Onur Air Tasimacilik A.S. v. United Technologies Corporation
Plaintiff: ONUR AIR TASIMACILIK A.S.
Defendant: United Technologies Corporation
Case Number: 3:2018cv02110
Filed: December 24, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of Connecticut
Presiding Judge: Warren W Eginton
Nature of Suit: Airplane Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 13, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 13, 2019 Filing 17 Corporate Disclosure Statement by United Technologies Corporation. (Rotondo, James)
February 8, 2019 Filing 16 NOTICE of Appearance by Robert J. Williams on behalf of Onur Air Tasimacilik A.S. (Williams, Robert)
February 8, 2019 Answer deadline updated for United Technologies Corporation to 3/15/2019. (LaMura, K.)
February 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER granting #13 Motion for Extension of Time. Signed by Judge Warren W. Eginton on 2/8/2019. (LaMura, K.)
February 8, 2019 Filing 14 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Complaint and Other Court Documents and Pleadings served on Defendant on 01/18/2019, filed by Onur Air Tasimacilik A.S.. (Arnold, Steven)
February 7, 2019 Filing 13 MOTION for Extension of Time until March 15, 2019 to file an answer or other responsive pleading #1 Complaint by United Technologies Corporation. (Rotondo, James)
February 7, 2019 Filing 12 NOTICE of Appearance by Andraya Pulaski Brunau on behalf of United Technologies Corporation (Brunau, Andraya)
February 7, 2019 Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance by James H. Rotondo on behalf of United Technologies Corporation (Rotondo, James)
January 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER granting #9 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Robert J. Williams. Signed by Clerk on 1/8/19. (Imbriani, Susan)
January 7, 2019 Filing 9 MOTION for Attorney(s) Robert J. Williams to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (paid $75 PHV fee; receipt number ACTDC-5108426) by Onur Air Tasimacilik A.S.. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Robert J. Williams, #2 Certificate of Good Standing re Robert J. Williams)(Arnold, Steven)
December 26, 2018 Filing 8 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED in accordance with Fed. R. Civ. P. 4 and LR 4 as to *United Technologies Corporation* with answer to complaint due within *21* days. Attorney *Steven E. Arnold* *SA Law, P.C.* *8 Whittier Place* *Boston, MA 02114*. (Fazekas, J.)
December 26, 2018 Filing 7 NOTICE TO COUNSEL/SELF-REPRESENTED PARTIES : Counsel or self-represented parties initiating or removing this action are responsible for serving all parties with attached documents and copies of #1 Complaint filed by Onur Air Tasimacilik A.S., #2 Notice of Appearance filed by Onur Air Tasimacilik A.S., #3 Exhibit filed by Onur Air Tasimacilik A.S., #5 Electronic Filing Order, #4 Order on Pretrial Deadlines, #6 Standing Protective Order Signed by Clerk on 12/26/2018.(Fazekas, J.)
December 24, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 6 STANDING PROTECTIVE ORDER Signed by Judge Warren W. Eginton on 12/24/2018.(Fazekas, J.)
December 24, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ELECTRONIC FILING ORDER FOR COUNSEL - PLEASE ENSURE COMPLIANCE WITH COURTESY COPY REQUIREMENTS IN THIS ORDER Signed by Judge Warren W. Eginton on 12/24/2018.(Fazekas, J.)
December 24, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 4 Order on Pretrial Deadlines: Amended Pleadings due by 2/22/2019. Discovery due by 6/25/2019. Dispositive Motions due by 7/30/2019. Signed by Clerk on 12/24/2018.(Fazekas, J.)
December 24, 2018 Judge Warren W. Eginton added. (Anastasio, F.)
December 24, 2018 Filing 3 EXHIBIT Civil Cover Sheet by ONUR AIR TASIMACILIK A.S. re #1 Complaint. (Arnold, Steven)
December 24, 2018 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by Steven E. Arnold on behalf of ONUR AIR TASIMACILIK A.S. (Arnold, Steven)
December 24, 2018 Request for Clerk to issue summons as to United Technologies Corporation(Arnold, Steven) Modified on 12/26/2018 to change plaintiff to defendant (Walker, J.).
December 24, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against United Technologies Corporation ( Filing fee $400 receipt number ACTDC-5097506.), filed by ONUR AIR TASIMACILIK A.S..(Arnold, Steven)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Connecticut District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Onur Air Tasimacilik A.S. v. United Technologies Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ONUR AIR TASIMACILIK A.S.
Represented By: Steven E. Arnold
Represented By: Robert J. Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United Technologies Corporation
Represented By: James H. Rotondo
Represented By: Andraya Pulaski Brunau
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?