Automatic Temperature Controls, Inc. v. Cambridge Marine Construction, Inc. et al

Plaintiff: Automatic Temperature Controls, Inc.
Defendant: Corepoint Insurance Company and Cambridge Marine Construction, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2018cv01885
Filed: November 16, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of Connecticut
Presiding Judge: Jeffrey A Meyer
Nature of Suit: Miller Act
Cause of Action: 40:3131
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 3, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 3, 2019 Filing 13 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Automatic Temperature Controls, Inc.. (Fine, David)
December 28, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER granting #10 Motion for Extension of Time until January 25, 2019 to File Responsive Pleading 1 Complaint, by Corepoint Insurance Company. Signed by Judge Jeffrey A. Meyer on 12/27/18. (Barry, Donna)
December 27, 2018 Answer deadline updated for Corepoint Insurance Company to 1/25/2019. (Barry, Donna)
December 27, 2018 Set Deadlines: Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 2/4/2019. (Gutierrez, Y.)
December 21, 2018 Filing 11 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Corepoint Insurance Company identifying Corporate Parent Amtrust Financial for Corepoint Insurance Company. (Canalia, Erin)
December 21, 2018 Filing 10 MOTION for Extension of Time until January 25, 2019 to File Responsive Pleading #1 Complaint, by Corepoint Insurance Company. (Canalia, Erin)
December 21, 2018 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by Erin Canalia on behalf of Corepoint Insurance Company (Canalia, Erin)
December 11, 2018 Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Automatic Temperature Controls, Inc.. Corepoint Insurance Company served on 12/4/2018, answer due 12/25/2018. (Fine, David)
December 11, 2018 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Automatic Temperature Controls, Inc.. Cambridge Marine Construction, Inc. served on 12/5/2018, answer due 12/26/2018. (Fine, David)
November 19, 2018 Filing 6 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED in accordance with Fed. R. Civ. P. 4 and LR 4 as to *Cambridge Marine Construction, Inc., Corepoint Insurance Company* with answer to complaint due within *21* days. Attorney *David L. Fine* *Mirick, O'Connell, DeMallie & Lougee* *100 Front St* *Worcester, MA 01608-1477*. (Reis, Julia)
November 19, 2018 Filing 5 NOTICE TO COUNSEL/SELF-REPRESENTED PARTIES : Counsel or self-represented parties initiating or removing this action are responsible for serving all parties with attached documents and copies of #1 Complaint, filed by Automatic Temperature Controls, Inc., #2 Order on Pretrial Deadlines, #4 Protective Order, #3 Electronic Filing Order Signed by Clerk on 11/19/2018.(Reis, Julia)
November 16, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 4 STANDING PROTECTIVE ORDER Signed by Judge Jeffrey A. Meyer on 11/16/2018.(Reis, Julia)
November 16, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ELECTRONIC FILING ORDER FOR COUNSEL - PLEASE ENSURE COMPLIANCE WITH COURTESY COPY REQUIREMENTS IN THIS ORDER Signed by Judge Jeffrey A. Meyer on 11/16/2018.(Reis, Julia)
November 16, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 2 Order on Pretrial Deadlines: Amended Pleadings due by 1/15/2019 Discovery due by 5/18/2019 Dispositive Motions due by 6/22/2019 Signed by Clerk on 11/16/2018.(Reis, Julia) Modified on 11/19/2018 to change signature from judge to clerk(Reis, Julia).
November 16, 2018 Judge Jeffrey A. Meyer added. (Oliver, T.)
November 16, 2018 Request for Clerk to issue summons as to Cambridge Marine Construction, Inc., Corepoint Insurance Company. (Fine, David)
November 16, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Cambridge Marine Construction, Inc., Corepoint Insurance Company ( Filing fee $400 receipt number ACTDC-5053179.), filed by Automatic Temperature Controls, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(Fine, David)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Connecticut District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Automatic Temperature Controls, Inc. v. Cambridge Marine Construction, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Corepoint Insurance Company
Represented By: Erin Canalia
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cambridge Marine Construction, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Automatic Temperature Controls, Inc.
Represented By: David L Fine
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?