Doctor's Associates LLC v. Sharma

Plaintiff: Doctor's Associates LLC
Defendant: Vishal Sharma
Case Number: 3:2019cv00077
Filed: January 14, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Connecticut
Presiding Judge: Janet C Hall
Nature of Suit: Contract: Franchise
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 24, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 24, 2019 Filing 23 RESPONSE re #19 Response, REQUEST FOR SUBMISSION filed by Vishal Sharma. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3)(Sharma, Vishal)
February 22, 2019 Filing 22 RESPONSE re #21 First MOTION to Stay ,pending ruling in NEAVDA Plaintiff's Response in Opposition to Defendant's Motion to Stay filed by Doctor's Associates LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Doroghazi, John)
February 21, 2019 Filing 21 First MOTION to Stay ,pending ruling in NEAVDA by Vishal Sharma.Responses due by 3/14/2019 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2)(Sharma, Vishal)
February 20, 2019 Filing 20 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Doctor's Associates LLC. Vishal Sharma served on 1/28/2019, answer due 2/18/2019. (Cooper, Lindsey)
February 19, 2019 Filing 19 First RESPONSE re #18 Response, IN OPPOSITION OF PETITION TO COMPEL ARBITRATION AND FURTHER SUPPORT OF WHY NEVADA CASE IS SEPARATE FROM ARBITRATION filed by Vishal Sharma. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit 9, #10 Exhibit 10, #11 Exhibit 11, #12 Exhibit 12, #13 Exhibit 13)(Sharma, Vishal)
February 14, 2019 Filing 18 RESPONSE re #15 Response to Order to Show Cause, #1 Complaint, Reply in Support of Petition to Compel #1 and to Sharma Response to Show Cause Order #15 filed by Doctor's Associates LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Doroghazi, John)
February 1, 2019 Answer deadline updated for Vishal Sharma to 2/15/2019. (Lewis, D)
February 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER granting #16 MOTION for Extension of Time until February 15, 2019 to Respond to Defendant's Answer to Plaintiff's Complaint and reply to Order to Show Cause Why the Plaintiff's Petition to Compel Arbitration Should Not be Granted #15 . SO ORDERED by Judge Janet C. Hall on 2/1/2019. (Lewis, D)
January 30, 2019 Filing 16 MOTION for Extension of Time until February 15, 2019 to Respond to Defendant's Answer to Plaintiff's Complaint and reply to Order to Show Cause Why the Plaintiff's Petition to Compel Arbitration Should Not be Granted #15 by Doctor's Associates LLC. (Doroghazi, John)
January 25, 2019 Filing 15 RESPONSE TO #2 Exhibit, #1 Complaint, by Vishal Sharma filed by Vishal Sharma. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 Part-1, #2 Exhibit 2 Part-2, #3 Exhibit 3 Part-3, #4 Exhibit 2, #5 Exhibit 3, #6 Exhibit 4, #7 Exhibit 5, #8 Exhibit 6, #9 Exhibit 7)(Sharma, Vishal)
January 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ELECTRONIC FILING ORDER - PLEASE ENSURE COMPLIANCE WITH COURTESY COPY REQUIREMENTS IN THIS ORDER. SELF-REPRESENTED FILERS ARE REQUIRED TO COMPLY WITH THE JUDGE'S STANDARD ELECTRONIC FILING ORDER WHICH IS ATTACHED. Signed by Judge Janet C. Hall on 1/25/2019.(Lewis, D)
January 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER granting #12 Motion for Order. SO ORDERED by Judge Janet C. Hall on 1/25/2019. (Lewis, D)
January 22, 2019 Filing 12 MOTION by Self-Represented Litigant to Participate in Electronic Filing by Vishal Sharma. (Pipech, L.)
January 22, 2019 Filing 11 Notice of Pro Se Appearance by Vishal Sharma. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(Pipech, L.)
January 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE: Defendant Vishal Sharma is hereby ordered to show cause why the plaintiffs Petition to Compel Arbitration (Doc. No. 1) should not be granted. The defendant shall file and serve any written opposition with the Clerk of the United States District Court, District of Connecticut, at 141 Church Street, New Haven, Connecticut, 06510, on or before February 20, 2019.The court further orders that the plaintiff shall make service of this Order and all related papers upon the defendant on or before January 30, 2019. Show Cause Response due by 2/20/2019 Signed by Judge Janet C. Hall on 1/16/2019.(Lewis, D)
January 15, 2019 Filing 9 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED in accordance with Fed. R. Civ. P. 4 and LR 4 as to *Vishal Sharma* with answer to complaint due within *21* days. Attorney *Lindsey Capece Cooper* *Franchise World Headquarters, LLC* *325 Sub Way* *Milford, CT 06461*. (Anastasio, F.)
January 15, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE TO COUNSEL/SELF-REPRESENTED PARTIES : Counsel or self-represented parties initiating or removing this action are responsible for serving all parties with attached documents and copies of #7 Order, #5 Protective Order, #2 Exhibit filed by Doctor's Associates LLC, #4 Notice of Appearance filed by Doctor's Associates LLC, #3 Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Doctor's Associates LLC, #6 Electronic Filing Order Signed by Clerk on 1/15/2019.(Anastasio, F.)
January 15, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by John Matthew Doroghazi on behalf of Doctor's Associates LLC (Doroghazi, John)
January 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 Standing Order re: Discovery Signed by Judge Janet C. Hall on 1/14/2019.(Anastasio, F.)
January 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ELECTRONIC FILING ORDER FOR COUNSEL - PLEASE ENSURE COMPLIANCE WITH COURTESY COPY REQUIREMENTS IN THIS ORDER Signed by Judge Janet C. Hall on 1/14/2019.(Anastasio, F.)
January 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 STANDING PROTECTIVE ORDER Signed by Judge Janet C. Hall on 1/14/2019.(Anastasio, F.)
January 14, 2019 Judge Janet C. Hall added. (Oliver, T.)
January 14, 2019 Filing 3 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Doctor's Associates LLC. (Cooper, Lindsey)
January 14, 2019 Filing 2 EXHIBIT Application for Order to Show Cause by Doctor's Associates LLC re #1 Complaint,. (Cooper, Lindsey)
January 14, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Vishal Sharma ( Filing fee $400 receipt number ACTDC-5120062.), filed by Doctor's Associates LLC. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support Memorandum in Support of Petition to Compel Arbitration, #2 Exhibit Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit Exhibit D, #6 Exhibit Exhibit E, #7 Exhibit Exhibit F, #8 Exhibit Exhibit G, #9 Exhibit Exhibit H, #10 Exhibit Exhibit I)(Cooper, Lindsey)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Connecticut District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Doctor's Associates LLC v. Sharma
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Vishal Sharma
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Doctor's Associates LLC
Represented By: Lindsey Capece Cooper
Represented By: John Matthew Doroghazi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?