Kreipovich et al v. Nationwide Mutual Fire Insurance Company et al
Plaintiff: Andrea H. Kreipovich and Michael A. Kreipovich
Defendant: Nationwide Mutual Fire Insurance Company and Liberty Mutual Fire Insurance Company
Case Number: 3:2018cv01990
Filed: December 6, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of Connecticut
Presiding Judge: Jeffrey A Meyer
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 28, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 28, 2019 Filing 27 ANSWER to Complaint with Affirmative Defenses by Liberty Mutual Fire Insurance Company.(Leary, Kieran)
January 28, 2019 Filing 26 ANSWER to Complaint with Affirmative Defenses by Nationwide Mutual Fire Insurance Company.(Laurie, Robert)
January 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 25 GENERAL SCHEDULING ORDER. The Court has reviewed the parties' Rule 26(f) report (Doc. #24 ) and concludes that the dates suggested are too lengthy in light of the anticipated complexity of this case. The Court concludes that any necessary discovery can be concluded within one year from the date of filing of this action and that any dispositive motions should be filed within 30 days after the conclusion of discovery. Accordingly, the Court enters the following scheduling order. All discovery shall be completed by December 6, 2019, and the parties should reach an agreement among themselves about interim discovery dates. Any dispositive summary judgment motions shall be filed by 30 days after the close of discovery on January 6, 2020, and any response to dispositive summary judgment motions shall be filed within 30 days by February 6, 2020. The parties' joint trial memorandum is due by 30 days after the close of discovery on January 6, 2020, or within 30 days of the Court's ruling on dispositive summary judgment motions, whichever date is later. The Court will thereafter set a trial date, and the parties should be prepared to proceed to jury selection within 30 days of the filing of the joint trial memorandum. Please refer to Judge Meyer's webpage on the District of Connecticut website for Judge Meyer's "Instructions for Discovery Disputes" and "Instructions for Joint Trial Memorandum" and "Pretrial Preferences" and "Trial Preferences." The parties are encouraged to commence discovery forthwith and to arrange their schedules in contemplation of the briefing deadlines for any dispositive motions, because the Court is unlikely to grant a future request for an extension of the scheduling order absent extraordinary and unforeseeable circumstances. A telephonic status conference will be held on August 16, 2019 at 4:30 pm. Plaintiff shall initiate call. Once all parties are on the line, please call chambers at (203) 773-2105. It is so ordered. Signed by Judge Jeffrey A. Meyer on 1/23/2019.(Gutierrez, Y.)
January 22, 2019 Filing 24 Joint REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (Britton, Lindsay)
January 15, 2019 Answer deadline updated for Nationwide Mutual Fire Insurance Company to 1/28/2019. (Barry, Donna)
January 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER granting #22 Motion for Extension of Time. Signed by Judge Jeffrey A. Meyer on 01/15/19. (Barry, Donna)
January 14, 2019 Filing 22 Second MOTION for Extension of Time until January 28, 2019 to Plead by Nationwide Mutual Fire Insurance Company. (Laurie, Robert)
January 2, 2019 Filing 21 Amended Corporate Disclosure Statement by Nationwide Mutual Fire Insurance Company. (McCoy, Heather)
January 2, 2019 Filing 20 NOTICE of Appearance by Kieran W Leary on behalf of Liberty Mutual Fire Insurance Company (Leary, Kieran)
December 10, 2018 Answer deadline updated for Nationwide Mutual Fire Insurance Company to 1/14/2019. (Fanelle, N.)
December 10, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER granting #18 Motion for Extension of Time until 01/14/2019 to Plead. Signed by Judge Jeffrey A. Meyer on 12/10/2018. (Fanelle, N.)
