USA v. Tradebe Treatment and Recycling Northeast, LLC

Plaintiff: USA
Defendant: Tradebe Treatment and Recycling Northeast, LLC
Case Number: 3:2018cv02031
Filed: December 12, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of Connecticut
Presiding Judge: Kari A Dooley
Nature of Suit: Environmental Matters
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 4, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 4, 2019 JUDICIAL PROCEEDINGS SURVEY - FOR COUNSEL ONLY: The following link to the confidential survey requires you to log into CM/ECF for SECURITY purposes. Once in CM/ECF you will be prompted for the case number. Although you are receiving this survey through CM/ECF, it is hosted on an independent website called SurveyMonkey. Once in SurveyMonkey, the survey is located in a secure account. The survey is not docketed and it is not sent directly to the judge. To ensure anonymity, completed surveys are held up to 90 days before they are sent to the judge for review. We hope you will take this opportunity to participate, please click on this link: https://ecf.ctd.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/Dispatch.pl?survey (Gould, K.)
February 1, 2019 Filing 10 JUDGMENT on Consent For Appeal Forms please go to the following website: http://www.ctd.uscourts.gov/forms/all-forms/appeals_forms Signed by Judge Kari A. Dooley on 2/1/2019.(Gould, K.)
February 1, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by Brian C. Freeman on behalf of Tradebe Treatment and Recycling Northeast, LLC (Freeman, Brian)
February 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER Approving #7 Settlement and Consent Decree. The Court has reviewed the Unopposed Motion to Enter Consent Decree, the Proposed Consent Decree and the authority upon which the parties rely. The Court agrees that the Consent Decree is fair, reasonable and serves the public interest. See, SEC v. Citigroup Global Mkts., 752 F.3d 285 (2d Cir. 2014). The court has therefore executed the Consent Decree as requested. It shall be separately docketed and shall enter as a Judgment of this Court. Signed by Judge Kari A. Dooley on 2/1/19. (Dooley, Kari)
January 31, 2019 Filing 7 MOTION for Settlement Unopposed Motion to Enter Consent Decree and Memorandum in Support by USA. (Donohue, Brian) Modified on 2/1/2019 (Gould, K.).
December 12, 2018 Filing 6 NOTICE TO COUNSEL/SELF-REPRESENTED PARTIES : Counsel or self-represented parties initiating or removing this action are responsible for serving all parties with attached documents and copies of #3 Order on Pretrial Deadlines, #1 Complaint filed by USA, #4 Electronic Filing Order, #5 Standing Protective Order, #2 Notice of Lodging of Proposed Consent Decree filed by USA Signed by Clerk on 12/12/2018.(Fazekas, J.)
December 12, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 5 STANDING PROTECTIVE ORDER Signed by Judge Kari A. Dooley on 12/12/2018.(Fazekas, J.)
December 12, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ELECTRONIC FILING ORDER FOR COUNSEL - PLEASE ENSURE COMPLIANCE WITH COURTESY COPY REQUIREMENTS IN THIS ORDER Signed by Judge Kari A. Dooley on 12/12/2018.(Fazekas, J.)
December 12, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 3 Order on Pretrial Deadlines: Amended Pleadings due by 2/10/2019. Discovery due by 6/13/2019. Dispositive Motions due by 7/18/2019. Signed by Clerk on 12/12/2018.(Fazekas, J.)
December 12, 2018 Judge Kari A. Dooley added. (Oliver, T.)
December 12, 2018 Filing 2 NOTICE by USA of Lodging of Proposed Consent Decree (Attachments: #1 Proposed Consent Decree)(Donohue, Brian) Modified on 12/12/2018 to correct party(Hushin, Z.).
December 12, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Tradebe Treatment and Recycling Northeast, LLC, filed by USA. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Donohue, Brian) Modified on 12/12/2018 to correct party (Hushin, Z.).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Connecticut District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: USA v. Tradebe Treatment and Recycling Northeast, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tradebe Treatment and Recycling Northeast, LLC
Represented By: Brian C. Freeman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: USA
Represented By: Brian G. Donohue
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?