Tyson v. Dease et al

Plaintiff: Deshawn Tyson
Defendant: Joe Deshawn, Lucille Roach and Joe Dease
Case Number: 3:2018cv01969
Filed: December 4, 2018
Court: Connecticut District Court
Presiding Judge: Janet C Hall
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 7, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 7, 2019 Opinion or Order 9 INITIAL REVIEW ORDER: The Clerk is directed to administratively close the case. If upon the conclusion of his criminal case Tyson can allege facts stating plausible claims that Dease and Roach violated his constitutional rights, and such claims do not impugn the validity of any conviction rendered in his criminal case, Tyson may seek leave to reopen this case and amend his Complaint within 14 days after the state criminal matter is final. Signed by Judge Janet C. Hall on 1/7/2019.(Anastasio, F.)
December 14, 2018 Opinion or Order 8 ORDER granting #7 Motion to Amend/Correct. SO ORDERED by Judge Janet C. Hall on 12/14/2018. (Lewis, D)
December 13, 2018 7 MOTION to Correct #1 Complaint by Deshawn Tyson.Responses due by 1/3/2019 (Anastasio, F.)
December 6, 2018 Opinion or Order 6 ORDER granting #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. If you change your address at any time during the litigation of this case, Local Rule 83.1(c) provides that you notify the court. Failure to do so can result in the dismissal of your case. Signed by Judge William I. Garfinkel on 12/6/2018. (Payton, R.)
December 4, 2018 Opinion or Order 5 PRISCS - STANDING ORDER ON PRISONER ELECTRONIC FILING PROGRAM Signed by Judge Janet C. Hall on 12/4/2018.(Fazekas, J.)
December 4, 2018 Opinion or Order 4 PRISCS - STANDING PROTECTIVE ORDER Signed by Judge Janet C. Hall on 12/4/2018.(Fazekas, J.)
December 4, 2018 Opinion or Order 3 PRISCS - ELECTRONIC FILING ORDER FOR COUNSEL - PLEASE ENSURE COMPLIANCE WITH COURTESY COPY REQUIREMENTS IN THIS ORDER Signed by Judge Janet C. Hall on 12/4/2018.(Fazekas, J.)
December 4, 2018 2 PRISCS - MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Deshawn Tyson. (Fazekas, J.)
December 4, 2018 1 PRISCS - COMPLAINT against Joe Deshawn, Lucille Roach, filed by Deshawn Tyson.(Fazekas, J.)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Connecticut District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Tyson v. Dease et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Joe Deshawn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lucille Roach
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Joe Dease
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Deshawn Tyson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?