Nino v. Countrywide Home Loans, Inc et al

Plaintiff: Ludys C. Nino
Defendant: Countrywide Home Loans, Inc, John Does, IndyMac, JP Morgan Chase Bank, N.A., OneWest Bank, Mortgage Electronic Registration Systems, Inc., Ocwen Loan Servicing, LLC, Bank of America, N.A., Jane Roes and M&T Bank Corporation
Case Number: 3:2018cv02086
Filed: December 19, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of Connecticut
Presiding Judge: Janet C Hall
Nature of Suit: Racketeer/Corrupt Organization
Cause of Action: 18:1964
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 4, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 13, 2019 Filing 27 MOTION to Claim and Exercise Constitutionally secured rights by Ludys C. Nino.Responses due by 3/6/2019 (Payton, R.)
February 13, 2019 Filing 26 OBJECTION re #14 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Ludys C. Nino. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum of Law and Judicial Notice of Adjudicative Facts)(Payton, R.)
February 8, 2019 Filing 25 NOTICE by OneWest Bank re #24 First MOTION to Dismiss Notice to Pro Se Litigant (Forcella, Victoria)
February 8, 2019 Filing 24 First MOTION to Dismiss by OneWest Bank.Responses due by 3/1/2019 (Forcella, Victoria)
February 8, 2019 Filing 23 NOTICE of Appearance by Victoria Lynn Forcella on behalf of OneWest Bank (Forcella, Victoria)
February 1, 2019 Filing 22 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Bank of America, N.A. identifying Corporate Parent Bank of America Corporation, Corporate Parent BANA Holding Corporation, Corporate Parent BAC North America Holding Company, Corporate Parent NB Holding Corporation, Corporate Parent BAC North America Holding Corporation for Bank of America, N.A.. (Grendi, Zachary)
February 1, 2019 Filing 21 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Countrywide Home Loans, Inc identifying Corporate Parent Bank of America Corporation, Corporate Parent Countrywide Financial Corporation for Countrywide Home Loans, Inc. (Grendi, Zachary)
February 1, 2019 Filing 20 Corporate Disclosure Statement by M&T Bank Corporation identifying Corporate Parent M&T Bank Corporation, Corporate Parent Wilmington Trust Corporation for M&T Bank Corporation. (Grendi, Zachary)
January 30, 2019 Answer deadline updated for JP Morgan Chase Bank, N.A. to 3/1/2019. (Lewis, D)
January 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER granting #18 MOTION for Extension of Time until March 1, 2019 to File a Responsive Pleading #1 Complaint,. SO ORDERED by Judge Janet C. Hall on 1/30/2019. (Lewis, D)
January 28, 2019 Filing 18 MOTION for Extension of Time until March 1, 2019 to File a Responsive Pleading #1 Complaint, by JP Morgan Chase Bank, N.A.. (Rich, Brian)
January 25, 2019 Set Deadlines/Hearings: Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 3/8/2019 (DeRubeis, B.)
January 24, 2019 Filing 17 Corporate Disclosure Statement by JP Morgan Chase Bank, N.A. identifying Corporate Parent JPMorgan Chase & Co for JP Morgan Chase Bank, N.A.. (Rich, Brian)
January 24, 2019 Filing 16 NOTICE of Appearance by Brian D. Rich on behalf of JP Morgan Chase Bank, N.A. (Rich, Brian)
January 24, 2019 Filing 15 NOTICE of Appearance by Peter Robert Meggers on behalf of JP Morgan Chase Bank, N.A. (Meggers, Peter)
January 22, 2019 Filing 14 MOTION to Dismiss by Bank of America, N.A., Countrywide Home Loans, Inc, M&T Bank Corporation.Responses due by 2/12/2019 (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D, #6 Exhibit E, #7 Exhibit F, #8 Exhibit G, #9 Exhibit H, #10 Notice to Pro Se Litigant)(Grendi, Zachary)
January 22, 2019 Filing 13 NOTICE of Appearance by Zachary Bennett Grendi on behalf of Bank of America, N.A., Countrywide Home Loans, Inc, Mortgage Electronic Registration Systems, Inc., M&T Bank Corporation (Grendi, Zachary)
January 16, 2019 Filing 12 Acknowledgment of Receipt re: #1 Complaint. Acknowledgment filed by Ludys C. Nino. (Oliver, T.)
