Heartland Payment Systems, LLC v. Hanratty

Plaintiff: Heartland Payment Systems, LLC
Defendant: Kathie Hanratty
Case Number: 3:2018cv01790
Filed: October 31, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of Connecticut
Presiding Judge: Janet C Hall
Nature of Suit: Other Fraud
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 14, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 14, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER granting #23 Motion to Stay. Granted until final order of the court. The parties are to file status reports every 30 days. Also, the parties are to file a notice within 5 days of a decision by the District of New Jersey. SO ORDERED by Judge Janet C. Hall on 12/14/2018. (Lewis, D)
December 10, 2018 Filing 23 Joint MOTION to Stay Action by Kathie Hanratty.Responses due by 12/31/2018 (Pavlis, Alfred)
November 26, 2018 Answer deadline updated for Kathie Hanratty to 12/17/2018. (Lewis, D)
November 26, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER granting #19 MOTION for Extension of Time until December 17, 2018 to move, answer or otherwise respond to #1 Complaint,. SO ORDERED by Judge Janet C. Hall on 11/26/2018. (Lewis, D)
November 26, 2018 Set Deadlines/Hearings: Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 1/3/2019 (DeRubeis, B.)
November 21, 2018 Filing 21 RESPONSE re #19 MOTION for Extension of Time until December 17, 2018 to move, answer or otherwise respond to #1 Complaint, filed by Heartland Payment Systems, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C)(Ronan, Timothy)
November 20, 2018 Filing 20 NOTICE of Appearance by Andrew M. Calamari on behalf of Kathie Hanratty (Calamari, Andrew)
November 20, 2018 Filing 19 MOTION for Extension of Time until December 17, 2018 to move, answer or otherwise respond to #1 Complaint, by Kathie Hanratty. (Pavlis, Alfred)
November 20, 2018 Filing 18 NOTICE of Appearance by Alfred U. Pavlis on behalf of Kathie Hanratty (Pavlis, Alfred)
November 8, 2018 Filing 17 NOTICE of Appearance by Patrick Christopher Fagan on behalf of Heartland Payment Systems, LLC (Fagan, Patrick)
November 8, 2018 Filing 16 NOTICE of Appearance by Steven Jason Rosenwasser on behalf of Heartland Payment Systems, LLC (Rosenwasser, Steven)
November 7, 2018 Filing 15 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Heartland Payment Systems, LLC. Kathie Hanratty served on 11/5/2018, answer due 11/26/2018. (Ronan, Timothy)
November 6, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER granting #11 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice; granting #12 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice; granting #13 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Clerk on 11/6/2018. (Anastasio, F.)
November 5, 2018 Filing 13 MOTION for Attorney(s) Fredric J. Bold, Jr. to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (paid $75 PHV fee; receipt number ACTDC-5036403) by Heartland Payment Systems, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit, #2 Certificate of Good Standing)(Ronan, Timothy)
November 5, 2018 Filing 12 MOTION for Attorney(s) Patrick C. Fagan to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (paid $75 PHV fee; receipt number ACTDC-5036385) by Heartland Payment Systems, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit, #2 Certificate of Good Standing)(Ronan, Timothy)
November 5, 2018 Filing 11 MOTION for Attorney(s) Steven J. Rosenwasser to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (paid $75 PHV fee; receipt number ACTDC-5036376) by Heartland Payment Systems, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit, #2 Certificate of Good Standing)(Ronan, Timothy)
October 31, 2018 Filing 10 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED in accordance with Fed. R. Civ. P. 4 and LR 4 as to *Kathie Hanratty* with answer to complaint due within *21* days. Attorney *Timothy G. Ronan* *281 Tresser Boulevard* *P.O. Box 3262 Suite 1000* *Stamford, CT, 06901-3262*. (Reis, Julia)
October 31, 2018 Filing 9 NOTICE TO COUNSEL/SELF-REPRESENTED PARTIES : Counsel or self-represented parties initiating or removing this action are responsible for serving all parties with attached documents and copies of #1 Complaint, filed by Heartland Payment Systems, LLC, #4 Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Heartland Payment Systems, LLC, #6 Electronic Filing Order, #3 Notice of Appearance filed by Heartland Payment Systems, LLC, #2 Notice of Appearance filed by Heartland Payment Systems, LLC, #7 Protective Order, #5 Order on Pretrial Deadlines, #8 Order Signed by Clerk on 10/31/2018.(Reis, Julia)
October 31, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 8 STANDING ORDER RE: DISCOVERY Signed by Judge Janet C. Hall on 10/31/2018.(Reis, Julia)
October 31, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 7 STANDING PROTECTIVE ORDER Signed by Judge Janet C. Hall on 10/31/2018.(Reis, Julia)
October 31, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ELECTRONIC FILING ORDER FOR COUNSEL - PLEASE ENSURE COMPLIANCE WITH COURTESY COPY REQUIREMENTS IN THIS ORDER Signed by Judge Janet C. Hall on 10/31/2018.(Reis, Julia)
October 31, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 5 Order on Pretrial Deadlines: Amended Pleadings due by 12/30/2018 Discovery due by 5/2/2019 Dispositive Motions due by 6/6/2019 Signed by Clerk on 10/31/2018.(Reis, Julia)
October 31, 2018 Judge Janet C. Hall added. (Anastasio, F.)
October 31, 2018 Filing 4 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Heartland Payment Systems, LLC identifying Corporate Parent Global Payments Inc. for Heartland Payment Systems, LLC. (Lefebvre, Edward)
October 31, 2018 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by Edward B Lefebvre on behalf of Heartland Payment Systems, LLC (Lefebvre, Edward)
October 31, 2018 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by Timothy G. Ronan on behalf of Heartland Payment Systems, LLC (Ronan, Timothy)
October 31, 2018 Request for Clerk to issue summons as to Kathie Hanratty. (Ronan, Timothy)
October 31, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Kathie Hanratty ( Filing fee $400 receipt number ACTDC-5030252.), filed by Heartland Payment Systems, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D, #6 Exhibit E, #7 Exhibit F, #8 Exhibit G, #9 Exhibit H, #10 Exhibit I, #11 Exhibit J, #12 Exhibit K, #13 Exhibit L, #14 Exhibit M)(Ronan, Timothy)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Connecticut District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Heartland Payment Systems, LLC v. Hanratty
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kathie Hanratty
Represented By: Andrew M. Calamari
Represented By: Alfred U. Pavlis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Heartland Payment Systems, LLC
Represented By: Timothy G. Ronan
Represented By: Edward B Lefebvre
Represented By: Steven Jason Rosenwasser
Represented By: Patrick Christopher Fagan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?