Trustees of the New England Carpenters Health Benefits Funds et al v. Orion Manufacturing, LLC
Plaintiff: Trustees of the New England Carpenters Health Benefits Funds, Trustees of the New England Carpenters Pension Fund and Trustees of the Southern New England Carpenters Annuity Fund
Defendant: Orion Manufacturing, LLC
Case Number: 3:2018cv01779
Filed: October 29, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of Connecticut
Presiding Judge: Robert N Chatigny
Nature of Suit: Labor: E.R.I.S.A.
Cause of Action: 28:1001
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 6, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 6, 2018 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Trustees of the New England Carpenters Health Benefits Funds, Trustees of the Southern New England Carpenters Annuity Fund, Trustees of the New England Carpenters Pension Fund. Orion Manufacturing, LLC served on 11/8/2018, answer due 11/29/2018. (Gould, Nancy)
October 30, 2018 Filing 6 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED in accordance with Fed. R. Civ. P. 4 and LR 4 as to *Orion Manufacturing, LLC* with answer to complaint due within *21* days. Attorney *Nancy Ellen Gould* *Gould Killian LLP* *280 Trumbull St., 21st Fl.* *Hartford, CT 06447*. (Murphy, Tatihana)
October 30, 2018 Filing 5 NOTICE TO COUNSEL/SELF-REPRESENTED PARTIES : Counsel or self-represented parties initiating or removing this action are responsible for serving all parties with attached documents and copies of #1 Complaint, filed by Trustees of the Southern New England Carpenters Annuity Fund, Trustees of the New England Carpenters Pension Fund, Trustees of the New England Carpenters Health Benefits Funds, #3 Electronic Filing Order, #2 Order on Pretrial Deadlines, #4 Standing Protective Order. Signed by Clerk on 10/30/2018.(Murphy, Tatihana)
October 29, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 4 STANDING PROTECTIVE ORDER Signed by Judge Robert N. Chatigny on 10/29/2018.(Murphy, Tatihana)
October 29, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ELECTRONIC FILING ORDER FOR COUNSEL - PLEASE ENSURE COMPLIANCE WITH COURTESY COPY REQUIREMENTS IN THIS ORDER Signed by Judge Robert N. Chatigny on 10/29/2018.(Murphy, Tatihana)
October 29, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 2 Order on Pretrial Deadlines: Amended Pleadings due by 12/28/2018. Discovery due by 4/30/2019. Dispositive Motions due by 6/4/2019. Signed by Clerk on 10/29/2018.(Murphy, Tatihana)
October 29, 2018 Judge Robert N. Chatigny added. (Oliver, T.)
October 29, 2018 Request for Clerk to issue summons as to Orion Manufacturing, LLC. (Gould, Nancy)
October 29, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Orion Manufacturing, LLC ( Filing fee $400 receipt number ACTDC-5027187.), filed by Trustees of the New England Carpenters Health Benefits Funds, Trustees of the Southern New England Carpenters Annuity Fund, Trustees of the New England Carpenters Pension Fund.(Gould, Nancy)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Connecticut District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Trustees of the New England Carpenters Health Benefits Funds et al v. Orion Manufacturing, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Trustees of the New England Carpenters Health Benefits Funds
Represented By: Nancy Ellen Gould
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Trustees of the New England Carpenters Pension Fund
Represented By: Nancy Ellen Gould
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Trustees of the Southern New England Carpenters Annuity Fund
Represented By: Nancy Ellen Gould
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Orion Manufacturing, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?