York Insurance Co. of Maine v. Donaco, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: York Insurance Co. of Maine
Defendant: Donaco, Inc., Lisa Doggart, New England Homes, Inc. and Tom Doggart
Case Number: 3:2019cv00013
Filed: January 4, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Connecticut
Presiding Judge: Stefan R Underhill
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 26, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 26, 2019 Filing 11 SUMMONS Returned Executed by York Insurance Co. of Maine. New England Homes, Inc. served on 2/11/2019, answer due 3/4/2019. (Scapellati, Daniel)
February 14, 2019 Filing 10 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed as to Tom Doggart waiver sent on 1/22/2019, answer due 3/23/2019; Lisa Doggart waiver sent on 1/22/2019, answer due 3/23/2019 filed by York Insurance Co. of Maine. (Scapellati, Daniel)
February 8, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by Robert M. Elliott on behalf of Lisa Doggart, Tom Doggart In Addition to Attorney Doernberger's Appearance (Elliott, Robert)
February 6, 2019 Filing 8 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED in accordance with Fed. R. Civ. P. 4 and LR 4 as to *Donaco, Inc.* with answer to complaint due within *21* days. Attorney *Daniel P. Scapellati* *Halloran & Sage* *One Goodwin Sq., 225 Asylum St.* *Hartford, CT 06103*. (Oliver, T.)
February 6, 2019 Filing 7 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED in accordance with Fed. R. Civ. P. 4 and LR 4 as to *New England Homes, Inc.* with answer to complaint due within *21* days. Attorney *Daniel P. Scapellati* *Halloran & Sage* *One Goodwin Sq., 225 Asylum St.* *Hartford, CT 06103*. (Oliver, T.)
February 5, 2019 Request for Clerk to issue summons as to Donaco, Inc.. (Scapellati, Daniel)
February 5, 2019 Request for Clerk to issue summons as to New England Homes, Inc.. (Scapellati, Daniel)
February 4, 2019 Set Deadlines: Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 3/18/2019 (Pincus, A).
February 1, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Edwin L. Doernberger on behalf of Lisa Doggart, Tom Doggart (Doernberger, Edwin)
January 4, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE TO COUNSEL/SELF-REPRESENTED PARTIES : Counsel or self-represented parties initiating or removing this action are responsible for serving all parties with attached documents and copies of #2 Order on Pretrial Deadlines, #1 Complaint filed by York Insurance Co. of Maine, #4 Protective Order, #3 Electronic Filing Order Signed by Clerk on 1/4/2019. (Oliver, T.)
January 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 STANDING PROTECTIVE ORDER Signed by Judge Stefan R Underhill on 1/4/2019. (Oliver, T.)
January 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ELECTRONIC FILING ORDER FOR COUNSEL - PLEASE ENSURE COMPLIANCE WITH COURTESY COPY REQUIREMENTS IN THIS ORDER Signed by Judge Stefan R Underhill on 1/4/2019. (Oliver, T.)
January 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 2 Order on Pretrial Deadlines: Amended Pleadings due by 3/5/2019 Discovery due by 7/6/2019 Dispositive Motions due by 8/10/2019 Signed by Clerk on 1/4/2019. (Oliver, T.)
January 4, 2019 Judge Stefan R Underhill added. (Oliver, T.)
January 4, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $400 receipt number ACTDC-5106412.), filed by York Insurance Company of Maine. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Scapellati, Daniel)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Connecticut District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: York Insurance Co. of Maine v. Donaco, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: York Insurance Co. of Maine
Represented By: Daniel P. Scapellati
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Donaco, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lisa Doggart
Represented By: Robert M. Elliott
Represented By: Edwin L. Doernberger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: New England Homes, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tom Doggart
Represented By: Robert M. Elliott
Represented By: Edwin L. Doernberger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?