HSA Bank et al v. Lively, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: HSA Bank and Webster Financial Corporation
Defendant: Lively, Inc., Shobin Uralil and Alex Cyriac
Case Number: 3:2019cv00183
Filed: February 6, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Connecticut
Presiding Judge: Michael P Shea
Nature of Suit: Trademark
Cause of Action: 15:1051
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 28, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER. The Court will construe the #13 Notice of Withdrawal of Counsel as a motion to withdraw under Local Rule 7(e). The motion is GRANTED as new counsel has entered an appearance for the Plaintiff. The Clerk is directed to terminate Attorney Sessel's appearance. Signed by Judge Michael P. Shea on 3/28/2019. (Guevremont, Nathan)
February 28, 2019 Filing 13 NOTICE by HSA Bank, Webster Financial Corporation Withdrawal of Counsel (Seessel, Ben)
February 28, 2019 Filing 12 NOTICE of Appearance by John C. Pitblado on behalf of HSA Bank, Webster Financial Corporation (Pitblado, John)
February 7, 2019 Filing 11 AO 120 Report on the Filing of an Action re: Trademark Form Completed. (Attachments: #1 Complaint and Attachments) (Murphy, Tatihana)
February 7, 2019 Filing 10 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED in accordance with Fed. R. Civ. P. 4 and LR 4 as to *Shobin Uralil* with answer to complaint due within *21* days. Attorney *Ben V. Seessel* *Carlton Fields Jorden Burt, P.A.* *One State Street, Suite 1800* *Hartford, CT 06103*. (Murphy, Tatihana)
February 7, 2019 Filing 9 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED in accordance with Fed. R. Civ. P. 4 and LR 4 as to *Lively, Inc.* with answer to complaint due within *21* days. Attorney *Ben V. Seessel* *Carlton Fields Jorden Burt, P.A.* *One State Street, Suite 1800* *Hartford, CT 06103*. (Murphy, Tatihana)
February 7, 2019 Filing 8 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED in accordance with Fed. R. Civ. P. 4 and LR 4 as to *Alex Cyriac* with answer to complaint due within *21* days. Attorney *Ben V. Seessel* *Carlton Fields Jorden Burt, P.A.* *One State Street, Suite 1800* *Hartford, CT 06103*. (Murphy, Tatihana)
February 7, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE TO COUNSEL/SELF-REPRESENTED PARTIES : Counsel or self-represented parties initiating or removing this action are responsible for serving all parties with attached documents and copies of #4 Order on Pretrial Deadlines, #3 Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Webster Financial Corporation, HSA Bank, #1 Complaint, filed by Webster Financial Corporation, HSA Bank, #5 Electronic Filing Order, #2 Notice of Appearance filed by Webster Financial Corporation, HSA Bank, #6 Standing Protective Order. Signed by Clerk on 2/7/2019.(Murphy, Tatihana)
February 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 STANDING PROTECTIVE ORDER Signed by Judge Michael P. Shea on 2/6/2019.(Murphy, Tatihana)
February 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ELECTRONIC FILING ORDER FOR COUNSEL - PLEASE ENSURE COMPLIANCE WITH COURTESY COPY REQUIREMENTS IN THIS ORDER. Signed by Judge Michael P. Shea on 2/6/2019.(Murphy, Tatihana)
February 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 Order on Pretrial Deadlines: Amended Pleadings due by 4/7/2019. Discovery due by 8/8/2019. Dispositive Motions due by 9/12/2019. Signed by Clerk on 2/6/2019.(Murphy, Tatihana)
February 6, 2019 Request for Clerk to issue summons as to Shobin Uralil. (Seessel, Ben)
February 6, 2019 Request for Clerk to issue summons as to Alex Cyriac. (Seessel, Ben)
February 6, 2019 Request for Clerk to issue summons as to Lively, Inc.. (Seessel, Ben)
February 6, 2019 Filing 3 Corporate Disclosure Statement by HSA Bank, Webster Financial Corporation. (Seessel, Ben)
February 6, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by Ben V. Seessel on behalf of HSA Bank, Webster Financial Corporation (Seessel, Ben)
February 6, 2019 Judge Michael P. Shea added. (Oliver, T.)
February 6, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Alex Cyriac, Lively, Inc., Shobin Uralil ( Filing fee $400 receipt number ACTDC-5149108.), filed by HSA Bank, a division of Webster Bank, N.A., Webster Financial Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Civil Cover Sheet, #9 Report on the Filing or Determination of an Action Regarding a Patent or Trademark)(Seessel, Ben)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Connecticut District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: HSA Bank et al v. Lively, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lively, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Shobin Uralil
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alex Cyriac
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: HSA Bank
Represented By: Ben V. Seessel
Represented By: John C. Pitblado
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Webster Financial Corporation
Represented By: Ben V. Seessel
Represented By: John C. Pitblado
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?