Levan et al v. Bell Helicopter Textron, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Jean Levan and Douglass Levan
Defendant: Textron Aviation, Bell Hellicopter Textron, Inc., Bombardier, Inc., Hiller Aircraft Corp and Bell Helicopter Textron, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2019cv00083
Filed: January 15, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Connecticut
Presiding Judge: Janet Bond Arterton
Nature of Suit: P.I. : Asbestos
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 25, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 25, 2019 Answer deadline updated for All Defendants. (Tooker, A.)
February 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER granting #18 Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint, on consent, to 3/24/19. Signed by Judge Janet Bond Arterton on 2/25/19. (Tooker, A.)
February 22, 2019 Filing 18 Third MOTION for Extension of Time until March 24, 2019 to Respond to Complaint by Textron Aviation. (Baldwin, Andrew)
February 19, 2019 Filing 17 Stipulation terminating Defendant Hiller Aircraft Corp. only.(Tooker, A.)
February 14, 2019 Filing 16 MOTION to Dismiss Hiller Aircraft Corp by Douglass Levan.Responses due by 3/7/2019 (Meisenkothen, Christopher)
February 14, 2019 Answer deadline updated for Textron Aviation to 2/22/2019. (Freberg, B)
February 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER granting #13 Second MOTION for Extension of Time until February 22, 2019 Respond to Complaint. Signed by Judge Janet Bond Arterton on 2/14/2019. (Freberg, B)
February 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER granting, nunc pro tunc, #11 MOTION for Extension of Time until 02/06/2019 To Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint. Signed by Judge Janet Bond Arterton on 2/11/2019. (Freberg, B)
February 8, 2019 Filing 13 Second MOTION for Extension of Time until February 22, 2019 Respond to Complaint by Textron Aviation. (Baldwin, Andrew)
January 24, 2019 Filing 12 NOTICE by Textron Aviation Statement in Compliance with Standing Order on Removed Cases (Baldwin, Andrew)
January 23, 2019 Filing 11 MOTION for Extension of Time until 02/06/2019 To Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint by Textron Aviation. (Milrad, Joshua)
January 22, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by Andrew L Baldwin on behalf of Textron Aviation (Baldwin, Andrew)
January 22, 2019 Filing 9 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Hiller Aircraft Corp identifying Corporate Parent Siam Hiller Holdings, Inc. for Hiller Aircraft Corp. (Lyons, Thomas)
January 17, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Thomas N. Lyons on behalf of Hiller Aircraft Corp (Lyons, Thomas)
January 16, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE by Textron Aviation of Compliance with Standing Order for Removed Cases; Notice of No Pending Motions (Milrad, Joshua)
January 16, 2019 Filing 6 DEMAND for Trial by Jury by Textron Aviation. (Milrad, Joshua)
January 16, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE TO COUNSEL/SELF-REPRESENTED PARTIES : Counsel or self-represented parties initiating or removing this action are responsible for serving all parties with attached documents and copies of #3 Electronic Filing Order, #4 Protective Order, #2 Order on Pretrial Deadlines, #1 Notice of Removal, filed by Textron Aviation Signed by Clerk on 1/16/2019. (Attachments: #1 Standing Order on Removals)(Reis, Julia)
January 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 STANDING PROTECTIVE ORDER Signed by Judge Janet Bond Arterton on 1/16/2019.(Reis, Julia)
January 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ELECTRONIC FILING ORDER FOR COUNSEL - PLEASE ENSURE COMPLIANCE WITH COURTESY COPY REQUIREMENTS IN THIS ORDER Signed by Judge Janet Bond Arterton on 1/16/2019.(Reis, Julia)
January 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 2 Order on Pretrial Deadlines: Amended Pleadings due by 3/16/2019 Discovery due by 7/17/2019 Dispositive Motions due by 8/21/2019 Signed by Clerk on 1/15/2019.(Reis, Julia)
January 16, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Textron Aviation from Superior Court- Judicial District of Fairfield, case number FBT-CV-19-6081743. Filing fee $ 400 receipt number ACTDC-5121837 filed by Textron Aviation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2)(Hushin, Z.) Modified on 1/16/2019 to add receipt information (Hushin, Z.). Modified on 1/16/2019 to include state court case number (Hushin, Z.).
January 15, 2019 Judge Janet Bond Arterton added. (Oliver, T.)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Connecticut District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Levan et al v. Bell Helicopter Textron, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Textron Aviation
Represented By: Joshua Laurence Milrad
Represented By: Andrew L Baldwin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bell Hellicopter Textron, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bombardier, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hiller Aircraft Corp
Represented By: Thomas N. Lyons
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bell Helicopter Textron, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jean Levan
Represented By: Christopher Meisenkothen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Douglass Levan
Represented By: Christopher Meisenkothen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?