Alcalde-Querzola v. Life Insurance Company of North America

Plaintiff: Sara Alcalde-Querzola
Defendant: Life Insurance Company of North America
Case Number: 3:2018cv01802
Filed: November 1, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of Connecticut
Presiding Judge: Warren W Eginton
Nature of Suit: Labor: E.R.I.S.A.
Cause of Action: 29:1132
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 29, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 29, 2018 Filing 11 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Sara Alcalde-Querzola. Life Insurance Company of North America served on 11/12/2018, answer due 1/3/2019. (Cicchiello, Lorenzo)
November 21, 2018 Set Deadlines/Hearings: Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 1/22/2019 (Fazekas, J.)
November 21, 2018 Answer deadline updated for Life Insurance Company of North America to 1/3/2019. (Fazekas, J.)
November 21, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER granting #9 Motion for Extension of Time until January 3, 2019 to respond to complaint and January 22, 2019 to file Rule 26 Report. Signed by Judge Warren W. Eginton on 11/21/2018. (Welles, T.)
November 20, 2018 Filing 9 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time until January 3, 2019 to respond to complaint and January 22, 2019 to file Rule 26 Report respond to Complaint and file Rule 26 Report by Life Insurance Company of North America. (Barnett, Kelly)
November 20, 2018 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Kelly Frye Barnett on behalf of Life Insurance Company of North America (Barnett, Kelly)
November 20, 2018 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Patrick Walter Begos on behalf of Life Insurance Company of North America (Begos, Patrick)
November 5, 2018 Filing 6 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED in accordance with Fed. R. Civ. P. 4 and LR 4 as to *Life Insurance Company of North America* with answer to complaint due within *21* days. Attorney *Lorenzo J. Cicchiello* *Cicchiello & Cicchiello* *582 West Main St.* *Norwich, CT 06360*. (Fazekas, J.)
November 2, 2018 Filing 5 NOTICE TO COUNSEL/SELF-REPRESENTED PARTIES : Counsel or self-represented parties initiating or removing this action are responsible for serving all parties with attached documents and copies of #3 Electronic Filing Order, #2 Order on Pretrial Deadlines, #1 Complaint, filed by Sara Alcalde-Querzola, #4 Standing Protective Order Signed by Clerk on 11/2/2018.(Fazekas, J.)
November 2, 2018 Request for Clerk to issue summons as to Life Insurance Company of North America. (Cicchiello, Lorenzo)
November 1, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 4 STANDING PROTECTIVE ORDER Signed by Judge Warren W. Eginton on 11/1/2018.(Fazekas, J.)
November 1, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ELECTRONIC FILING ORDER FOR COUNSEL - PLEASE ENSURE COMPLIANCE WITH COURTESY COPY REQUIREMENTS IN THIS ORDER Signed by Judge Warren W. Eginton on 11/1/2018.(Fazekas, J.)
November 1, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 2 Order on Pretrial Deadlines: Amended Pleadings due by 12/31/2018. Discovery due by 5/3/2019. Dispositive Motions due by 6/7/2019. Signed by Clerk on 11/1/2018.(Fazekas, J.)
November 1, 2018 Judge Warren W. Eginton added. (Anastasio, F.)
November 1, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Life Insurance Company of North America ( Filing fee $400 receipt number ACTDC-5033110.), filed by Sara Alcalde-Querzola. (Attachments: #1 summons, #2 civil sheet)(Cicchiello, Lorenzo) Modified on 11/1/2018 to correct party (Hushin, Z.).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Connecticut District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Alcalde-Querzola v. Life Insurance Company of North America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Life Insurance Company of North America
Represented By: Kelly Frye Barnett
Represented By: Patrick Walter Begos
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sara Alcalde-Querzola
Represented By: Lorenzo J. Cicchiello
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?