Francois v. Ford Motor Credit et al
Plaintiff: Harry Francois
Defendant: Bob Thomas Ford and Ford Motor Credit
Case Number: 3:2018cv01813
Filed: November 7, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of Connecticut
Presiding Judge: Victor A Bolden
Referring Judge: William I Garfinkel
Nature of Suit: Truth in Lending
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 20, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 20, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge William I. Garfinkel for including #2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis Signed by Judge Victor A. Bolden on 12/20/2018.Motions referred to William I. Garfinkel(Perez, J.)
November 13, 2018 Filing 8 Emergency MOTION for Immediate Relief by Harry Francois.Responses due by 12/4/2018 (Fazekas, J.)
November 7, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 7 STANDING PROTECTIVE ORDER Signed by Judge Victor A. Bolden on 11/7/2018.(Fazekas, J.)
November 7, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ELECTRONIC FILING ORDER FOR COUNSEL - PLEASE ENSURE COMPLIANCE WITH COURTESY COPY REQUIREMENTS IN THIS ORDER Signed by Judge Victor A. Bolden on 11/7/2018.(Fazekas, J.)
November 7, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 5 Order on Pretrial Deadlines: Amended Pleadings due by 1/6/2019. Discovery due by 5/9/2019. Dispositive Motions due by 6/13/2019. Signed by Clerk on 11/7/2018.(Fazekas, J.)
November 7, 2018 Filing 4 MOTION By Self-Represented Litigant to Participate in Electronic Filing by Harry Francois. (Fazekas, J.)
November 7, 2018 Filing 3 Consent to Electronic Notice by Harry Francois..(Fazekas, J.)
November 7, 2018 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Harry Francois. (Fazekas, J.)
November 7, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Bob Thomas Ford, Ford Motor Credit, filed by Harry Francois. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Fazekas, J.)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Connecticut District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Francois v. Ford Motor Credit et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bob Thomas Ford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ford Motor Credit
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Harry Francois
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?