Ballaro v. Quest Diagnostics LLC et al
Plaintiff: Annmarie Ballaro
Defendant: Quest Diagnostics LLC and Quest Diagnostics of Connecticut LLC
Case Number: 3:2018cv02137
Filed: December 27, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of Connecticut
Presiding Judge: Robert N Chatigny
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Med. Malpractice
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 12, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 12, 2019 Set Deadlines: Status Report due by 3/13/2019. (Rickevicius, L.)
February 11, 2019 Filing 16 Joint STATUS REPORT by Annmarie Ballaro. (Von Kuhn, Philip)
January 16, 2019 Filing 15 NOTICE OF E-FILED CALENDAR: THIS IS THE ONLY NOTICE COUNSEL/THE PARTIES WILL RECEIVE. Telephonic Status Conference set for 5/16/2019 at 3:30 PM before Judge Robert N. Chatigny. Counsel will initiate the call to chambers at 860-240-2629 (conference line only) with all counsel on the line. (Rickevicius, L.)
January 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 14 SCHEDULING ORDER: Please read full text of attached Order. Discovery due by 3/2/2020; Initial Status Report due by 2/15/2019; Prefiling Conference Request Re: Dispositive Motions due 1/17/2020; Settlement Conference 4/2020; Trial Ready Date 6/1/2020; Trial Brief due by 5/1/2020. Signed by Judge Robert N. Chatigny on 1/15/2019. (Rickevicius, L.)
January 11, 2019 Filing 13 First REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (Von Kuhn, Philip)
December 28, 2018 Filing 12 NOTICE TO COUNSEL/SELF-REPRESENTED PARTIES : Counsel or self-represented parties initiating or removing this action are responsible for serving all parties with attached documents and copies of #6 Notice of Compliance with Pretrial Order filed by Quest Diagnostics of Connecticut LLC, Quest Diagnostics LLC, #11 Standing Protective Order, #10 Electronic Filing Order, #5 Notice (Other) filed by Quest Diagnostics of Connecticut LLC, Quest Diagnostics LLC, #2 Notice of Appearance filed by Quest Diagnostics of Connecticut LLC, Quest Diagnostics LLC, #7 Certificate of Service filed by Quest Diagnostics of Connecticut LLC, Quest Diagnostics LLC, #9 Order on Pretrial Deadlines, #4 Notice of Appearance filed by Quest Diagnostics of Connecticut LLC, Quest Diagnostics LLC, #1 Notice of Removal, filed by Quest Diagnostics of Connecticut LLC, Quest Diagnostics LLC, #8 Answer to Complaint filed by Quest Diagnostics of Connecticut LLC, Quest Diagnostics LLC Signed by Clerk on 12/28/2018. (Attachments: #1 Removal Standing Order)(Murphy, Tatihana)
December 27, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 11 STANDING PROTECTIVE ORDER Signed by Judge Robert N. Chatigny on 12/27/2018.(Murphy, Tatihana)
December 27, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ELECTRONIC FILING ORDER FOR COUNSEL - PLEASE ENSURE COMPLIANCE WITH COURTESY COPY REQUIREMENTS IN THIS ORDER Signed by Judge Robert N. Chatigny on 12/27/2018.(Murphy, Tatihana)
December 27, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 9 Order on Pretrial Deadlines: Amended Pleadings due by 2/25/2019. Discovery due by 6/28/2019. Dispositive Motions due by 8/2/2019. Signed by Clerk on 12/27/2018.(Murphy, Tatihana)
December 27, 2018 Filing 8 ANSWER to Complaint with Affirmative Defenses by Quest Diagnostics LLC, Quest Diagnostics of Connecticut LLC.(Canty, Kaitlin)
December 27, 2018 Filing 7 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Quest Diagnostics LLC, Quest Diagnostics of Connecticut LLC (Certificate of Filing and Service of Notice of Removal) (Canty, Kaitlin)
December 27, 2018 Judge Robert N. Chatigny added. (Anastasio, F.)
December 27, 2018 Filing 6 NOTICE OF COMPLIANCE WITH PRETRIAL ORDER by Quest Diagnostics LLC, Quest Diagnostics of Connecticut LLC (Statement Pursuant to Standing Order in Removed Cases) (Canty, Kaitlin)
December 27, 2018 Filing 5 NOTICE by Quest Diagnostics LLC, Quest Diagnostics of Connecticut LLC (Notice of Pending Motions) (Canty, Kaitlin)
December 27, 2018 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Paul D. Williams on behalf of Quest Diagnostics LLC, Quest Diagnostics of Connecticut LLC (Williams, Paul)
December 27, 2018 Filing 3 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Quest Diagnostics LLC, Quest Diagnostics of Connecticut LLC. (Canty, Kaitlin)
December 27, 2018 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by Kaitlin A Canty on behalf of Quest Diagnostics LLC, Quest Diagnostics of Connecticut LLC (Canty, Kaitlin)
December 27, 2018 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Quest Diagnostics of Connecticut LLC, Quest Diagnostics LLC from Bridgeport Superior Court Filing fee $ 400 receipt number ACTDC-5099232, filed by Quest Diagnostics of Connecticut LLC, Quest Diagnostics LLC.(Canty, Kaitlin)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Connecticut District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ballaro v. Quest Diagnostics LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Annmarie Ballaro
Represented By: Philip F. Von Kuhn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Quest Diagnostics LLC
Represented By: Paul D. Williams
Represented By: Kaitlin A Canty
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Quest Diagnostics of Connecticut LLC
Represented By: Paul D. Williams
Represented By: Kaitlin A Canty
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?