Joseph-Lumpkin v. Education
Plaintiff: Gemma Joseph-Lumpkin
Defendant: Board of Education
Case Number: 3:2019cv00150
Filed: February 1, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Connecticut
Presiding Judge: Vanessa L Bryant
Nature of Suit: Labor: Family and Medical Leave Act
Cause of Action: 29:2601
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 27, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 27, 2019 Filing 13 ANSWER to #1 Complaint by Board of Education.(Casini, Kevin)
March 27, 2019 Filing 12 NOTICE of Appearance by Kevin Casini on behalf of Board of Education (Casini, Kevin)
February 26, 2019 Answer deadline updated for Board of Education to 3/27/2019 per Dkt. 11 Order. (Shafer, J.)
February 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER granting #10 Motion for Extension of Time until March 27, 2019, to respond to the Plaintiff's Complaint. Signed by Judge Vanessa L. Bryant on 2/26/2019. (Shafer, J.)
February 25, 2019 Filing 10 MOTION for Extension of Time until March 27, 2019 within which to File a Response to Plaintiff's Complaint by Board of Education. (Rose, John)
February 25, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by John Rose, Jr on behalf of Board of Education (Rose, John)
February 14, 2019 Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Gemma Joseph-Lumpkin. Board of Education served on 2/7/2019, answer due 2/28/2019. (Bucci, Thomas)
February 1, 2019 Filing 7 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED in accordance with Fed. R. Civ. P. 4 and LR 4 as to *Board of Education* with answer to complaint due within *21* days. Attorney *Thomas W. Bucci* *Willinger, Willinger & Bucci, P.C.* *855 Main St., Fifth Floor* *Bridgeport, CT 06604*. (Velez, F.)
February 1, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE TO COUNSEL/SELF-REPRESENTED PARTIES: Counsel or self-represented parties initiating or removing this action are responsible for serving all parties with attached documents and copies of #3 Electronic Filing Order, #5 Order Re: Chambers Practices, #1 Complaint filed by Gemma Joseph-Lumpkin, #4 Protective Order, #2 Order on Pretrial Deadlines. Signed by Clerk on 2/1/2019. (Velez, F.)
February 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER RE: Judge's Chambers Practices. Counsel are directed to read and comply with the Chambers Practices and Standing Orders prior to filing any document. So ordered. Signed by Judge Vanessa L. Bryant on 2/1/2019. (Velez, F.)
February 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 STANDING PROTECTIVE ORDER. Signed by Judge Vanessa L. Bryant on 2/1/2019. (Velez, F.)
February 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ELECTRONIC FILING ORDER FOR COUNSEL - PLEASE ENSURE COMPLIANCE WITH COURTESY COPY REQUIREMENTS IN THIS ORDER. Signed by Judge Vanessa L. Bryant on 2/1/2019. (Velez, F.)
February 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 2 Order on Pretrial Deadlines: Amended Pleadings due by 4/2/2019; Discovery due by 8/3/2019; Dispositive Motions due by 9/7/2019. Signed by Clerk on 2/1/2019. (Velez, F.)
February 1, 2019 Judge Vanessa L. Bryant added. (Anastasio, F.)
February 1, 2019 Request for Clerk to issue summons as to New Haven Board of Education. (Bucci, Thomas)
February 1, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against New Haven Board of Education ( Filing fee $400 receipt number ACTDC-5142930.), filed by Gemma Joseph-Lumpkin.(Bucci, Thomas)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Connecticut District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Joseph-Lumpkin v. Education
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gemma Joseph-Lumpkin
Represented By: Thomas W. Bucci
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Board of Education
Represented By: John Rose, Jr.
Represented By: Kevin Casini
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?