USA v. O'Sullivan et al
Petitioner: USA
Respondent: John O'Sullivan, Jr. and Michael Sulzinski
Case Number: 3:2018cv02141
Filed: December 20, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of Connecticut
Presiding Judge: Kari A Dooley
Nature of Suit: Taxes
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 7, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 7, 2019 Filing 16 NOTICE OF E-FILED CALENDAR: THIS IS THE ONLY NOTICE COUNSEL/THE PARTIES WILL RECEIVE. ALL PERSONS ENTERING THE COURTHOUSE MUST PRESENT PHOTO IDENTIFICATION. RESET FROM 2/8/2019 at 2:00 p.m. Show Cause Hearing set for 2/22/2019 at 10:00 a.m. in Courtroom Four-Annex, 915 Lafayette Blvd., Bridgeport, CT before Judge Kari A. Dooley. (Beyerlein, Alexis)
February 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER granting #14 Motion to Continue. Due to the Court's unavailability, however, the show cause hearing is reset for 2/22/2019 at 10:00 a.m. Signed by Judge Kari A. Dooley on 2/7/2019. (Beyerlein, Alexis)
February 7, 2019 Filing 14 MOTION to Continue Show Cause Hearing by USA. (Turbert, Julie)
January 31, 2019 Filing 13 NOTICE OF E-FILED CALENDAR: THIS IS THE ONLY NOTICE COUNSEL/THE PARTIES WILL RECEIVE. ALL PERSONS ENTERING THE COURTHOUSE MUST PRESENT PHOTO IDENTIFICATION. RESET FROM 2/1/2019 at 10:00 a.m. Show Cause Hearing set for 2/8/2019 at 2:00 p.m. in Courtroom Four-Annex, 915 Lafayette Blvd., Bridgeport, CT before Judge Kari A. Dooley. (Beyerlein, Alexis)
January 31, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER Rescheduling Show Cause Hearing: At the request of the United States, the show cause hearing is rescheduled for 2/8/2019 at 2:00 p.m. The Court is not aware of the position of the Respondents concerning the United States' request but nonetheless concludes that rescheduling the hearing will best serve the ends of justice. Signed by Judge Kari A. Dooley on 1/31/2019. (Beyerlein, Alexis)
January 17, 2019 Filing 11 NOTICE OF E-FILED CALENDAR: THIS IS THE ONLY NOTICE COUNSEL/THE PARTIES WILL RECEIVE. ALL PERSONS ENTERING THE COURTHOUSE MUST PRESENT PHOTO IDENTIFICATION. RESET FROM 1/18/2019 at 11:30 a.m. Show Cause Hearing set for 2/1/2019 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom Four-Annex, 915 Lafayette Blvd., Bridgeport, CT before Judge Kari A. Dooley. (Beyerlein, Alexis)
January 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER Rescheduling Show Cause Hearing. In light of the ongoing lapse of government funding, the show cause hearing is rescheduled for 2/1/2019 at 10:00 a.m. in Courtroom Four-Annex, 915 Lafayette Blvd., Bridgeport, CT before Judge Kari A. Dooley. This continuance does not otherwise alter the deadlines previously set by the Court in this matter. Signed by Judge Kari A. Dooley on 1/17/2019. (Beyerlein, Alexis)
December 20, 2018 Filing 9 NOTICE OF E-FILED CALENDAR: THIS IS THE ONLY NOTICE COUNSEL/THE PARTIES WILL RECEIVE.ALL PERSONS ENTERING THE COURTHOUSE MUST PRESENT PHOTO IDENTIFICATION. Show Cause Response due by 1/11/2019. Show Cause Hearing set for 1/18/2019 11:30 AM in Courtroom Four-Annex, 915 Lafayette Blvd., Bridgeport, CT before Judge Kari A. Dooley (Gould, K.)
December 20, 2018 Filing 8 Appearance Self Represented Party by Michael Sulzinski (Gould, K.)
December 20, 2018 Filing 7 Appearance Self Represented Party by John O'Sullivan, Jr (Gould, K.)
December 20, 2018 Filing 6 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Kari A. Dooley: Motion Hearing held on 12/20/2018 re #1 MOTION to Enforce IRS Summons filed by USA. Total Time: 38 minutes(Court Reporter FTR.) (Gould, K.)
December 10, 2018 Filing 5 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Order to Show Cause and Petition to Enforce Internal Revenue Service Summons served on Michael Sulzinski on 12/04/2018, filed by USA. (Turbert, Julie)
December 10, 2018 Filing 4 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Order to Show Cause and Petition to Enforce Internal Revenue Service Summons served on John O'Sullivan, Jr. on 12/04/2018, filed by USA. (Turbert, Julie)
November 29, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE re: USA PetitionShow Cause Hearing set for 12/20/2018 10:00 AM before Judge Kari A. DooleySee attached Order to Show Cause.Signed by Judge Kari A. Dooley on 11/29/18.(Dooley, Kari)
November 27, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ELECTRONIC FILING ORDER FOR COUNSEL - PLEASE ENSURE COMPLIANCE WITH COURTESY COPY REQUIREMENTS IN THIS ORDER Signed by Judge Kari A. Dooley on 11/27/2018.(Anastasio, F.)
November 27, 2018 Filing 1 MOTION to Enforce IRS Summons by USA. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit, #2 Text of Proposed Order, #3 Summons 1, #4 Summons 2)(Anastasio, F.)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Connecticut District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: USA v. O'Sullivan et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: John O'Sullivan, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Michael Sulzinski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: USA
Represented By: Julie G. Turbert
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?