Delta Mechanical Contractors, LLC v. Cutter Enterprises, LLC et al

Plaintiff: Delta Mechanical Contractors, LLC
Defendant: Travelers Casualty and Surety Company of North America and Cutter Enterprises, LLC
Case Number: 3:2019cv00036
Filed: January 9, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Connecticut
Presiding Judge: Victor A Bolden
Nature of Suit: Miller Act
Cause of Action: 40:3131
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 5, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 5, 2019 Answer deadline updated for Cutter Enterprises, LLC to 4/1/2019; Travelers Casualty and Surety Company of North America to 4/1/2019; Set Deadlines: Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 4/17/2019. (Perez, J.)
March 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER granting #12 Motion for Extension of Time. Signed by Judge Victor A. Bolden on 3/4/2019. (Washington, Gregory)
February 28, 2019 Filing 12 Second MOTION for Extension of Time until [SEE MOTION] to Plead and First Request to Extend the Deadline to File Rule 26 Meeting Report #1 Complaint, Set Deadlines/Hearings by Cutter Enterprises, LLC, Travelers Casualty and Surety Company of North America. (Martin, Peter)
January 31, 2019 Answer deadline updated for Cutter Enterprises, LLC to 3/1/2019; Travelers Casualty and Surety Company of North America to 3/1/2019. (Perez, J.)
January 31, 2019 Set Deadlines: Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 3/18/2019 (Perez, J.)
January 31, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER granting #10 Motion for Extension of Time until March 1, 2019 to plead #1 Complaint. Signed by Judge Victor A. Bolden on 1/31/2019. (Washington, Gregory)
January 30, 2019 Filing 10 MOTION for Extension of Time until March 1, 2019 to Plead #1 Complaint by Cutter Enterprises, LLC, Travelers Casualty and Surety Company of North America. (Martin, Peter)
January 30, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by Peter J. Martin on behalf of Cutter Enterprises, LLC, Travelers Casualty and Surety Company of North America (Martin, Peter)
January 16, 2019 Filing 8 ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF SERVICE Executed as to #6 Electronic Summons Issued, #1 Complaint Acknowledgment filed by Delta Mechanical Contractors, LLC. (Fazekas, J.)
January 16, 2019 Filing 7 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons and Complaint served on Travelers Casualty and Surety Company of North America on January 14, 2019, filed by Delta Mechanical Contractors, LLC. (Reeber, Matthew)
January 10, 2019 Filing 6 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED in accordance with Fed. R. Civ. P. 4 and LR 4 as to *Cutter Enterprises, LLC, Travelers Casualty and Surety Company of North America* with answer to complaint due within *21* days. Attorney *Matthew C. Reeber* *Pannone Lopes Devereaux & O'Gara LLC* *1301 Atwood Avenue, Ste 215n* *Johnston, RI 02919*. (Fazekas, J.)
January 10, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE TO COUNSEL/SELF-REPRESENTED PARTIES : Counsel or self-represented parties initiating or removing this action are responsible for serving all parties with attached documents and copies of #3 Electronic Filing Order, #1 Complaint filed by Delta Mechanical Contractors, LLC, #4 Standing Protective Order, #2 Order on Pretrial Deadlines Signed by Clerk on 1/10/2019.(Fazekas, J.)
January 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 STANDING PROTECTIVE ORDER Signed by Judge Victor A. Bolden on 1/9/2019.(Fazekas, J.)
January 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ELECTRONIC FILING ORDER FOR COUNSEL - PLEASE ENSURE COMPLIANCE WITH COURTESY COPY REQUIREMENTS IN THIS ORDER Signed by Judge Victor A. Bolden on 1/9/2019.(Fazekas, J.)
January 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 2 Order on Pretrial Deadlines: Amended Pleadings due by 3/10/2019. Discovery due by 7/11/2019. Dispositive Motions due by 8/15/2019. Signed by Clerk on 1/9/2019.(Fazekas, J.)
January 9, 2019 Judge Victor A. Bolden added. (Oliver, T.)
January 9, 2019 Request for Clerk to issue summons as to All Defendants. (Reeber, Matthew)
January 9, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $400 receipt number ACTDC-5112129.), filed by Delta Mechanical Contractors, LLC.(Reeber, Matthew) Modified on 1/9/2019 to correct party(Hushin, Z.).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Connecticut District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Delta Mechanical Contractors, LLC v. Cutter Enterprises, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Travelers Casualty and Surety Company of North America
Represented By: Peter J. Martin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cutter Enterprises, LLC
Represented By: Peter J. Martin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Delta Mechanical Contractors, LLC
Represented By: Matthew C. Reeber
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?