Thorne v. Lewis et al

Plaintiff: Christopher S. Thorne
Defendant: Lewis, John Doe, Officer Watson, Jane Doe and Watson
Case Number: 3:2019cv00024
Filed: January 7, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Connecticut
Presiding Judge: Vanessa L Bryant
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 18, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER denying #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis; granting #7 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. IF you change your address at any time during the litigation of this case, Local Rule 83.1(c)2 provides that notify the court. Failure to do so can result in the dismissal of your case. Signed by Judge William I. Garfinkel on 1/18/2019. (Payton, R.)
January 17, 2019 Filing 7 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Christopher S. Thorne. (Payton, R.)
January 9, 2019 Filing 6 Notice to petitioner re: Insufficiency #2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in Forma Pauperis. Although you have sworn under the penalty of perjury that the responses in the IFP application are truthful, the responses in question 6 do not accurately reflect the desposits shown on your Inmate Account Statement. Please file a new IFP application. If insufficiency not corrected Dismissal due by 1/30/2019 Signed by Judge William I. Garfinkel on 1/9/2018.(Payton, R.)
January 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ELECTRONIC FILING ORDER FOR COUNSEL - PLEASE ENSURE COMPLIANCE WITH COURTESY COPY REQUIREMENTS IN THIS ORDER Signed by Judge Vanessa L. Bryant on 1/7/2019.(Reis, Julia)
January 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 E-Filing Standing Order on Prisoner Electronic Filing Program Signed by Judge Janet C. Hall on 1/7/2019.(Reis, Julia)
January 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 STANDING PROTECTIVE ORDER Signed by Judge Vanessa L. Bryant on 1/7/2019.(Reis, Julia)
January 7, 2019 Filing 2 PRISCS MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Christopher S. Thorne. (Reis, Julia)
January 7, 2019 Filing 1 PRISCS COMPLAINT against Jane Doe(1, mental health, hispanic female), Jane Doe(2, medical nurse, white female), John Doe(1, Captain, white male), John Doe(2, Lt., hispanic male), Lewis, Watson, filed by Christopher S. Thorne. (Attachments: #1 Attachment, #2 Envelope)(Reis, Julia)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Connecticut District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Thorne v. Lewis et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lewis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Officer Watson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jane Doe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Watson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Christopher S. Thorne
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?