Main Street America Assurance Company v. Savalle et al

Plaintiff: Main Street America Assurance Company
Defendant: Lee Winakor and Vincent Savalle
Case Number: 3:2018cv02073
Filed: December 18, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of Connecticut
Presiding Judge: Janet C Hall
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 5, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 5, 2019 Filing 19 AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Main Street America Assurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Ober, Scott)
February 5, 2019 Filing 18 NOTICE by Main Street America Assurance Company Notice of Amendment of Complaint (Ober, Scott)
February 1, 2019 Answer deadline updated for Lee Winakor to 2/20/2019. (Lewis, D)
February 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER granting #16 First MOTION for Extension of Time until February 20, 2019 to file a responsive pleading #1 Complaint. SO ORDERED by Judge Janet C. Hall on 2/1/2019. (Lewis, D)
January 30, 2019 Filing 16 First MOTION for Extension of Time until February 20, 2019 to file a responsive pleading #1 Complaint by Lee Winakor. (Geraghty, Paul)
January 29, 2019 Answer deadline updated for Vincent Savalle to 2/18/2019. (Lewis, D)
January 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER granting #14 First MOTION for Extension of Time until February 18, 2019 Response to complaint. SO ORDERED by Judge Janet C. Hall on 1/29/2019. (Lewis, D)
January 28, 2019 Filing 14 First MOTION for Extension of Time until February 18, 2019 Response to complaint by Vincent Savalle. (Lee, James)
January 28, 2019 Filing 13 NOTICE of Appearance by James H. Lee on behalf of Vincent Savalle (Lee, James)
January 25, 2019 Set Deadlines/Hearings: Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 3/11/2019 (DeRubeis, B.)
January 24, 2019 Filing 12 NOTICE of Appearance by Paul M. Geraghty on behalf of Lee Winakor (Geraghty, Paul)
January 22, 2019 Filing 11 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Main Street America Assurance Company. Vincent Savalle served on 1/9/2019, answer due 1/30/2019. (Ober, Scott)
January 22, 2019 Filing 10 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Main Street America Assurance Company. Lee Winakor served on 1/9/2019, answer due 1/30/2019. (Ober, Scott)
January 3, 2019 Filing 9 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED in accordance with Fed. R. Civ. P. 4 and LR 4 as to *Vincent Savalle, Lee Winakor* with answer to complaint due within *21* days. Attorney *Scott T. Ober* *Hassett & Donnelly, P.C.-MA* *446 Main St., 12th Floor* *Worcester, MA 01608*. (Anastasio, F.)
January 2, 2019 Request for Clerk to issue summons as to All Defendants. (Ober, Scott)
December 18, 2018 Filing 8 NOTICE TO COUNSEL/SELF-REPRESENTED PARTIES : Counsel or self-represented parties initiating or removing this action are responsible for serving all parties with attached documents and copies of #3 Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Main Street America Assurance Company, #4 Order on Pretrial Deadlines, #6 Standing Protective Order, #1 Complaint filed by Main Street America Assurance Company, #2 Notice of Appearance filed by Main Street America Assurance Company, #5 Electronic Filing Order, #7 Standing Order re: Discovery. Signed by Clerk on 12/18/18.(Barry, Donna)
December 18, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 7 STANDING ORDER re: Discovery. Signed by Judge Janet C. Hall on 12/18/18.(Barry, Donna)
December 18, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 6 STANDING PROTECTIVE ORDER. Signed by Judge Janet C. Hall on 12/18/18.(Barry, Donna)
December 18, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ELECTRONIC FILING ORDER FOR COUNSEL - PLEASE ENSURE COMPLIANCE WITH COURTESY COPY REQUIREMENTS IN THIS ORDER. Signed by Judge Janet C. Hall on 12/18/18.(Barry, Donna)
December 18, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 4 Order on Pretrial Deadlines: Amended Pleadings due by 2/16/2019, Discovery due by 6/19/2019 and Dispositive Motions due by 7/24/2019. Signed by Clerk on 12/18/18.(Barry, Donna)
December 18, 2018 Judge Janet C. Hall added. (Anastasio, F.)
December 18, 2018 Filing 3 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Main Street America Assurance Company. (Ober, Scott)
December 18, 2018 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by Kelly E. Petter on behalf of Main Street America Assurance Company (Petter, Kelly)
December 18, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $400 receipt number ACTDC-5090000.), filed by Main Street America Assurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Ober, Scott)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Connecticut District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Main Street America Assurance Company v. Savalle et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Main Street America Assurance Company
Represented By: Scott T. Ober
Represented By: Kelly E. Petter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lee Winakor
Represented By: Paul M. Geraghty
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Vincent Savalle
Represented By: James H. Lee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?