Orr v. Carrington et al

Plaintiff: Anthony D. Orr
Defendant: Office of Corporation Counsel, Jane Doe, John Doe, City of Waterbury, Department of Corrections and Truleia R. Carrington
Case Number: 3:2018cv01986
Filed: December 6, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of Connecticut
Presiding Judge: Michael P Shea
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 14, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 14, 2019 Filing 8 JUDGMENT entered in favor of Department of Corrections, Jane Doe, John Doe, Office of Corporation Counsel, Truleia R. Carrington against Anthony D. Orr.For Appeal Forms please go to the following website: http://www.ctd.uscourts.gov/forms/all-forms/appeals_forms Signed by Clerk on 1/14/19.(Johnson, D.)
January 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER: As set forth in the attached, the claim against the defendants for an infringement of HIPAA privacy rights is DISMISSED pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1915A(b)(1). If the plaintiff chooses to appeal this decision, he may not do so in forma pauperis, because such an appeal would not be taken in good faith. See 28 U.S.C. 1915(a)(3). The court notes, however, that the plaintiff is not precluded from discussing this alleged violation of HIPAA with appointed counsel in Orr v. Waterbury Police Dept, et al., Case No. 3:17cv788(VAB) and raising the matter, to the extent that it would be appropriate, as a discovery issue/dispute in that action. The Clerk is directed to enter judgment for the defendants and close this case. Signed by Judge Michael P. Shea on 1/11/2019. (Ram, Megha)
December 7, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER granting #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. If you change your address at any time during the litigation of this case, Local Rule 83.1(c)2 provides that you notify the court. Failure to do so can result in the dismissal of your case. Signed by Judge William I. Garfinkel on 12/7/2018. (Payton, R.)
December 6, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ELECTRONIC FILING ORDER FOR COUNSEL - PLEASE ENSURE COMPLIANCE WITH COURTESY COPY REQUIREMENTS IN THIS ORDER Signed by Judge Michael P. Shea on 12/6/2018.(Murphy, Tatihana)
December 6, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 4 Prisoner E-Filing Standing Order on Prisoner Electronic Filing Program Signed by Judge Janet C. Hall on 12/6/2018.(Murphy, Tatihana)
December 6, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 3 STANDING PROTECTIVE ORDER Signed by Judge Michael P. Shea on 12/6/2018.(Murphy, Tatihana)
December 6, 2018 Filing 2 PRISCS MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Anthony D. Orr. (Mendez, D)
December 6, 2018 Filing 1 PRISCS COMPLAINT against Truleia R. Carrington, Office of Corporation Counsel, Department of Corrections, Jane Doe, John Doe, City of Waterbury, filed by Anthony D. Orr.(Mendez, D)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Connecticut District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Orr v. Carrington et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Office of Corporation Counsel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jane Doe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City of Waterbury
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Department of Corrections
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Truleia R. Carrington
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Anthony D. Orr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?