Hight et al v. Gree USA Inc et al
Plaintiff: Susan W. Hight and Donald W. Hight
Defendant: Gree USA Inc, Gree Electric Appliances Inc. of Zhuhai, MJC America LTD and Hong Kong Gree Electric Appliances Sales, Ltd.
Case Number: 3:2019cv00038
Filed: January 9, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Connecticut
Presiding Judge: Kari A Dooley
Nature of Suit: Prop. Damage Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 28, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 28, 2019 Filing 10 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Donald W. Hight, Susan W. Hight. Gree USA Inc served on 1/25/2019, answer due 2/15/2019. (Attachments: #1 Supplement)(Blackburn, Stuart)
January 28, 2019 Filing 9 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Donald W. Hight, Susan W. Hight. Gree Electric Appliances Inc. of Zhuhai served on 1/25/2019, answer due 2/15/2019. (Blackburn, Stuart)
January 28, 2019 Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Donald W. Hight, Susan W. Hight. Hong Kong Gree Electric Appliances Sales, Ltd. served on 1/25/2019, answer due 2/15/2019. (Blackburn, Stuart)
January 28, 2019 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Donald W. Hight, Susan W. Hight. MJC America LTD served on 1/25/2019, answer due 2/15/2019. (Blackburn, Stuart)
January 10, 2019 Filing 6 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED in accordance with Fed. R. Civ. P. 4 and LR 4 as to *Gree Electric Appliances Inc. of Zhuhai, Gree USA Inc, Hong Kong Gree Electric Appliances Sales, Ltd., MJC America LTD* with answer to complaint due within *21* days. Attorney *Stuart G. Blackburn* *Two Concorde Way,Bldg 3C, PO Box 608* *Windsor Locks, CT 06096*. (Fanelle, N.)
January 10, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE TO COUNSEL/SELF-REPRESENTED PARTIES : Counsel or self-represented parties initiating or removing this action are responsible for serving all parties with attached documents and copies of #1 Complaint filed by Donald W. Hight, #2 Order on Pretrial Deadlines, #3 Electronic Filing Order, #4 Protective Order Signed by Clerk on 1/10/2019. (Fanelle, N.)
January 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 STANDING PROTECTIVE ORDER Signed by Judge Kari A. Dooley on 1/9/2019.(Fanelle, N.)
January 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ELECTRONIC FILING ORDER FOR COUNSEL - PLEASE ENSURE COMPLIANCE WITH COURTESY COPY REQUIREMENTS IN THIS ORDER Signed by Judge Kari A. Dooley on 1/9/2019. (Fanelle, N.)
January 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 2 Order on Pretrial Deadlines: Amended Pleadings due by 3/10/2019 Discovery due by 7/11/2019 Dispositive Motions due by 8/15/2019 Signed by Clerk on 1/9/2019. (Fanelle, N.)
January 9, 2019 Judge Kari A. Dooley added. (Oliver, T.)
January 9, 2019 Request for Clerk to issue summons as to MJC America, Ltd.. (Blackburn, Stuart)
January 9, 2019 Request for Clerk to issue summons as to Hong Kong Gree Electric Appliances Sales, Ltd.. (Blackburn, Stuart)
January 9, 2019 Request for Clerk to issue summons as to Gree USA, Inc.. (Blackburn, Stuart)
January 9, 2019 Request for Clerk to issue summons as to Gree Electric Appliances Inc. of Zhuhai. (Blackburn, Stuart)
January 9, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $400 receipt number ACTDC-5112991.), filed by Donald W. Hight, Susan W. Hight.(Blackburn, Stuart) Modified on 1/9/2019 to correct parties (Hushin, Z.).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Connecticut District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hight et al v. Gree USA Inc et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Susan W. Hight
Represented By: Stuart G. Blackburn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Donald W. Hight
Represented By: Stuart G. Blackburn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gree USA Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gree Electric Appliances Inc. of Zhuhai
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MJC America LTD
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hong Kong Gree Electric Appliances Sales, Ltd.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?