Public School Teachers Pension and Retirement Fund of Chicago v. Teva Pharmaceutical Industries Ltd. et al
Plaintiff: Public School Teachers' Pension and Retirement Fund of Chicago and Public School Teachers Pension and Retirement System of Chicago
Defendant: Eyal Desheh, Sigurdur Olafsson, Teva Pharmaceutical Industries Ltd., Erez Vigodman and Allan Oberman
Case Number: 3:2019cv00175
Filed: February 5, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Connecticut
Presiding Judge: Stefan R Underhill
Nature of Suit: Securities/Commodities
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 11, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER granting #17 Motion to Stay. Signed by Judge Stefan R Underhill on 3/11/2019. (Jaiman, R.)
March 4, 2019 Filing 17 Joint MOTION to Stay by Eyal Desheh, Allan Oberman, Sigurdur Olafsson, Teva Pharmaceutical Industries Ltd., Erez Vigodman.Responses due by 3/25/2019 (O'Toole, Jill)
February 27, 2019 Filing 16 NOTICE of Appearance by Jill M. O'Toole on behalf of Eyal Desheh, Allan Oberman, Sigurdur Olafsson, Teva Pharmaceutical Industries Ltd., Erez Vigodman (O'Toole, Jill)
February 21, 2019 Filing 15 NOTICE of Hearing in Related Case, Ontario Teachers' Pension Plan Board, et al. v. Teva Pharmaceuticals Industries, Ltd., et al., 17-cv-558. (Kaas, E.)
February 13, 2019 Filing 14 NOTICE of Appearance by Carol V. Gilden on behalf of Public School Teachers Pension and Retirement System of Chicago (Gilden, Carol)
February 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER OF TRANSFER. Case reassigned to Judge Stefan R Underhill for all further proceedings. Signed by Judge Victor A. Bolden on 2/11/19.(Imbriani, Susan)
February 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER granting #10 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice as to Carol V. Gilden. Certificate of Good Standing due by 4/12/2019. Signed by Clerk on 2/11/2019. (Fazekas, J.)
February 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER granting #9 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice as to Steven J. Toll. Signed by Clerk on 2/11/2019. (Fazekas, J.)
February 8, 2019 Filing 10 MOTION for Attorney(s) Carol V. Gilden to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (paid $75 PHV fee; receipt number ACTDC-5152877) by Public School Teachers Pension and Retirement System of Chicago. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Affidavit, #2 Exhibit B - Certificate of Good Standing)(Slossberg, David)
February 8, 2019 Filing 9 MOTION for Attorney(s) Steven J. Toll to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (paid $75 PHV fee; receipt number ACTDC-5152724) by Public School Teachers Pension and Retirement System of Chicago. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Affidavit, #2 Exhibit B - Certificate of Good Standing)(Slossberg, David)
February 7, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE of Related Case by Public School Teachers Pension and Retirement System of Chicago (Slossberg, David)
February 7, 2019 Filing 7 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED in accordance with Fed. R. Civ. P. 4 and LR 4 as to *Eyal Desheh, Allan Oberman, Sigurdur Olafsson, Teva Pharmaceutical Industries Ltd., Erez Vigodman* with answer to complaint due within *21* days. Attorney *David A. Slossberg* *Hurwitz Sagarin Slossberg & Knuff LLC* *147 North Broad St.* *Milford, CT 06460-0112*. (Fazekas, J.)
February 7, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by David A. Slossberg on behalf of Public School Teachers Pension and Retirement System of Chicago (Slossberg, David)
February 6, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE TO COUNSEL/SELF-REPRESENTED PARTIES : Counsel or self-represented parties initiating or removing this action are responsible for serving all parties with attached documents and copies of #4 Standing Protective Order, #3 Electronic Filing Order, #1 Complaint filed by Public School Teachers Pension and Retirement System of Chicago, #2 Order on Pretrial Deadlines Signed by Clerk on 2/6/2019.(Fazekas, J.)
February 6, 2019 Request for Clerk to issue summons as to All Defendants. (Slossberg, David)
February 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 STANDING PROTECTIVE ORDER Signed by Judge Victor A. Bolden on 2/5/2019.(Fazekas, J.)
February 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ELECTRONIC FILING ORDER FOR COUNSEL - PLEASE ENSURE COMPLIANCE WITH COURTESY COPY REQUIREMENTS IN THIS ORDER Signed by Judge Victor A. Bolden on 2/5/2019.(Fazekas, J.)
February 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 2 Order on Pretrial Deadlines: Amended Pleadings due by 4/6/2019. Discovery due by 8/7/2019. Dispositive Motions due by 9/11/2019. Signed by Clerk on 2/5/2019.(Fazekas, J.)
February 5, 2019 Judge Victor A. Bolden added. (Oliver, T.)
February 5, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $400 receipt number ACTDC-5147871.), filed by Public School Teachers' Pension and Retirement Fund of Chicago. (Attachments: #1 Appendix A, #2 Appendix B)(Nichols, Jeffrey)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Connecticut District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Public School Teachers Pension and Retirement Fund of Chicago v. Teva Pharmaceutical Industries Ltd. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Eyal Desheh
Represented By: Jill M. O'Toole
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sigurdur Olafsson
Represented By: Jill M. O'Toole
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Teva Pharmaceutical Industries Ltd.
Represented By: Jill M. O'Toole
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Erez Vigodman
Represented By: Jill M. O'Toole
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Allan Oberman
Represented By: Jill M. O'Toole
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Public School Teachers' Pension and Retirement Fund of Chicago
Represented By: Jeffrey P. Nichols
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Public School Teachers Pension and Retirement System of Chicago
Represented By: Carol V. Gilden
Represented By: Jeffrey P. Nichols
Represented By: David A. Slossberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?