Allstate Insurance Company v. Kelley et al

Plaintiff: Allstate Insurance Company
Defendant: Jaylen Kelley and Jennifer L. Dwy
Case Number: 3:2019cv00185
Filed: February 6, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Connecticut
Presiding Judge: Michael P Shea
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:2201
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 26, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 26, 2019 Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Allstate Insurance Company. All Defendants. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Wojcik, Michele)
February 8, 2019 Filing 7 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Allstate Insurance Company identifying Corporate Parent Allstate Ins Holdings LLC, Corporate Parent The Allstate Corporation for Allstate Insurance Company. (Wojcik, Michele)
February 7, 2019 Filing 6 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED in accordance with Fed. R. Civ. P. 4 and LR 4 as to *Jennifer L. Dwy, Jaylen Kelley* with answer to complaint due within *21* days. Attorney *Michele C. Wojcik* *Nuzzo & Roberts, LLC* *One Town Center, PO Box 747* *Cheshire, CT 06410*. (Murphy, Tatihana)
February 7, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE TO COUNSEL/SELF-REPRESENTED PARTIES : Counsel or self-represented parties initiating or removing this action are responsible for serving all parties with attached documents and copies of #4 Standing Protective Order, #1 Complaint filed by Allstate Insurance Company, #2 Order on Pretrial Deadlines, #3 Electronic Filing Order Signed by Clerk on 2/7/2019.(Murphy, Tatihana)
February 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 STANDING PROTECTIVE ORDER. Signed by Judge Michael P. Shea on 02/6/2019.(Murphy, Tatihana)
February 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ELECTRONIC FILING ORDER FOR COUNSEL - PLEASE ENSURE COMPLIANCE WITH COURTESY COPY REQUIREMENTS IN THIS ORDER. Signed by Judge Michael P. Shea on 02/6/2019.(Murphy, Tatihana)
February 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 2 Order on Pretrial Deadlines: Amended Pleadings due by 4/7/2019. Discovery due by 8/8/2019. Dispositive Motions due by 9/12/2019. Signed by Clerk on 02/6/2019.(Murphy, Tatihana)
February 6, 2019 Judge Michael P. Shea added. (Walker, A)
February 6, 2019 Request for Clerk to issue summons as to All Defendants. (Wojcik, Michele)
February 6, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT For Declaratory Judgment against All Defendants ( Filing fee $400 receipt number ACTDC-5149370.), filed by Allstate Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C)(Wojcik, Michele)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Connecticut District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Allstate Insurance Company v. Kelley et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jaylen Kelley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jennifer L. Dwy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Allstate Insurance Company
Represented By: Michele C. Wojcik
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?