Rittman et al v. Motel 6 Operating Limited Partnership et al

Plaintiff: Jonathan Campuzano and Shauna Rittman
Defendant: Motel 6 Operating Limited Partnership and G6 Hospitality LLC
Case Number: 3:2018cv02088
Filed: December 19, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of Connecticut
Presiding Judge: Vanessa L Bryant
Nature of Suit: Labor: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 1, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 1, 2019 Filing 15 REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (Cardin, Kelly)
January 25, 2019 Filing 14 Corporate Disclosure Statement by G6 Hospitality LLC, Motel 6 Operating Limited Partnership. (Cardin, Kelly)
January 25, 2019 Filing 13 ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal) by G6 Hospitality LLC, Motel 6 Operating Limited Partnership.(Cardin, Kelly)
January 11, 2019 Answer deadline updated for G6 Hospitality LLC and Motel 6 Operating Limited Partnership to 1/25/2019 per Dkt. 12 Order. (Shafer, J.)
January 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER granting #5 Motion for Extension of Time until 1/25/2019. Signed by Judge Vanessa L. Bryant on 1/11/2019. (Mattessich, William)
December 24, 2018 Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance by Emanuele Robert Cicchiello on behalf of Jonathan Campuzano, Shauna Rittman (Cicchiello, Emanuele)
December 20, 2018 Filing 10 NOTICE TO COUNSEL/SELF-REPRESENTED PARTIES: Counsel or self-represented parties initiating or removing this action are responsible for serving all parties with attached documents and copies of #6 Order on Pretrial Deadlines, #2 Notice (Other) filed by G6 Hospitality LLC, Motel 6 Operating Limited Partnership, #8 Protective Order, #5 MOTION for Extension of Time until January 25, 2019 to Respond to the Complaint #1 Notice of Removal, filed by G6 Hospitality LLC, Motel 6 Operating Limited Partnership, #7 Electronic Filing Order, #3 Notice (Other) filed by G6 Hospitality LLC, Motel 6 Operating Limited Partnership, #4 Notice of Appearance filed by G6 Hospitality LLC, Motel 6 Operating Limited Partnership, #1 Notice of Removal, filed by G6 Hospitality LLC, Motel 6 Operating Limited Partnership, #9 Order Re: Chambers Practices. Signed by Clerk on 12/20/2018. (Attachments: #1 Standing Order On Removed Cases) (Velez, F.)
December 19, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER RE: Judge's Chambers Practices. Counsel are directed to read and comply with the Chambers Practices and Standing Orders prior to filing any document. So ordered. Signed by Judge Vanessa L. Bryant on 12/19/18. (Velez, F.)
December 19, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 8 STANDING PROTECTIVE ORDER. Signed by Judge Vanessa L. Bryant on 12/19/18. (Velez, F.)
December 19, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ELECTRONIC FILING ORDER FOR COUNSEL - PLEASE ENSURE COMPLIANCE WITH COURTESY COPY REQUIREMENTS IN THIS ORDER. Signed by Judge Vanessa L. Bryant on 12/19/18. (Velez, F.)
December 19, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 6 Order on Pretrial Deadlines: Amended Pleadings due by 2/17/2019; Discovery due by 6/20/2019; Dispositive Motions due by 7/25/2019. Signed by Clerk on 12/19/18. (Velez, F.)
December 19, 2018 Judge Vanessa L. Bryant added. (Oliver, T.)
December 19, 2018 Filing 5 MOTION for Extension of Time until January 25, 2019 to Respond to the Complaint #1 Notice of Removal, by G6 Hospitality LLC, Motel 6 Operating Limited Partnership. (Cardin, Kelly)
December 19, 2018 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Kelly Marie Cardin on behalf of G6 Hospitality LLC, Motel 6 Operating Limited Partnership (Cardin, Kelly)
December 19, 2018 Filing 3 NOTICE by G6 Hospitality LLC, Motel 6 Operating Limited Partnership of Statement Pursuant to USDC Standing Order on Removed Cases (Cardin, Kelly)
December 19, 2018 Filing 2 NOTICE by G6 Hospitality LLC, Motel 6 Operating Limited Partnership of No Pending Motions (Cardin, Kelly)
December 19, 2018 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by G6 Hospitality LLC, Motel 6 Operating Limited Partnership from Connecticut Superior Court, case number KNL-CV18-6038211-S. Filing fee $ 400 receipt number ACTDC-5093017, filed by G6 Hospitality LLC, Motel 6 Operating Limited Partnership.(Cardin, Kelly)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Connecticut District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Rittman et al v. Motel 6 Operating Limited Partnership et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jonathan Campuzano
Represented By: Matthew D. Paradisi
Represented By: Emanuele Robert Cicchiello
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Shauna Rittman
Represented By: Matthew D. Paradisi
Represented By: Emanuele Robert Cicchiello
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Motel 6 Operating Limited Partnership
Represented By: Kelly Marie Cardin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: G6 Hospitality LLC
Represented By: Kelly Marie Cardin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?