Lee et al v. Coastline Transmission, LLC
Plaintiff: Lisette Forde and Anthony Lee
Defendant: Coastline Transmission, LLC
Case Number: 3:2018cv01819
Filed: November 5, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of Connecticut
Presiding Judge: Alfred V Covello
Nature of Suit: Truth in Lending
Cause of Action: 15:1640
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 7, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 7, 2018 Filing 7 ANSWER to #1 Complaint with Affirmative Defenses by Coastline Transmission, LLC.(Graham, Toya)
November 26, 2018 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Anthony Lee, Lisette Forde. Coastline Transmission, LLC served on 11/17/2018, answer due 12/8/2018. (Blinn, Daniel)
November 6, 2018 Filing 5 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED in accordance with Fed. R. Civ. P. 4 and LR 4 as to *Coastline Transmission, LLC* with answer to complaint due within *21* days. Attorney *Daniel S. Blinn* *Consumer Law Group* *35 Cold Spring Rd., Suite 512* *Rocky Hill, CT 06067*. (Bozek, M.)
November 6, 2018 Filing 4 NOTICE TO COUNSEL/SELF-REPRESENTED PARTIES : Counsel or self-represented parties initiating or removing this action are responsible for serving all parties with attached documents and copies of #3 Electronic Filing Order, #1 Complaint filed by Lisette Forde, Anthony Lee, Request to Issue Summons, and #2 Order on Pretrial Deadlines. Signed by Clerk on 11/6/2018.(Bozek, M.)
November 5, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ELECTRONIC FILING ORDER FOR COUNSEL - PLEASE ENSURE COMPLIANCE WITH COURTESY COPY REQUIREMENTS IN THIS ORDER. Signed by Judge Alfred V. Covello on 11/5/2018.(Bozek, M.)
November 5, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 2 Order on Pretrial Deadlines: Amended Pleadings due by 1/4/2019. Discovery due by 5/7/2019. Dispositive Motions due by 6/11/2019. Signed by Clerk on 11/5/2018.(Bozek, M.)
November 5, 2018 Judge Alfred V. Covello added. (Oliver, T.)
November 5, 2018 Request for Clerk to issue summons as to Coastline Transmission, LLC. (Blinn, Daniel)
November 5, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Coastline Transmission, LLC ( Filing fee $400 receipt number ACTDC-5035974.), filed by Anthony Lee, Lisette Forde.(Blinn, Daniel)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Connecticut District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Lee et al v. Coastline Transmission, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lisette Forde
Represented By: Daniel S. Blinn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Anthony Lee
Represented By: Daniel S. Blinn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Coastline Transmission, LLC
Represented By: Toya Alek Graham
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?