January 16, 2019 Filing 11 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons & Complaint served on Bank of America on 1/8/2019, filed by Ludys C. Nino. (Oliver, T.)
January 16, 2019 Filing 10 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons & Complaint served on Countrywide Home Loans, Inc on 1/8/2019, filed by Ludys C. Nino. (Oliver, T.)
January 2, 2019 Filing 9 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Ludys C. Nino re #8 Electronic Summons, mailed to defendants with waivers. (Fanelle, N.)
December 20, 2018 Filing 8 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED in accordance with Fed. R. Civ. P. 4 and LR 4 as to *Bank of America, N.A., Countrywide Home Loans, Inc, John Does, IndyMac, JP Morgan Chase Bank, N.A., Mortgage Electronic Registration Systems, Inc., Ocwen Loan Servicing, LLC, OneWest Bank, Jane Roes* with answer to complaint due within *21* days. *Ludys C. Nino* *P.O. Box 4906* *Greenwich, CT 06831* (Fazekas, J.)
December 20, 2018 Filing 7 Docket Entry Correction re #2 Order on Pretrial Deadlines, REPLACEMENT PDF. (Fazekas, J.)
December 20, 2018 Filing 6 NOTICE TO COUNSEL/SELF-REPRESENTED PARTIES : Counsel or self-represented parties initiating or removing this action are responsible for serving all parties with attached documents and copies of #1 Verified Complaint, filed by Ludys C. Nino, #4 Standing Protective Order, #2 Order on Pretrial Deadlines, #5 Standing Order Re: Discovery, #3 Electronic Filing Order Signed by Clerk on 12/20/2018.(Fazekas, J.)
December 19, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 5 STANDING ORDER RE: DISCOVERY Signed by Judge Janet C. Hall on 12/19/2018.(Fazekas, J.)
December 19, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 4 STANDING PROTECTIVE ORDER Signed by Judge Janet C. Hall on 12/19/2018.(Fazekas, J.)
December 19, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ELECTRONIC FILING ORDER FOR COUNSEL - PLEASE ENSURE COMPLIANCE WITH COURTESY COPY REQUIREMENTS IN THIS ORDER Signed by Judge Janet C. Hall on 12/19/2018.(Fazekas, J.)
December 19, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 2 Order on Pretrial Deadlines: Amended Pleadings due by 2/17/2019. Discovery due by 6/20/2019. Dispositive Motions due by 7/25/2019. Signed by Clerk on 12/19/2018.(Fazekas, J.) (Additional attachment(s) added on 12/20/2018: #1 REPLACEMENT PDF) (Fazekas, J.).
December 19, 2018 Filing fee received from Ludys C. Nino: $400.00, receipt number CTXB00009811. (Fazekas, J.)
December 19, 2018 Filing 1 Verified COMPLAINT against Bank of America, N.A., Countrywide Home Loans, Inc, John Does, IndyMac, JP Morgan Chase Bank, N.A., Mortgage Electronic Registration Systems, Inc., Ocwen Loan Servicing, LLC, OneWest Bank, Jane Roes, filed by Ludys C. Nino.(Fazekas, J.)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Connecticut District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Nino v. Countrywide Home Loans, Inc et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Countrywide Home Loans, Inc
Represented By: Zachary Bennett Grendi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Does
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: IndyMac
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JP Morgan Chase Bank, N.A.
Represented By: Brian D. Rich
Represented By: Peter Robert Meggers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: OneWest Bank
Represented By: Victoria Lynn Forcella
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mortgage Electronic Registration Systems, Inc.
Represented By: Zachary Bennett Grendi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ocwen Loan Servicing, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bank of America, N.A.
Represented By: Zachary Bennett Grendi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jane Roes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: M&T Bank Corporation
Represented By: Zachary Bennett Grendi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ludys C. Nino
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?