Zurich American Life Insurance Company v. Kalosky et al
Plaintiff: Zurich American Life Insurance Company
Defendant: Barbara Kaluza, Phillip T. Kalosky, Janet Guerrini and Robert Kalosky
Case Number: 3:2018cv01915
Filed: November 26, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of Connecticut
Presiding Judge: Victor A Bolden
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 9, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 9, 2019 Filing 13 NOTICE by Zurich American Life Insurance Company re #12 Waiver of Service Executed (O'Malley, Regen)
January 8, 2019 Filing 12 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed as to Janet Guerrini waiver sent on 11/28/2018, answer due 1/27/2019 filed by Zurich American Life Insurance Company. (O'Malley, Regen)
December 18, 2018 Filing 11 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed as to Barbara Kaluza waiver sent on 11/28/2018, answer due 1/27/2019 filed by Zurich American Life Insurance Company. (O'Malley, Regen)
December 11, 2018 Filing 10 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed as to Phillip T. Kalosky waiver sent on 11/28/2018, answer due 1/27/2019 filed by Zurich American Life Insurance Company. (O'Malley, Regen)
November 28, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER granting #8 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice as to Margaret M. Drugan. Certificate of Good Standing due by 1/27/2019. Signed by Clerk on 11/28/2018. (Fazekas, J.)
November 27, 2018 Filing 8 MOTION for Attorney(s) Margaret M. Drugan to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (paid $75 PHV fee; receipt number ACTDC-5063912) by Zurich American Life Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(O'Malley, Regen)
November 27, 2018 Filing 7 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Zurich American Life Insurance Company identifying Corporate Parent Zurich Insurance Group Ltd for Zurich American Life Insurance Company. (O'Malley, Regen)
November 27, 2018 Filing 6 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED in accordance with Fed. R. Civ. P. 4 and LR 4 as to *Janet Guerrini, Phillip T. Kalosky, Robert Kalosky, Barbara Kaluza* with answer to complaint due within *21* days. Attorney *Regen O'Malley* *Gordon & Rees LLP-CT* *95 Glastonbury Boulevard, Suite 206* *Glastonbury, CT 06033*. (Fazekas, J.)
November 27, 2018 Filing 5 NOTICE TO COUNSEL/SELF-REPRESENTED PARTIES : Counsel or self-represented parties initiating or removing this action are responsible for serving all parties with attached documents and copies of #4 Standing Protective Order, #3 Electronic Filing Order, #2 Order on Pretrial Deadlines, #1 Complaint, filed by Zurich American Life Insurance Company Signed by Clerk on 11/27/2018.(Fazekas, J.)
November 26, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 4 STANDING PROTECTIVE ORDER Signed by Judge Victor A. Bolden on 11/26/2018.(Fazekas, J.)
November 26, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ELECTRONIC FILING ORDER FOR COUNSEL - PLEASE ENSURE COMPLIANCE WITH COURTESY COPY REQUIREMENTS IN THIS ORDER Signed by Judge Victor A. Bolden on 11/26/2018.(Fazekas, J.)
November 26, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 2 Order on Pretrial Deadlines: Amended Pleadings due by 1/25/2019. Discovery due by 5/28/2019. Dispositive Motions due by 7/2/2019. Signed by Clerk on 11/26/2018.(Fazekas, J.)
November 26, 2018 Request for Clerk to issue summons as to Janet Guerrini, Phillip T. Kalosky, Robert Kalosky, Barbara Kaluza. (O'Malley, Regen)
November 26, 2018 Judge Victor A. Bolden added. (Oliver, T.)
November 26, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT in Interpleader against Janet Guerrini, Phillip T. Kalosky, Robert Kalosky, Barbara Kaluza ( Filing fee $400 receipt number ACTDC-5062131.), filed by Zurich American Life Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D)(O'Malley, Regen)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Connecticut District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Zurich American Life Insurance Company v. Kalosky et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Barbara Kaluza
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Phillip T. Kalosky
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Janet Guerrini
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robert Kalosky
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Zurich American Life Insurance Company
Represented By: Regen O'Malley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?