Indemnity Ins Co of North America et al v. Chief Fire Prevention & Mechanical Corp.
Plaintiff: Hartford Casualty Insurance Company and Indemnity Ins Co of North America
Defendant: Chief Fire Prevention & Mechanical Corp.
Case Number: 3:2018cv01951
Filed: November 30, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of Connecticut
Presiding Judge: Jeffrey A Meyer
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 28, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 28, 2019 Filing 19 ANSWER to #1 Complaint with Affirmative Defenses by Chief Fire Prevention & Mechanical Corp.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Corporate Disclosure Statement)(Humphrey, Tyler)
January 22, 2019 Filing 18 NOTICE of Appearance by Steven K. Gerber on behalf of Indemnity Ins Co of North America (Gerber, Steven)
January 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER granting #16 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Steven Gerber. Certificate of Good Standing due by 3/18/2019. Signed by Clerk on 01/17/19. (Barry, Donna)
January 16, 2019 Filing 16 MOTION for Attorney(s) Steven Gerber to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (paid $75 PHV fee; receipt number ACTDC-5123289) by Indemnity Ins Co of North America. (Reilly, Lawrence)
January 15, 2019 Answer deadline updated for Chief Fire Prevention & Mechanical Corp. to 1/28/2019. (Barry, Donna)
January 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER granting #13 Motion for Extension of Time. Signed by Judge Jeffrey A. Meyer on 01/15/19. (Barry, Donna)
January 14, 2019 Filing 14 NOTICE of Appearance by Tyler Humphrey on behalf of Chief Fire Prevention & Mechanical Corp. (Humphrey, Tyler)
January 14, 2019 Filing 13 First MOTION for Extension of Time until January 28, 2019 Consent Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to Complaint by Chief Fire Prevention & Mechanical Corp.. (Niederer, Eric)
January 14, 2019 Filing 12 NOTICE of Appearance by Eric W. F. Niederer on behalf of Chief Fire Prevention & Mechanical Corp. (Niederer, Eric)
December 26, 2018 Filing 11 Supplemental SUMMONS Returned Executed by Indemnity Ins Co of North America. (Reilly, Lawrence)
December 20, 2018 Filing 10 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Indemnity Ins Co of North America. Chief Fire Prevention & Mechanical Corp. served on 12/10/2018, answer due 12/31/2018. (Reilly, Lawrence)
December 10, 2018 Filing 9 First Corporate Disclosure Statement by Hartford Casualty Insurance Company. (LaSaracina, Christopher)
December 7, 2018 Filing 8 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Indemnity Ins Co of North America identifying Corporate Parent Chubb Ltd for Indemnity Ins Co of North America. (Reilly, Lawrence)
December 3, 2018 Filing 7 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS REISSUED in accordance with Fed. R. Civ. P. 4 and LR 4 as to *Chief Fire Prevention & Mechanical Corp.* with answer to complaint due within *21* days. Attorney *Lawrence F. Reilly* *The Reilly Law Firm LLC* *90 Grove Street, Ste. 206-17* *Ridgefield, CT 06877*. (Barry, Donna)
December 3, 2018 Filing 6 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED in accordance with Fed. R. Civ. P. 4 and LR 4 as to *Chief Fire Prevention & Mechanical Corp.* with answer to complaint due within *21* days. Attorney *Lawrence F. Reilly* *The Reilly Law Firm LLC* *90 Grove Street, Ste. 206-17* *Ridgefield, CT 06877*. (Barry, Donna)
December 3, 2018 Filing 5 NOTICE TO COUNSEL/SELF-REPRESENTED PARTIES : Counsel or self-represented parties initiating or removing this action are responsible for serving all parties with attached documents and copies of #3 Electronic Filing Order, #2 Order on Pretrial Deadlines, #4 Protective Order, #1 Complaint filed by Indemnity Ins Co of North America, Hartford Casualty Insurance Company. Signed by Clerk on 12/03/18.(Barry, Donna)
November 30, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 4 STANDING PROTECTIVE ORDER. Signed by Judge Jeffrey A. Meyer on 11/30/18.(Barry, Donna)
November 30, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ELECTRONIC FILING ORDER FOR COUNSEL - PLEASE ENSURE COMPLIANCE WITH COURTESY COPY REQUIREMENTS IN THIS ORDER. Signed by Judge Jeffrey A. Meyer on 11/30/18.(Barry, Donna)
November 30, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 2 Order on Pretrial Deadlines: Amended Pleadings due by 1/29/2019, Discovery due by 6/1/2019, Dispositive Motions due by 7/6/2019. Signed by Clerk on 11/30/18.(Barry, Donna)
November 30, 2018 Judge Jeffrey A. Meyer added. (Oliver, T.)
November 30, 2018 Request for Clerk to issue summons as to All Defendants. (Reilly, Lawrence)
November 30, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $400 receipt number ACTDC-5069063.), filed by Indemnity Ins Co of North America, Hartford Casualty Insurance Company.(Reilly, Lawrence)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Connecticut District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Indemnity Ins Co of North America et al v. Chief Fire Prevention & Mechanical Corp.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Hartford Casualty Insurance Company
Represented By: Christopher R. LaSaracina
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Indemnity Ins Co of North America
Represented By: Lawrence F. Reilly
Represented By: Steven K. Gerber
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chief Fire Prevention & Mechanical Corp.
Represented By: Eric W. F. Niederer
Represented By: Tyler Humphrey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?