December 7, 2018 Filing 18 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time until 01/14/2019 to Plead by Nationwide Mutual Fire Insurance Company. (Laurie, Robert)
December 7, 2018 Filing 17 NOTICE of Appearance by Heather L McCoy on behalf of Nationwide Mutual Fire Insurance Company (McCoy, Heather)
December 7, 2018 Filing 16 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Nationwide Mutual Fire Insurance Company identifying Corporate Parent Nationwide Mutual Insurance Company for Nationwide Mutual Fire Insurance Company. (Laurie, Robert)
December 7, 2018 Filing 15 Consent NOTICE by Nationwide Mutual Fire Insurance Company TO REMOVAL (Laurie, Robert)
December 7, 2018 Filing 14 NOTICE of Appearance by Robert D. Laurie on behalf of Nationwide Mutual Fire Insurance Company (Laurie, Robert)
December 7, 2018 Filing 13 DEMAND for Trial by Jury by Andrea H. Kreipovich, Michael A. Kreipovich. (Lindequist, Jeffrey)
December 7, 2018 Filing 12 NOTICE of Appearance by Lindsay Britton on behalf of Andrea H. Kreipovich, Michael A. Kreipovich (Britton, Lindsay)
December 7, 2018 Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance by Daniel Michael Blouin on behalf of Nationwide Mutual Fire Insurance Company (Blouin, Daniel)
December 7, 2018 Filing 10 NOTICE TO COUNSEL/SELF-REPRESENTED PARTIES : Counsel or self-represented parties initiating or removing this action are responsible for serving all parties with attached documents and copies of #4 Notice (Other) filed by Liberty Mutual Fire Insurance Company, #1 Notice of Removal, filed by Liberty Mutual Fire Insurance Company, #8 Electronic Filing Order, #7 Order on Pretrial Deadlines, #5 Notice (Other) filed by Liberty Mutual Fire Insurance Company, #9 Protective Order, #6 Corporate Disclosure Statement, filed by Liberty Mutual Fire Insurance Company, #3 Notice (Other) filed by Liberty Mutual Fire Insurance Company, #2 Notice of Appearance filed by Liberty Mutual Fire Insurance Company Signed by Clerk on 12/07/18. (Attachments: #1 STANDING ORDER ON REMOVED CASES)(Barry, Donna)
December 6, 2018 Set Hearings: Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 1/21/2019. (Gutierrez, Y.)
December 6, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 9 STANDING PROTECTIVE ORDER. Signed by Judge Jeffrey A. Meyer on 12/06/18.(Barry, Donna)
December 6, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ELECTRONIC FILING ORDER FOR COUNSEL - PLEASE ENSURE COMPLIANCE WITH COURTESY COPY REQUIREMENTS IN THIS ORDER. Signed by Judge Jeffrey A. Meyer on 12/06/18.(Barry, Donna)
December 6, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 7 Order on Pretrial Deadlines: Amended Pleadings due by 2/4/2019, Discovery due by 6/7/2019, Dispositive Motions due by 7/12/2019. Signed by Clerk on 12/06/18.(Barry, Donna)
December 6, 2018 Judge Jeffrey A. Meyer added. (Oliver, T.)
December 6, 2018 Filing 6 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Liberty Mutual Fire Insurance Company identifying Corporate Parent Liberty Mutual Holding Company, Inc., Corporate Parent Liberty Mutual Group, Inc., Corporate Parent LMHC Massachusetts Holdings, Inc. for Liberty Mutual Fire Insurance Company. (Newbury, Philip)
December 6, 2018 Filing 5 NOTICE by Liberty Mutual Fire Insurance Company Certificate of Filing and Service of Notice of Removal (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Notice of Filing and Service of Notice of Removal)(Newbury, Philip)
December 6, 2018 Filing 4 NOTICE by Liberty Mutual Fire Insurance Company Compliance with Standing Order in Removed Cases (Newbury, Philip)
December 6, 2018 Filing 3 NOTICE by Liberty Mutual Fire Insurance Company Notice of Pending Motions (Newbury, Philip)
December 6, 2018 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by Philip T. Newbury, Jr on behalf of Liberty Mutual Fire Insurance Company (Newbury, Philip)
December 6, 2018 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Liberty Mutual Fire Insurance Company from Superior Court, Judicial District of Tolland at Rockville, case number TTD-CV18-6016377-S. Filing fee $ 400 receipt number ACTDC-5076390, filed by Liberty Mutual Fire Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Summons, #2 Exhibit Complaint, #3 Exhibit Return of Service)(Newbury, Philip)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Connecticut District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Kreipovich et al v. Nationwide Mutual Fire Insurance Company et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Andrea H. Kreipovich
Represented By: Jeffrey R Lindequist
Represented By: Lindsay Britton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael A. Kreipovich
Represented By: Jeffrey R Lindequist
Represented By: Lindsay Britton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nationwide Mutual Fire Insurance Company
Represented By: Robert D. Laurie
Represented By: Heather L McCoy
Represented By: Daniel Michael Blouin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Liberty Mutual Fire Insurance Company
Represented By: Philip T. Newbury, Jr.
Represented By: Kieran W Leary
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?