Scott v. Valletta et al

Plaintiff: Damon Scott
Defendant: Gerald Valletta, Jane Does and John Does
Case Number: 3:2018cv01970
Filed: December 4, 2018
Court: Connecticut District Court
Presiding Judge: Vanessa L Bryant
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 15, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 15, 2019 11 NOTICE of Change of Address by Damon Scott (Payton, R.)
January 4, 2019 10 Emergency Motion for Issuance of Preliminary Injunction (Responses due by 1/25/2019)and for Temporary Restraining Order by Damon Scott. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service, #2 Declaration in Support of Motion for Preliminary Injunction, #3 Memorandum in Support, #4 Proposed Order). (Velez, F.)
December 19, 2018 Opinion or Order 9 ORDER denying #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis; granting #8 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. If you change your address at any time during the litigation of this case, Local Rule 83.1(c)2 provides that you notify the court. Failure to do so can result in the dismissal of your case. Signed by Judge William I. Garfinkel on 12/19/2018. (Payton, R.)
December 17, 2018 8 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Damon Scott. (Payton, R.)
December 17, 2018 7 EXHIBIT A #5 Standing Protective Order filed by Damon Scott. (Payton, R.)
December 7, 2018 6 Notice to petitioner re: Insufficiency #2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in Forma Pauperis. You must submit the attached Prisoner's IFP application which is being sent to you via U.S. mail. If insufficiency not corrected Dismissal due by 12/28/2018 Signed by Judge William I. Garfinkel on 12/7/2018.(Payton, R.)
December 4, 2018 Opinion or Order 5 STANDING PROTECTIVE ORDER Signed by Judge Vanessa L. Bryant on 12/4/2018.(Payton, R.)
December 4, 2018 Opinion or Order 4 ELECTRONIC FILING ORDER FOR COUNSEL - PLEASE ENSURE COMPLIANCE WITH COURTESY COPY REQUIREMENTS IN THIS ORDER Signed by Judge Vanessa L. Bryant on 12/4/2018.(Payton, R.)
December 4, 2018 Opinion or Order 3 STANDING ORDER ON PRISONER ELECTRONIC FILING PROGRAM Signed by Judge Janet C. Hall on 12/4/2018.(Payton, R.)
December 4, 2018 2 PRISCS-MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Damon Scott. (Payton, R.)
December 4, 2018 1 PRISCS-COMPLAINT against Jane Does, John Does, Gerald Valletta, filed by Damon Scott.(Payton, R.)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Connecticut District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Scott v. Valletta et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gerald Valletta
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jane Does
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Does
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Damon Scott
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?