Vogel v. Commissioner of Social Security

Plaintiff: Gail Vogel
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Interested Party: Social Security Administration
Case Number: 3:2019cv00164
Filed: February 4, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Connecticut
0 Judge: Jeffrey A Meyer
1 Judge: Robert M Spector
Nature of Suit: Social Security: DIWC/DIWW
Cause of Action: 42:405
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 4, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER granting #13 Consent Motion to Remand. Signed by Judge Jeffrey A. Meyer on 4/4/19. (Pesta, J.)
April 3, 2019 Filing 13 MOTION to Remand to Agency with Plaintiff's Consent by Commissioner of Social Security.Responses due by 4/24/2019 (Lechleitner, Andreea)
March 15, 2019 Filing 12 Docket Entry Correction re #11 Notice. Corrected document added to the entry. (Barry, Donna)
March 15, 2019 Filing 11 NOTICE of Consolidation. Signed by Clerk on 03/15/19. (Barry, Donna) (Additional attachment(s) added on 3/15/2019: #1 REPLACEMENT PDF) (Barry, Donna).
March 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER granting #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Signed by Judge Jeffrey A. Meyer on 03/15/19. (Barry, Donna)
February 14, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by Andreea Lechleitner on behalf of Commissioner of Social Security (Lechleitner, Andreea)
February 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 SCHEDULING ORDER. The Commissioner shall file an answer and the administrative record on or before April 9, 2019. Plaintiff shall file a Motion to Reverse and/or Remand and supporting memorandum of law on or before June 10, 2019. The motion shall be accompanied by a memorandum of law that explains the reasons why plaintiff believes the decision should be reversed or remanded for reconsideration, specifically addressing whether there was an error oflaw or a lack of substantial evidence to support the decision below. See, e.g., Greek v. Colvin,802 F.3d 370, 374-75 (2d Cir. 2015) (per curiam ).The Commissioner shall file a response or Motion to Affirm the decision of the Commissioner or or before August 9, 2019. Plaintiff may file a reply brief by August 23, 2019. The parties need not submit a joint stipulation of facts.The parties are advised that the Court is unlikely to grant an extension of time of the dates as set forth in this scheduling order, and that failure to comply with the Courts scheduling order may result in a summary grant of relief for the opposing party. Signed by Judge Jeffrey A. Meyer on 2/8/19.(Pesta, J.)
February 8, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE OF OPTION TO CONSENT TO PROCEED BEFORE U.S. MAGISTRATE JUDGE. The parties in Social Security proceedings have an option to proceed before a U.S. Magistrate Judge if they wish to instead of before a U.S. District Judge. The Commissioner has categorically consented to proceed before a U.S. Magistrate Judge in all Social Security cases. Plaintiff should decide whether she wishes to consent to proceed before a U.S. Magistrate Judge or whether she prefers to have the case remain assigned to Judge Meyer. If plaintiff wishes to consent, she should complete, sign, and file the attached consent formby March 1, 2019. In the absence of plaintiff's filing of a signed consent form, the case shall remain with Judge Meyer. Signed by Judge Jeffrey A. Meyer on 2/8/19.(Pesta, J.)
February 7, 2019 Docket Entry Correction: #4 Electronic Filing Order and #5 Notice were entered in error. (Pipech, L.)
February 5, 2019 Filing 5 ENTERED IN ERROR: NOTICE to Self-represented Parties. Signed by Clerk on 2/5/2019.(Pipech, L.) Modified on 2/7/2019 (Pipech, L.).
February 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ELECTRONIC FILING ORDER FOR COUNSEL - PLEASE ENSURE COMPLIANCE WITH COURTESY COPY REQUIREMENTS IN THIS ORDER. Signed by Judge Jeffrey A. Meyer on 2/4/2019.(Pipech, L.)
February 4, 2019 Answer deadline updated for Commissioner of Social Security to 4/5/2019. (Pipech, L.)
February 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ENTERED IN ERROR: ELECTRONIC FILING ORDER FOR COUNSEL - PLEASE ENSURE COMPLIANCE WITH COURTESY COPY REQUIREMENTS IN THIS ORDER. Signed by Judge Stefan R Underhill on 2/4/2019.(Pipech, L.) Modified on 2/7/2019 (Pipech, L.).
February 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 STANDING SCHEDULING ORDER. Signed by Judge Stefan R Underhill on 2/4/2019.(Pipech, L.)
February 4, 2019 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Gail Vogel. Motions referred to Robert M. Spector. (Pipech, L.)
February 4, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Commissioner of Social Security, filed by Gail Vogel.(Pipech, L.)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Connecticut District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Vogel v. Commissioner of Social Security
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Represented By: Andreea Lechleitner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: Social Security Administration
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gail Vogel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?