this action are responsible for serving all parties with attached documents and copies of #3 Electronic Filing Order, #1 Complaint, filed by Trustees of the Southern New England Carpenters Annuity Fund, Trustees of the New England Carpenters Pension Fund, Trustees of the New England Carpenters Health Benefits Funds, #2 Order on Pretrial Deadlines, #4 Protective Order Signed by Clerk on 10/22/18.(Pesta, J.)
October 22, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 4 STANDING PROTECTIVE ORDER Signed by Judge Janet Bond Arterton on 10/22/18.(Pesta, J.)
October 22, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ELECTRONIC FILING ORDER FOR COUNSEL - PLEASE ENSURE COMPLIANCE WITH COURTESY COPY REQUIREMENTS IN THIS ORDER Signed by Judge Janet Bond Arterton on 10/22/18.(Pesta, J.)
October 22, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 2 Order on Pretrial Deadlines: Amended Pleadings due by 12/21/2018 Discovery due by 4/23/2019 Dispositive Motions due by 5/28/2019 Signed by Clerk on 10/22/18.(Pesta, J.)
October 22, 2018 Judge Janet Bond Arterton added. (Oliver, T.)
October 22, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Michael Gallimore, MCM Acoustics, LLC ( Filing fee $400 receipt number ACTDC-5018031.), filed by Trustees of the New England Carpenters Health Benefit Funds, Trustees of the Southern New England Carpenters Annuity Fund, Trustees of the New England Carpenters Pension Fund.(Gould, Nancy)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Connecticut District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Trustees of the New England Carpenters Health Benefits Funds et al v. MCM Acoustics, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Trustees of the New England Carpenters Health Benefits Funds
Represented By: Nancy Ellen Gould
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Trustees of the New England Carpenters Pension Fund
Represented By: Nancy Ellen Gould
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Trustees of the Southern New England Carpenters Annuity Fund
Represented By: Nancy Ellen Gould
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MCM Acoustics, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael Gallimore
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?