USA v. Gherlone

Plaintiff: USA
Defendant: Louis M. Gherlone, Jr.
Case Number: 3:2018cv01795
Filed: October 31, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of Connecticut
Presiding Judge: Kari A Dooley
Nature of Suit: Taxes
Cause of Action: 26:7402
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 20, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 20, 2018 JUDICIAL PROCEEDINGS SURVEY - FOR COUNSEL ONLY: The following link to the confidential survey requires you to log into CM/ECF for SECURITY purposes. Once in CM/ECF you will be prompted for the case number. Although you are receiving this survey through CM/ECF, it is hosted on an independent website called SurveyMonkey. Once in SurveyMonkey, the survey is located in a secure account. The survey is not docketed and it is not sent directly to the judge. To ensure anonymity, completed surveys are held up to 90 days before they are sent to the judge for review. We hope you will take this opportunity to participate, please click on this link: https://ecf.ctd.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/Dispatch.pl?survey (Gould, K.)
December 20, 2018 Filing 12 DEFAULT JUDGMENT entered in favor of USA against Louis M. Gherlone, Jr Signed by Clerk on 12/20/2018.(Gould, K.)
December 20, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER granting #10 Motion for Default Judgment. Signed by Judge Kari A. Dooley on 12/20/2018. (Gould, K.)
December 19, 2018 Filing 10 MOTION for Default Judgment as to Louis M. Gherlone, Jr. by USA. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A: Declaration of Mary Bishop, #2 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Default Judgment)(Sarnell, Bradley)
December 3, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER granting #8 Motion for Default Entry 55(a) Motion for default judgment due by 1/2/2019. A Motion for Default Judgment pursuant to FRCP 55(b) shall be filed or this action will be dismissed by the Clerk pursuant to FRCP 41(a). Signed by Clerk on 12/3/2018. (Gould, K.)
November 30, 2018 Filing 8 MOTION for Default Entry 55(a) as to Louis M. Gherlone, Jr. by USA. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit in Support of Request for Default)(Sarnell, Bradley)
November 30, 2018 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed by USA. Louis M. Gherlone, Jr served on 11/7/2018, answer due 11/28/2018. (Sarnell, Bradley)
November 1, 2018 Filing 6 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED in accordance with Fed. R. Civ. P. 4 and LR 4 as to *Louis M. Gherlone, Jr* with answer to complaint due within *21* days. Attorney *Bradley Alexander Sarnell* *United States Dept of Justice, Tax Div -pob 55* *P.O. Box 55, Ben Franklin Station* *Washington, DC 20044*. (Fazekas, J.)
November 1, 2018 Filing 5 NOTICE TO COUNSEL/SELF-REPRESENTED PARTIES : Counsel or self-represented parties initiating or removing this action are responsible for serving all parties with attached documents and copies of #2 Order on Pretrial Deadlines, #3 Electronic Filing Order, #4 Standing Protective Order, #1 Complaint filed by USA Signed by Clerk on 11/1/2018.(Fazekas, J.)
October 31, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 4 STANDING PROTECTIVE ORDER Signed by Judge Kari A. Dooley on 10/31/2018.(Fazekas, J.)
October 31, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ELECTRONIC FILING ORDER FOR COUNSEL - PLEASE ENSURE COMPLIANCE WITH COURTESY COPY REQUIREMENTS IN THIS ORDER Signed by Judge Kari A. Dooley on 10/31/2018.(Fazekas, J.)
October 31, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 2 Order on Pretrial Deadlines: Amended Pleadings due by 12/30/2018. Discovery due by 5/2/2019. Dispositive Motions due by 6/6/2019. Signed by Clerk on 10/31/2018.(Fazekas, J.)
October 31, 2018 Judge Kari A. Dooley added. (Oliver, T.)
October 31, 2018 Request for Clerk to issue summons as to Louis M. Gherlone, Jr.. (Sarnell, Bradley)
October 31, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Louis M. Gherlone, Jr., filed by United States of America. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Proposed Summons for Louis M. Gherlone, Jr.)(Sarnell, Bradley)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Connecticut District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: USA v. Gherlone
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Louis M. Gherlone, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: USA
Represented By: Bradley Alexander Sarnell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?