Deutsche Bank National Trust Company v. Porzio et al
Plaintiff: Deutsche Bank National Trust Company
Defendant: Anita Porzio and Michael Porzio
Case Number: 3:2018cv02087
Filed: December 19, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of Connecticut
Presiding Judge: Victor A Bolden
Referring Judge: William I Garfinkel
Nature of Suit: Truth in Lending
Cause of Action: 15:1692
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 25, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER granting #12 Motion for Extension of Time of 30 days on all deadlines. Signed by Judge Victor A. Bolden on 01/25/19. (Ryan, Sarah)
January 23, 2019 Filing 12 MOTION for Extension of Time on all matters by Michael Porzio. (Fazekas, J.)
January 17, 2019 Filing 11 Memorandum in Support re #10 MOTION to Remand to State Court Plaintiff's Motion for Remand of Improperly Removed Case filed by Deutsche Bank National Trust Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C)(Rollins, James)
January 17, 2019 Filing 10 MOTION to Remand to State Court Plaintiff's Motion for Remand of Improperly Removed Case by Deutsche Bank National Trust Company.Responses due by 2/7/2019 (Rollins, James)
January 17, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by James Scott Rollins on behalf of Deutsche Bank National Trust Company (Rollins, James)
January 8, 2019 Filing 8 RECOMMENDED RULING : For the reasons set forth in the attached Recommended Ruling, the Undersigned recommends that Plaintiff's complaint be dismissed under 28 U.S.C. sec. 1915(e)(2)(B). This is a Recommended Ruling. Any objection must be filed within 14 days after service. Objections due by 1/22/2019. Signed by Judge William I. Garfinkel on 1/8/19.(Cates, S)
January 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER granting #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis based upon the financial affidavit provided, but for the reasons set forth in the Recommended Ruling filed herewith, the Undersigned recommends that this action be dismissed under 28 U.S.C. sec. 1915(e)(2)(b). Signed by Judge William I. Garfinkel on 1/8/19. (Cates, S)
December 21, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge William I. Garfinkel for #2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Signed by Judge Victor A. Bolden on 12/21/18. (Ryan, Sarah)
December 19, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 5 STANDING PROTECTIVE ORDER Signed by Judge Victor A. Bolden on 12/19/2018.(Fazekas, J.)
December 19, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ELECTRONIC FILING ORDER FOR COUNSEL - PLEASE ENSURE COMPLIANCE WITH COURTESY COPY REQUIREMENTS IN THIS ORDER Signed by Judge Victor A. Bolden on 12/19/2018.(Fazekas, J.)
December 19, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 3 Order on Pretrial Deadlines: Amended Pleadings due by 2/17/2019. Discovery due by 6/20/2019. Dispositive Motions due by 7/25/2019. Signed by Clerk on 12/19/2018.(Fazekas, J.)
December 19, 2018 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Michael Porzio. (Fazekas, J.)
December 19, 2018 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Anita Porzio, Michael Porzio from Superior Court, Bridgeport, CT, case number FBT-CV-13-6036274-S., filed by Anita Porzio, Michael Porzio. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Fazekas, J.)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Connecticut District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Deutsche Bank National Trust Company v. Porzio et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Anita Porzio
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael Porzio
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Deutsche Bank National Trust Company
Represented By: Loren M. Bisberg
Represented By: James Scott Rollins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?