State Farm Insurance Co. v. Hernandez et al
Plaintiff: State Farm Insurance Co.
Defendant: German Tejada, Jill Doe and Virgen Hernandez
Case Number: 3:2018cv01926
Filed: November 28, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of Connecticut
Presiding Judge: Alfred V Covello
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 18, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 18, 2019 Filing 15 First MOTION to Amend/Correct #1 Complaint by State Farm Insurance Co..Responses due by 2/8/2019 (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support of Motion to Correct, #2 Exhibit Proposed Amended Complaint for Declaratory and Other Relief, #3 Exhibit Exhibit to Proposed Complaint)(Rudzik, Keith)
January 18, 2019 Filing 14 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction by Virgen Hernandez, German Tejada.Responses due by 2/8/2019 (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Exhibit A)(Creager, Catherine)
December 19, 2018 Answer deadline updated for Virgen Hernandez to 1/20/2019; German Tejada to 1/20/2019. See 13 Order. (Bozek, M.)
December 19, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER granting #11 motion for extension of time to and including 1/20/19. Signed by Judge Alfred V. Covello on 12/19/18. (Hall, Gregory)
December 18, 2018 Filing 12 First RESPONSE by Jill Doe. (Virgil, Jeremy)
December 18, 2018 Filing 11 First MOTION for Extension of Time until 01/20/2019 Respond to Complaint #1 Complaint by Virgen Hernandez, German Tejada. (Creager, Catherine)
December 18, 2018 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by Catherine L. Creager on behalf of Virgen Hernandez, German Tejada (Creager, Catherine)
December 18, 2018 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by Kevin A. Coles on behalf of Virgen Hernandez, German Tejada (Coles, Kevin)
December 12, 2018 Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed by State Farm Insurance Co.. German Tejada served on 11/30/2018, answer due 12/21/2018. (Rudzik, Keith)
December 12, 2018 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed by State Farm Insurance Co.. Virgen Hernandez served on 11/30/2018, answer due 12/21/2018. (Rudzik, Keith)
December 6, 2018 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Jeremy C. Virgil on behalf of Jill Doe (Virgil, Jeremy)
November 28, 2018 Filing 5 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED in accordance with Fed. R. Civ. P. 4 and LR 4 as to *Jill Doe, Virgen Hernandez, German Tejada* with answer to complaint due within *21* days. Attorney *Keith R. Rudzik* *Howard, Kohn, Sprague & Fitzgerald* *237 Buckingham St., PO Box 261798* *Hartford, CT 06126-1798*. (Bozek, M.)
November 28, 2018 Filing 4 NOTICE TO COUNSEL/SELF-REPRESENTED PARTIES : Counsel or self-represented parties initiating or removing this action are responsible for serving all parties with attached documents and copies of Request to Issue Summons, #2 Order on Pretrial Deadlines, #1 Complaint filed by State Farm Insurance Co., and #3 Electronic Filing Order. Signed by Clerk on 11/28/2018.(Bozek, M.)
November 28, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ELECTRONIC FILING ORDER FOR COUNSEL - PLEASE ENSURE COMPLIANCE WITH COURTESY COPY REQUIREMENTS IN THIS ORDER. Signed by Judge Alfred V. Covello on 11/28/2018.(Bozek, M.)
November 28, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 2 Order on Pretrial Deadlines: Amended Pleadings due by 1/27/2019. Discovery due by 5/30/2019. Dispositive Motions due by 7/4/2019. Signed by Clerk on 11/28/2018.(Bozek, M.)
November 28, 2018 Judge Alfred V. Covello added. (Anastasio, F.)
November 28, 2018 Request for Clerk to issue summons as to All Defendants. (Rudzik, Keith)
November 28, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $400 receipt number ACTDC-5064288.), filed by State Farm Fire and Casualty Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A (amended complaint))(Rudzik, Keith)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Connecticut District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: State Farm Insurance Co. v. Hernandez et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: German Tejada
Represented By: Catherine L. Creager
Represented By: Kevin A. Coles
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jill Doe
Represented By: Jeremy C. Virgil
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Virgen Hernandez
Represented By: Catherine L. Creager
Represented By: Kevin A. Coles
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: State Farm Insurance Co.
Represented By: Keith R. Rudzik
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?