Cincinnati Insurance Company v. DS Services Of America, Inc.
Plaintiff: Cincinnati Insurance Company
Defendant: DS Services Of America, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2018cv01918
Filed: November 27, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of Connecticut
Presiding Judge: Alvin W Thompson
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 20, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 20, 2019 Filing 11 Corporate Disclosure Statement with voluntary schedule of privately held subsidiary businesses by DS Services Of America, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Cott Corporation, Corporate Parent DS Services Holding, Inc. for DS Services Of America, Inc.. (Formica, Glenn)
January 20, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by Glenn L. Formica on behalf of DS Services Of America, Inc. (Formica, Glenn)
January 17, 2019 Filing 9 MOTION for Cost and Fees by Cincinnati Insurance Company.Responses due by 2/7/2019 (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Andrew Krevolin)(Krevolin, Andrew)
January 16, 2019 Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Cincinnati Insurance Company. DS Services Of America, Inc. served on 1/4/2019, answer due 1/25/2019. (Krevolin, Andrew)
January 2, 2019 Filing 7 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED in accordance with Fed. R. Civ. P. 4 and LR 4 as to *DS Services Of America, Inc.* with answer to complaint due within *21* days. Attorney *Andrew W. Krevolin* *Rogin Nassau LLC, City Place 1, 22nd Floor* *185 Asylum Street* *Hartford, CT 06103-3460*. (Bozek, M.)
December 28, 2018 Request for Clerk to issue summons as to DS Services Of America, Inc.. (Krevolin, Andrew)
November 27, 2018 Filing 6 NOTICE TO COUNSEL/SELF-REPRESENTED PARTIES : Counsel or self-represented parties initiating or removing this action are responsible for serving all parties with attached documents and copies of #2 Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Cincinnati Insurance Company, #3 Order on Pretrial Deadlines, #5 Protective Order, #4 Electronic Filing Order, #1 Complaint filed by Cincinnati Insurance Company Signed by Clerk on 11/27/18.(Barry, Donna)
November 27, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 5 STANDING PROTECTIVE ORDER Signed by Judge Alvin W. Thompson on 11/27/18.(Barry, Donna)
November 27, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ELECTRONIC FILING ORDER FOR COUNSEL - PLEASE ENSURE COMPLIANCE WITH COURTESY COPY REQUIREMENTS IN THIS ORDER Signed by Judge Alvin W. Thompson on 11/27/18.(Barry, Donna)
November 27, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 3 Order on Pretrial Deadlines: Amended Pleadings due by 1/26/2019 Discovery due by 5/29/2019 Dispositive Motions due by 7/3/2019 Signed by Clerk on 11/27/18.(Barry, Donna)
November 27, 2018 Judge Alvin W. Thompson added. (Anastasio, F.)
November 27, 2018 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Cincinnati Insurance Company identifying Corporate Parent Cincinnati Financial Corporation for Cincinnati Insurance Company. (Krevolin, Andrew) Modified on 11/27/2018 to correct party (Hushin, Z.).
November 27, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against DS Services Of America, Inc. ( Filing fee $400 receipt number ACTDC-5062729.), filed by Cincinnati Insurance Company.(Krevolin, Andrew) Modified on 11/27/2018 to correct party(Hushin, Z.).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Connecticut District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Cincinnati Insurance Company v. DS Services Of America, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cincinnati Insurance Company
Represented By: Andrew W. Krevolin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DS Services Of America, Inc.
Represented By: Glenn L. Formica
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?