Cormier v. General Electric Company et al
Plaintiff: Norbert Cormier
Defendant: Foster Wheeler LLC, CBS Corporation, General Electric Company and Crane Co
Case Number: 3:2019cv00026
Filed: January 7, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Connecticut
Presiding Judge: Janet Bond Arterton
Nature of Suit: P.I. : Asbestos
Cause of Action: 28:1442
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 22, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 22, 2019 Filing 18 Joint REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (Arscott, Amity)
January 23, 2019 Filing 17 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Foster Wheeler LLC identifying Corporate Parent John Wood Group plc (Scotland) for Foster Wheeler LLC. (Oswald, James)
January 23, 2019 Filing 16 ANSWER to Complaint with Affirmative Defenses with Jury Demand , CROSSCLAIM against All Defendants by Foster Wheeler LLC.(Oswald, James)
January 18, 2019 Filing 15 ANSWER to Complaint with Affirmative Defenses with Jury Demand and, CROSSCLAIM against All Defendants by Crane Co.(Lyons, Thomas) Modified on 1/18/2019 to reflect parties as to whom Crossclaim is against (Caffrey, A.).
January 17, 2019 Filing 14 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Crane Co. (Lyons, Thomas)
January 17, 2019 Filing 13 NOTICE of Appearance by Thomas N. Lyons on behalf of Crane Co (Lyons, Thomas)
January 17, 2019 Filing 12 NOTICE of Appearance by Tara Anne Sheldon on behalf of General Electric Company (Sheldon, Tara)
January 17, 2019 Filing 11 ANSWER to Complaint with Affirmative Defenses with Jury Demand and Answer to Cross-Claims, CROSSCLAIM against All Defendants by General Electric Company.(Mohan, Catherine)
January 17, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE by General Electric Company Notice of Joinder in Removal (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A (Summons and Complaint))(Mohan, Catherine)
January 17, 2019 Filing 9 Corporate Disclosure Statement by General Electric Company. (Mohan, Catherine)
January 17, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Catherine A. Mohan on behalf of General Electric Company (Mohan, Catherine)
January 8, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE TO COUNSEL/SELF-REPRESENTED PARTIES : Counsel or self-represented parties initiating or removing this action are responsible for serving all parties with attached documents and copies of #4 Order on Pretrial Deadlines, #5 Electronic Filing Order, #6 Protective Order, #2 Exhibit filed by Foster Wheeler LLC, #1 Notice of Removal, filed by Foster Wheeler LLC, #3 Notice (Other) filed by Foster Wheeler LLC Signed by Clerk on 1/8/2019. (Attachments: #1 Standing Order on Removals)(Reis, Julia)
January 8, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE by Foster Wheeler LLC of Pending Motions (Oswald, James)
January 8, 2019 Filing 2 Amended EXHIBIT A (Corrected) by Foster Wheeler LLC re #1 Notice of Removal,. (Oswald, James)
January 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 STANDING PROTECTIVE ORDER Signed by Judge Janet Bond Arterton on 1/7/2019.(Reis, Julia)
January 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ELECTRONIC FILING ORDER FOR COUNSEL - PLEASE ENSURE COMPLIANCE WITH COURTESY COPY REQUIREMENTS IN THIS ORDER Signed by Judge Janet Bond Arterton on 1/7/2019.(Reis, Julia)
January 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 Order on Pretrial Deadlines: Amended Pleadings due by 3/8/2019 Discovery due by 7/9/2019 Dispositive Motions due by 8/13/2019 Signed by Clerk on 1/7/2019.(Reis, Julia)
January 7, 2019 Judge Janet Bond Arterton added. (Anastasio, F.)
January 7, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Foster Wheeler LLC from New London Superior Court, case number 19-6038371-S. Filing fee $ 400 receipt number ACTDC-5109870, filed by Foster Wheeler LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Exhibit I, #10 Exhibit J, #11 Exhibit K, #12 Exhibit L, #13 Exhibit M)(Oswald, James)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Connecticut District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Cormier v. General Electric Company et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Foster Wheeler LLC
Represented By: James R. Oswald
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CBS Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: General Electric Company
Represented By: Catherine A. Mohan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Crane Co
Represented By: Thomas N. Lyons
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Norbert Cormier
Represented By: Amity L. Arscott
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?