Heon v. Hartford Life and Accident Insurance Company

Plaintiff: Laura Heon
Defendant: Hartford Life and Accident Insurance Company
Case Number: 3:2018cv01842
Filed: November 9, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of Connecticut
Presiding Judge: Stefan R Underhill
Nature of Suit: Labor: E.R.I.S.A.
Cause of Action: 29:1002
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 31, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 31, 2018 Filing 9 MOTION for Extension of Time until January 28, 2019 to File Form 26(F) Report of Parties' Planning Meeting by Hartford Life and Accident Insurance Company. (Bennici, Gregory)
November 26, 2018 Set Deadlines: Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 1/3/2019 (Pincus, A).
November 20, 2018 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Gregory J. Bennici on behalf of Hartford Life and Accident Insurance Company (Bennici, Gregory)
November 20, 2018 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Patrick Walter Begos on behalf of Hartford Life and Accident Insurance Company (Begos, Patrick)
November 13, 2018 Filing 6 NOTICE TO COUNSEL/SELF-REPRESENTED PARTIES : Counsel or self-represented parties initiating or removing this action are responsible for serving all parties with attached documents and copies of #2 Order on Pretrial Deadlines, #1 Complaint filed by Laura Heon, #3 Electronic Filing Order, #4 Protective Order Signed by Clerk on 11/13/2018. (Oliver, T.)
November 13, 2018 Filing 5 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED in accordance with Fed. R. Civ. P. 4 and LR 4 as to *Hartford Life and Accident Insurance Company* with answer to complaint due within *21* days. Attorney *Lorenzo J. Cicchiello* *Cicchiello & Cicchiello* *582 West Main St.* *Norwich, CT 06360*. (Oliver, T.)
November 12, 2018 Request for Clerk to issue summons as to Hartford Life and Accident Insurance Company. (Cicchiello, Lorenzo)
November 9, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 4 STANDING PROTECTIVE ORDER Signed by Judge Stefan R Underhill on 11/9/2018. (Oliver, T.)
November 9, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ELECTRONIC FILING ORDER FOR COUNSEL - PLEASE ENSURE COMPLIANCE WITH COURTESY COPY REQUIREMENTS IN THIS ORDER Signed by Judge Stefan R Underhill on 11/9/2018. (Oliver, T.)
November 9, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 2 Order on Pretrial Deadlines: Amended Pleadings due by 1/8/2019 Discovery due by 5/11/2019 Dispositive Motions due by 6/15/2019 Signed by Clerk on 11/9/2018. (Oliver, T.)
November 9, 2018 Judge Stefan R Underhill added. (Hushin, Z.)
November 9, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Hartford Life and Accident Insurance Company ( Filing fee $400 receipt number ACTDC-5044039.), filed by Laura Heon. (Attachments: #1 summons, #2 civil sheet)(Cicchiello, Lorenzo)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Connecticut District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Heon v. Hartford Life and Accident Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hartford Life and Accident Insurance Company
Represented By: Gregory J. Bennici
Represented By: Patrick Walter Begos
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Laura Heon
Represented By: Lorenzo J. Cicchiello
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?