In Re: Cangiano
Petitioner: Luigi Cangiano
Case Number: 3:2019cv00169
Filed: February 5, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Connecticut
Presiding Judge: Charles S Haight
Nature of Suit: Marine
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 3, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 3, 2019 Filing 7 EXHIBIT Ad Interim Security for Value per Order Dated 03/21/2019 [Doc. 5] by Luigi Cangiano re #1 Complaint,. (Murphy, Charles)
March 21, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE OF PETITION FOR EXONERATION FROM OR LIMITATION OF LIABILITY Signed by Clerk on 3/21/2019.(Freberg, B)
March 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER (see attached) Approving Security, Directing Issue of Notice, Restraining Suits, and Directing Filing of Claims. Signed by Judge Charles S. Haight, Jr. on March 21, 2019. (Attachment: NOTICE of Petition for Exoneration from or Limitation of Liability). (Dorais, L.)
February 6, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE TO COUNSEL/SELF-REPRESENTED PARTIES : Counsel or self-represented parties initiating or removing this action are responsible for serving all parties with attached documents and copies of #3 Electronic Filing Order, #1 Complaint, filed by Luigi Cangiano, #2 Order on Pretrial Deadlines Signed by Clerk on 2/6/2019.(Reis, Julia)
February 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ELECTRONIC FILING ORDER FOR COUNSEL - PLEASE ENSURE COMPLIANCE WITH COURTESY COPY REQUIREMENTS IN THIS ORDER Signed by Judge Charles S. Haight, Jr on 2/5/19.(Reis, Julia)
February 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 2 Order on Pretrial Deadlines: Amended Pleadings due by 4/6/2019 Discovery due by 8/7/2019 Dispositive Motions due by 9/11/2019 Signed by Clerk on 2/5/2019.(Reis, Julia)
February 5, 2019 Judge Charles S. Haight, Jr added. (Oliver, T.)
February 5, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT FOR EXONERATION FROM OR LIMITATION OF LIABILITY against All Parties ( Filing fee $400 receipt number ACTDC-5146777.), filed by Luigi Cangiano. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Affidavit of Value, #2 Exhibit Ad Interim Security, #3 Exhibit Notice of Petition, #4 Text of Proposed Order)(Murphy, Charles)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Connecticut District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: In Re: Cangiano
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Luigi Cangiano
Represented By: Charles Edmund Murphy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?