Graham v. National Railroad Passenger Corporation et al
Plaintiff: Ricky Graham
Defendant: National Railroad Passenger Corporation and National Railroad Passenger Corporation doing business as Amtrak
Case Number: 3:2018cv01788
Filed: October 30, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of Connecticut
Presiding Judge: Michael P Shea
Nature of Suit: Torts to Land
Cause of Action: 28:1348
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 1, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 19, 2018 Filing 10 ANSWER to #1 Complaint with Affirmative Defenses with Jury Demand by National Railroad Passenger Corporation.(Charkow, Andrew)
December 19, 2018 Filing 9 Corporate Disclosure Statement by National Railroad Passenger Corporation identifying Other Affiliate American Financial Group, Inc., Other Affiliate Canadian Pacific Railway, Other Affiliate Berkshire Hathaway, Other Affiliate Burlington Northern & Santa Fe LLC, Other Affiliate Canadian National Railway, Other Affiliate Passenger Railroad Insurance Limited, Other Affiliate Washington Terminal Company, Other Affiliate American Premier Underwriters, Inc. for National Railroad Passenger Corporation. (Charkow, Andrew)
December 19, 2018 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Andrew Brian Charkow on behalf of National Railroad Passenger Corporation (Charkow, Andrew)
November 2, 2018 Filing 7 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed as to National Railroad Passenger Corporation waiver sent on 11/1/2018, answer due 12/31/2018 filed by Ricky Graham. (Zamat, Michael)
October 31, 2018 Filing 6 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED in accordance with Fed. R. Civ. P. 4 and LR 4 as to *National Railroad Passenger Corporation* with answer to complaint due within *21* days. Attorney *Michael Andrew Zamat* *Peterson Zamat, LLC* *2000 Post Road ste 205* *Fairfield, CT 06824*. (Peterson, M)
October 31, 2018 Filing 5 NOTICE TO COUNSEL/SELF-REPRESENTED PARTIES : Counsel or self-represented parties initiating or removing this action are responsible for serving all parties with attached documents and copies of #4 Protective Order, #3 Electronic Filing Order, #1 Complaint filed by Ricky Graham, #2 Order on Pretrial Deadlines Signed by Clerk on 10/31/2018.(Peterson, M)
October 30, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 4 STANDING PROTECTIVE ORDER Signed by Judge Michael P. Shea on 10/30/2018. (Peterson, M)
October 30, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ELECTRONIC FILING ORDER FOR COUNSEL - PLEASE ENSURE COMPLIANCE WITH COURTESY COPY REQUIREMENTS IN THIS ORDER Signed by Judge Michael P. Shea on 10/30/2018. (Peterson, M)
October 30, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 2 Order on Pretrial Deadlines: Amended Pleadings due by 12/29/2018. Discovery due by 5/1/2019. Dispositive Motions due by 6/5/2019. Signed by Clerk on 10/30/2018. (Peterson, M)
October 30, 2018 Judge Michael P. Shea added. (Anastasio, F.)
October 30, 2018 Request for Clerk to issue summons as to National Railroad Passenger Corporation. (Zamat, Michael) Modified on 10/31/2018 to correct party (Hushin, Z.).
October 30, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against National Railroad Passenger Corporation ( Filing fee $400 receipt number ACTDC-5028985.), filed by Ricky Graham.(Zamat, Michael) Modified on 10/31/2018 to correct party (Hushin, Z.).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Connecticut District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Graham v. National Railroad Passenger Corporation et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: National Railroad Passenger Corporation
Represented By: Andrew Brian Charkow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: National Railroad Passenger Corporation doing business as Amtrak
Represented By: Andrew Brian Charkow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ricky Graham
Represented By: Michael Andrew Zamat
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?