Nelson v. Countrywide Home Loans, Inc et al

Plaintiff: Moses Nelson
Defendant: Wells Fargo Bank, N.A., Countrywide Home Loans, Inc, John Does, U.S. Bank National Association, Mortgage Electronic Registration Systems, Inc., Bank of America, N.A., American Brokers Conduit and Jane Roes
Case Number: 3:2018cv02081
Filed: December 19, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of Connecticut
Presiding Judge: Stefan R Underhill
Nature of Suit: Racketeer/Corrupt Organization
Cause of Action: 18:1964
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 8, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 4, 2019 Filing 18 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Mortgage Electronic Registration Systems, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent MERSCORP Holdings, Inc., Corporate Parent Maroon Holding, LLC, Corporate Parent Intercontinental Exchange, Inc. for Mortgage Electronic Registration Systems, Inc.. (Machado-Costa, Annabelle)
February 1, 2019 Filing 17 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Countrywide Home Loans, Inc identifying Corporate Parent Bank of America Corporation, Corporate Parent Countrywide Financial Corporation for Countrywide Home Loans, Inc. (Machado-Costa, Annabelle)
February 1, 2019 Filing 16 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Bank of America, N.A. identifying Corporate Parent Bank of America Corporation, Corporate Parent BANA Holding Corporation, Corporate Parent BAC North America Holding Company, Corporate Parent NB Holding Corporation for Bank of America, N.A.. (Machado-Costa, Annabelle)
February 1, 2019 Filing 15 NOTICE by Bank of America, N.A., Countrywide Home Loans, Inc, Mortgage Electronic Registration Systems, Inc. re #14 MOTION to Dismiss (Notice to Pro Se Litigant) (Machado-Costa, Annabelle)
February 1, 2019 Filing 14 MOTION to Dismiss by Bank of America, N.A., Countrywide Home Loans, Inc, Mortgage Electronic Registration Systems, Inc..Responses due by 2/22/2019 (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support MOL In Support of Motion to Dismiss, #2 Exhibit Ex. A, #3 Exhibit Ex. B, #4 Exhibit Ex. C, #5 Exhibit Ex. D, #6 Exhibit Ex. E, #7 Exhibit Ex. F, #8 Exhibit Ex. G, #9 Exhibit Ex, H, #10 Exhibit Ex. I, #11 Exhibit Ex. J)(Machado-Costa, Annabelle)
February 1, 2019 Filing 13 NOTICE of Appearance by Annabelle T Machado-Costa on behalf of Bank of America, N.A., Countrywide Home Loans, Inc, Mortgage Electronic Registration Systems, Inc. (Machado-Costa, Annabelle)
January 9, 2019 Filing 12 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Moses Nelson. American Brokers Conduit served on 1/8/2019, answer due 1/29/2019. (Oliver, T.)
January 9, 2019 Filing 11 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Moses Nelson. Countrywide Home Loans, Inc served on 1/8/2019, answer due 1/29/2019. (Oliver, T.)
January 9, 2019 Filing 10 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Moses Nelson. Wells Fargo Bank, N.A. served on 1/8/2019, answer due 1/29/2019. (Oliver, T.)
January 9, 2019 Filing 9 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Moses Nelson. Mortgage Electronic Registration Systems, Inc. served on 1/8/2019, answer due 1/29/2019. (Oliver, T.)
January 9, 2019 Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Moses Nelson. Bank of America, N.A. served on 1/8/2019, answer due 1/29/2019. (Oliver, T.)
January 9, 2019 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Moses Nelson. U.S. Bank National Association served on 1/8/2019, answer due 1/29/2019. (Oliver, T.)
December 20, 2018 Filing 6 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED in accordance with Fed. R. Civ. P. 4 and LR 4 as to *American Brokers Conduit, Bank of America, N.A., Countrywide Home Loans, Inc, John Does, Mortgage Electronic Registration Systems, Inc., Jane Roes, U.S. Bank National Association, Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.* with answer to complaint due within *21* days. *Moses Nelson* *1584 North Avenue* *Bridgeport, CT 06604* (Fazekas, J.)
December 20, 2018 Filing 5 NOTICE TO COUNSEL/SELF-REPRESENTED PARTIES : Counsel or self-represented parties initiating or removing this action are responsible for serving all parties with attached documents and copies of #2 Order on Pretrial Deadlines, #4 Standing Protective Order, #1 Complaint, filed by Moses Nelson, #3 Electronic Filing Order Signed by Clerk on 12/20/2018.(Fazekas, J.)
December 19, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 4 STANDING PROTECTIVE ORDER Signed by Judge Stefan R Underhill on 12/19/2018.(Fazekas, J.)
December 19, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ELECTRONIC FILING ORDER FOR COUNSEL - PLEASE ENSURE COMPLIANCE WITH COURTESY COPY REQUIREMENTS IN THIS ORDER Signed by Judge Stefan R Underhill on 12/19/2018.(Fazekas, J.)
December 19, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 2 Order on Pretrial Deadlines: Amended Pleadings due by 2/17/2019. Discovery due by 6/20/2019. Dispositive Motions due by 7/25/2019. Signed by Clerk on 12/19/2018.(Fazekas, J.)
December 19, 2018 Filing fee received from Moses Nelson: $400.00, receipt number CTXB00009808. (Fazekas, J.)
December 19, 2018 Filing 1 Verified COMPLAINT against American Brokers Conduit, Bank of America, N.A., Countrywide Home Loans, Inc, John Does, Mortgage Electronic Registration Systems, Inc., Jane Roes, U.S. Bank National Association, Wells Fargo Bank, N.A., filed by Moses Nelson.(Fazekas, J.) Modified on 12/20/2018 to edit text (Fazekas, J.).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Connecticut District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Nelson v. Countrywide Home Loans, Inc et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Countrywide Home Loans, Inc
Represented By: Annabelle T Machado-Costa
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Does
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: U.S. Bank National Association
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mortgage Electronic Registration Systems, Inc.
Represented By: Annabelle T Machado-Costa
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bank of America, N.A.
Represented By: Annabelle T Machado-Costa
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: American Brokers Conduit
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jane Roes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Moses Nelson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?