Bakery Bread from Heaven II LLC v. United States Department of Agriculture et al

Plaintiff: Bakery Bread from Heaven II LLC
Defendant: Retailer Operations Division, Dept of Agriculture, Food and Nutrition Service, Jon Yorgason, Administrative Review Officier and United States Department of Agriculture
Case Number: 3:2018cv01992
Filed: December 6, 2018
Court: Connecticut District Court
Presiding Judge: Janet C Hall
Nature of Suit: Agriculture Acts
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 15, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 15, 2019 Opinion or Order 8 ORDER DISMISSING CASE: An Order to Show Cause (Doc. No. #7 ) why this case should not be dismissed for failure to file an appropriate notice of appearance was entered in this case. The plaintiff was directed to have an attorney file an appearance on its behalf by 1/9/2019. No attorney having appeared on behalf of plaintiff, the case is dismissed pursuant to Order to Show Cause (Doc. No. #7 ). SO ORDERED by Judge Janet C. Hall on 1/15/2019.(Lewis, D)
December 11, 2018 Opinion or Order 7 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE: plaintiff is hereby ordered to show cause why this case should not be dismissed for failure to file an appropriate notice of appearance in this case. The plaintiff, Bakery Bread from Heaven II LLC is a corporate entity and cannot represent itself. A corporate entity must be represented by an attorney who is a member of the Bar of the District of Connecticut. The plaintiff must have an attorney file a appearance on its behalf by 1/9/2019. Failure to do so will result in the dismissal of this case. Show Cause Response due by 1/8/2019 Signed by Judge Janet C. Hall on 12/11/2018.(Lewis, D)
December 7, 2018 6 NOTICE TO COUNSEL/SELF-REPRESENTED PARTIES : Counsel or self-represented parties initiating or removing this action are responsible for serving all parties with attached documents and copies of #2 Order on Pretrial Deadlines, #3 Electronic Filing Order, #5 Order, #4 Protective Order, #1 Complaint filed by Bakery Bread from Heaven II LLC. Signed by Clerk on 12/6/2018.(Pipech, L.)
December 6, 2018 Opinion or Order 5 Standing Order re: Discovery. Signed by Judge Janet C. Hall on 12/6/2018.(Pipech, L.)
December 6, 2018 Opinion or Order 4 STANDING PROTECTIVE ORDER. Signed by Judge Janet C. Hall on 12/6/2018.(Pipech, L.)
December 6, 2018 Opinion or Order 3 ELECTRONIC FILING ORDER FOR COUNSEL - PLEASE ENSURE COMPLIANCE WITH COURTESY COPY REQUIREMENTS IN THIS ORDER. Signed by Judge Janet C. Hall on 12/6/2018.(Pipech, L.)
December 6, 2018 Opinion or Order 2 Order on Pretrial Deadlines: Amended Pleadings due by 2/4/2019; Discovery due by 6/7/2019; Dispositive Motions due by 7/12/2019. Signed by Clerk on 12/6/2018.(Pipech, L.)
December 6, 2018 Filing fee received from Bakery Bread From Heaven: $ 400.00, receipt number CTXH00014937. (Pipech, L.)
December 6, 2018 1 COMPLAINT against Administrative Review Officier, Dept of Agriculture, Food and Nutrition Service, Retailer Operations Division, Jon Yorgason, filed by Bakery Bread from Heaven II LLC.(Pipech, L.)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Connecticut District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bakery Bread from Heaven II LLC v. United States Department of Agriculture et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Retailer Operations Division
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dept of Agriculture
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Food and Nutrition Service
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jon Yorgason
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Administrative Review Officier
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States Department of Agriculture
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bakery Bread from Heaven II LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?