Jean Paul v. Pierre et al

Plaintiff: Evelyne Jean Paul
Defendant: Chris Bartlett and Rudy Pierre
Case Number: 3:2018cv01871
Filed: November 15, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of Connecticut
0 Judge: William I Garfinkel
1 Judge: Stefan R Underhill
Nature of Suit: Other Fraud
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 7, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER Approving and Adopting #8 Recommended Ruling. The Clerk is directed to close the case. Signed by Judge Stefan R Underhill on 1/7/2019 (Pincus, A).
December 17, 2018 Filing 9 OBJECTION to #8 Recommended Ruling filed by Evelyne Jean Paul. (Oliver, T.)
December 4, 2018 Filing 8 RECOMMENDED RULING: For the reasons set forth in the attached Recommended Ruling, the Undersigned recommends that Plaintiff's complaint be dismissed under 28 U.S.C. sec. 1915(e)(2)(B). This is a Recommended Ruling. Any objection must be filed within 14 days after service. Objections due by 12/18/2018. Signed by Judge William I. Garfinkel on 12/4/18.(Cates, S)
December 4, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER denying without prejudice #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. For the reasons set forth in the Recommended Ruling filed herewith, the Undersigned recommends that this action be dismissed under 28 U.S.C. sec. 1915(e)(2)(b). Signed by Judge William I. Garfinkel on 12/4/18. (Cates, S)
November 29, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge William I. Garfinkel for Motion including #2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis Signed by Judge Stefan R Underhill on 11/29/2018.Motions referred to William I. Garfinkel(Jaiman, R.)
November 15, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 5 STANDING PROTECTIVE ORDER Signed by Judge Stefan R Underhill on 11/15/2018.(Fazekas, J.)
November 15, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ELECTRONIC FILING ORDER FOR COUNSEL - PLEASE ENSURE COMPLIANCE WITH COURTESY COPY REQUIREMENTS IN THIS ORDER Signed by Judge Stefan R Underhill on 11/15/2018.(Fazekas, J.)
November 15, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 3 Order on Pretrial Deadlines: Amended Pleadings due by 1/14/2019. Discovery due by 5/17/2019. Dispositive Motions due by 6/21/2019. Signed by Clerk on 11/15/2018.(Fazekas, J.)
November 15, 2018 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Evelyne Jean Paul. (Fazekas, J.)
November 15, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Chris Bartlett, Rudy Pierre, filed by Evelyne Jean Paul.(Fazekas, J.)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Connecticut District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Jean Paul v. Pierre et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Evelyne Jean Paul
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chris Bartlett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rudy Pierre
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?